Williams v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Plaintiff: Tara Williams
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Giovanni Caforio, Charles Bancroft, Karen M. Santiago, Vicki L. Sato, Peter J. Arduini, Robert Bertolini, Matthew W. Emmens, Michael Grobstein, Alan J. Lacy, Dinesh Paliwal, Theodore R. Samuels, Gerald L. Storch and Karen H. Vousden
Petitioner: Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv09998
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Tara Williams..(Squitieri, Olimpio)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Peter J. Arduini, Charles Bancroft, Robert Bertolini, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Giovanni Caforio, Matthew W. Emmens, Michael Grobstein, Alan J. Lacy, Dinesh Paliwal, Theodore R. Samuels, Karen M. Santiago, Vicki L. Sato, Gerald L. Storch, Karen H. Vousden..(Clarke, John)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Tara Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support of Motion To Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Squitieri, Olimpio)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Park Wright on behalf of Peter J. Arduini, Charles Bancroft, Robert Bertolini, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Giovanni Caforio, Matthew W. Emmens, Michael Grobstein, Alan J. Lacy, Dinesh Paliwal, Theodore R. Samuels, Karen M. Santiago, Vicki L. Sato, Gerald L. Storch, Karen H. Vousden..(Wright, Jessica)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Rosato on behalf of Peter J. Arduini, Charles Bancroft, Robert Bertolini, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Giovanni Caforio, Matthew W. Emmens, Michael Grobstein, Alan J. Lacy, Dinesh Paliwal, Theodore R. Samuels, Karen M. Santiago, Vicki L. Sato, Gerald L. Storch, Karen H. Vousden..(Rosato, Steven)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Ann Masella on behalf of Peter J. Arduini, Charles Bancroft, Robert Bertolini, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Giovanni Caforio, Matthew W. Emmens, Michael Grobstein, Alan J. Lacy, Dinesh Paliwal, Theodore R. Samuels, Karen M. Santiago, Vicki L. Sato, Gerald L. Storch, Karen H. Vousden..(Masella, Jessica)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (72 in 1:21-cv-08255-JMF) Letter Order Entered on Dec. 1, 2021 [ECF No. 59], filed by Gerald L. Storch, Alan J. Lacy, Matthew W. Emmens, Dinesh C. Paliwal, Peter J. Arduini, Michael Grobstein, Vicki L. Sato, Theodore R. Samuels, Robert Bertolini, Giovanni Caforio, Karen H. Vousden, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, (16 in 1:21-cv-09998-JMF) Letter, filed by Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd., Gerald L. Storch, Alan J. Lacy, Matthew W. Emmens, Peter J. Arduini, Michael Grobstein, Karen M. Santiago, Theodore R. Samuels, Vicki L. Sato, Charles Bancroft, Robert Bertolini, Giovanni Caforio, Karen H. Vousden, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Dinesh Paliwal. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will defer a decision on consolidation until a decision on remand has been reached. Any motion to remand in Case No. 21-CV-9998 shall be filed by December 27, 2021. Any opposition shall be filed by January 10, 2022. Any reply shall be filed by January 17, 2022. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 12/27/2021., Responses due by 1/10/2022, Replies due by 1/17/2022.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/8/21) (yv)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Counsel for All Parties dated December 8, 2021 re: Order Entered Dec. 1, 2021 [ECF No. 5]. Document filed by Peter J. Arduini, Charles Bancroft, Robert Bertolini, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Giovanni Caforio, Matthew W. Emmens, Michael Grobstein, Alan J. Lacy, Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd., Dinesh Paliwal, Theodore R. Samuels, Karen M. Santiago, Vicki L. Sato, Gerald L. Storch, Karen H. Vousden..(Clarke, John)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Plaintiff's counsel notified the Court that the required notice was published on October 6, 2021. ECF No. 70. Members of the purported class therefore had until December 6, 2021, to move the Court to serve as lead plaintiffs. Several motions were indeed filed by that date. Any opposition to these motions shall be served and filed by December 15, 2021. Any replies shall be filed by December 20, 2021. Finally, unless and until the Court orders otherwise, a telephone conference shall be held on December 22, 2021, at 11:15 a.m. to consider any motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and for consolidation. To access the conference, counsel should call 888-363-4749 and use access code 5421540#. Members of the press and public may call the same number, but will not be permitted to speak during the conference. Participants are reminded to follow the procedures for teleconferences described in the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Among other things, those procedures require counsel to provide advance notice of who will participate in the conference and the telephone numbers they will use to participate. It is further ORDERED that the named plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on each of the defendants. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 12/15/2021, Replies due by 12/20/2021., Telephone Conference set for 12/22/2021 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/8/21) (yv)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #14 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd.. Related Document Number: #11 ..(Eisenkraft, Michael) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Michael B. Eisenkraft in Support re: #11 MOTION to Appoint Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Eisenkraft, Michael)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Appoint Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd...(Eisenkraft, Michael)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd. to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd...