Girotto v. Chloe Boutique S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Luigi Girotto
Defendant: Chloe Boutique S.A., Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Chlo and Soho Centrale, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv10098
Filed: November 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of Chloe Boutique S.A., Inc...(Fleming, Michael)
January 18, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas T. Schwarz on behalf of Chloe Boutique S.A., Inc...(Schwarz, Douglas)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chloe Boutique S.A., Inc...(gp)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Soho Centrale, LLC..(gp)
December 24, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SOHO CENTRALE, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
December 24, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHLOE BOUTIQUE S.A., INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Chloe Boutique S.A., Inc. waiver sent on 12/14/2021, answer due 2/14/2022. Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/6/2021) (vfr)
November 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
November 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chloe Boutique S.A., Inc., Soho Centrale, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25386808)Document filed by Luigi Girotto..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Girotto v. Chloe Boutique S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luigi Girotto
Represented By: Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chloe Boutique S.A., Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Chlo
Represented By: Douglas T. Schwarz
Represented By: Michael Friel Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soho Centrale, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?