Tavarez-Vargas v. Vimeo.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carmen Tavarez-Vargas
Defendant: Vimeo.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv09913
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Karla Del Pozo Garcia dated December 29, 2021., #1 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Vimeo.com, Inc. answer due 2/3/2022. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/3/2022) (kv)
December 29, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Karla Del Pozo Garcia dated December 29, 2021. Document filed by Vimeo.com, Inc...(Del Pozo Garcia, Karla)
December 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karla Del Pozo Garcia on behalf of Vimeo.com, Inc...(Del Pozo Garcia, Karla)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Vimeo.com, Inc. served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. Service was accepted by Marcel Walker, Agent. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by January 24, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/9/21) (yv)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by January 24, 2022, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by January 24, 2022, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/9/21) (yv)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. It is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/9/21) (yv)
November 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward Y. Kroub. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (vf)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vimeo.com, Inc...(gp)
November 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vimeo.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vimeo.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25380393)Document filed by Carmen Tavarez-Vargas..(Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavarez-Vargas v. Vimeo.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Tavarez-Vargas
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vimeo.com, Inc.
Represented By: Karla Del Pozo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?