(Eisenkraft, Michael)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olimpio Lee Squitieri on behalf of Tara Williams..(Squitieri, Olimpio)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME, THE PARTIES STIPULATE AND AGREE, subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: If plaintiff files a motion to remand this action to state court on or before December 27, 2021, then the time for all defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be the date that is thirty (30) days after the Court enters an order resolving plaintiffs motion to remand. If plaintiff does not file a motion to remand this action to state court on or before December 27, 2021, then the time for all defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint shall be January 26, 2022. Nothwithstanding the dates provided for in the preceding paragraphs, the time for all defendants to respond to the complaint shall be governed by the schedule established in the SM Merger Action if this action is consolidated with that prior pending proceeding. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 8. So Ordered. Motions terminated: #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from John J. Clarke, Jr. dated December 3, 2021. filed by Gerald L. Storch, Alan J. Lacy, Matthew W. Emmens, Peter J. Arduini, Michael Grobstein, Karen M. Santiago, Vicki L. Sato, Theodore R. Samuels, Charles Bancroft, Giovanni Caforio, Robert Bertolini, Karen H. Vousden, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Dinesh Paliwal., All Defendants.( Motions due by 1/26/2022.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/6/21) (yv)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from John J. Clarke, Jr. dated December 3, 2021. Document filed by Peter J. Arduini, Charles Bancroft, Robert Bertolini, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Giovanni Caforio, Matthew W. Emmens, Michael Grobstein, Alan J. Lacy, Dinesh Paliwal, Theodore R. Samuels, Karen M. Santiago, Vicki L. Sato, Gerald L. Storch, Karen H. Vousden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order).(Clarke, John)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order served on Plaintiff Tara Williams on December 1, 2021. Service was made by Email with Consent. Document filed by Peter J. Arduini, Charles Bancroft, Robert Bertolini, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Giovanni Caforio, Matthew W. Emmens, Michael Grobstein, Alan J. Lacy, Dinesh Paliwal, Theodore R. Samuels, Karen M. Santiago, Vicki L. Sato, Gerald L. Storch, Karen H. Vousden..(Clarke, John)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J. Clarke, Jr on behalf of Peter J. Arduini, Charles Bancroft, Robert Bertolini, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Giovanni Caforio, Matthew W. Emmens, Michael Grobstein, Alan J. Lacy, Dinesh Paliwal, Theodore R. Samuels, Karen M. Santiago, Vicki L. Sato, Gerald L. Storch, Karen H. Vousden..(Clarke, John)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court has accepted Williams v. Bristol Myers Squibb Company et al., No. 21-CV-9998, as related to SM Merger/Arbitrage L.P. et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al., No. 21-CV-8255. In the interests of judicial economy, counsel for the parties in both cases are directed to confer with one another and, no later than December 8, 2021, to submit a joint letter addressing the parties' positions on how the Court should proceed with the new case, including whether the cases should be consolidated, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 42; whether there is a need for a conference to discuss coordination of the two cases (or anything else); and anything else the parties think appropriately bears on the Court's management of the cases going forward. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, the deadlines in 21-CV-8255 (see Docket No. 40) remain in effect. It is further ORDERED that the defendants in 21-CV-9998 shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on the plaintiff and file proof of service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/1/2021) (va)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-08255-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 1:21cv8255. (sj)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-8255 (JMF). Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company..(Clarke, John)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company..(Clarke, John)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clarke, John)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 656179/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25383705).Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NY State Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - NY State Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - NY State Stipulation).(Clarke, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Williams
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Caforio
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Bancroft
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen M. Santiago
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki L. Sato
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Arduini
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bertolini
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew W. Emmens
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Grobstein
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan J. Lacy
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinesh Paliwal
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore R. Samuels
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald L. Storch
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen H. Vousden
Represented By: Jessica Ann Masella
Represented By: Jessica Park Wright
Represented By: John J. Clarke, Jr
Represented By: Steven Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mangrove Partners Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?