American Civil Liberties Union et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al
Plaintiff: ACLU, ACLU Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, Federal Aviation Administration, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Federal Protective Service, United States Marshals Service and United States Secret Service
Case Number: 1:2021cv10430
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vera Eidelman on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Eidelman, Vera)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 1/20/22. Defendants' request for an extension of time to February 28, 2022 to respond to the complaint is granted. It is SO ORDERED. #1 Complaint. Federal Aviation Administration answer due 2/28/2022; Federal Bureau Of Investigation answer due 2/28/2022; Federal Protective Service answer due 2/28/2022; United States Customs and Border Protection answer due 2/28/2022; United States Department of Homeland Security answer due 2/28/2022; United States Department of Justice answer due 2/28/2022; United States Drug Enforcement Administration answer due 2/28/2022; United States Marshals Service answer due 2/28/2022; United States Secret Service answer due 2/28/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/20/2022) (vfr)
January 20, 2022 Filing 45 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 1/20/22. Document filed by Federal Aviation Administration, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Federal Protective Service, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Marshals Service, United States Secret Service..(Barnea, Jean-David)
January 11, 2022 Filing 44 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). United States Secret Service served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Tewari, Shreya)
January 11, 2022 Filing 43 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). United States Marshals Service served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Tewari, Shreya)
January 11, 2022 Filing 42 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Federal Protective Service served on 1/6/2022, answer due 2/7/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Tewari, Shreya)
January 11, 2022 Filing 41 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Federal Bureau Of Investigation served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Tewari, Shreya)
January 11, 2022 Filing 40 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Federal Aviation Administration served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Tewari, Shreya)
January 11, 2022 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). United States Department of Justice served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Tewari, Shreya)
January 11, 2022 Filing 38 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). United States Department of Homeland Security served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Tewari, Shreya)
January 11, 2022 Filing 37 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). United States Drug Enforcement Administration served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Tewari, Shreya)
January 11, 2022 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). United States Customs and Border Protection served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Tewari, Shreya)
January 10, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jean-David Barnea on behalf of Federal Aviation Administration, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Federal Protective Service, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Marshals Service, United States Secret Service..(Barnea, Jean-David)
January 10, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Estlund Issacharoff on behalf of Federal Aviation Administration, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Federal Protective Service, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Marshals Service, United States Secret Service..(Issacharoff, Lucas)
January 4, 2022 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Protective Service. (vf)
January 3, 2022 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Federal Protective Service, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 10, 2021 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Marshals Service..(jgo)
December 10, 2021 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Drug Enforcement Administration..(jgo)
December 10, 2021 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice..(jgo)
December 10, 2021 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security..(jgo)
December 9, 2021 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to United States Marshals Service, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 9, 2021 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Justice, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 9, 2021 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 9, 2021 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Drug Enforcement Administration, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 9, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Andrew Hodgson on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Hodgson, Robert)
December 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Shreya Tewari to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #19 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, #20 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
December 8, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Max Kaufman on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Kaufman, Brett)
December 8, 2021 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to United States Department of Justice, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya) Modified on 12/9/2021 (pc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya) Modified on 12/9/2021 (pc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to United States Drug Enforcement Administration, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya) Modified on 12/9/2021 (pc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Secret Service..(sj)
December 8, 2021 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Protective Service..(sj)
December 8, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (sj)
December 8, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Aviation Administration..(sj)
December 8, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Marshals Service. (sj)
December 8, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Customs and Border Protection..(sj)
December 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
December 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shreya Tewari. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
December 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Shreya Tewari to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name must match exactly on PDF as it appears in pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Secret Service, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by ACLU, ACLU Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Marshals Service, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by ACLU, ACLU Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Protective Service, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by ACLU, ACLU Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by ACLU, ACLU Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Aviation Administration, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by ACLU, ACLU Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Justice, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by ACLU, ACLU Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by ACLU, ACLU Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Drug Enforcement Administration, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by ACLU, ACLU Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Customs and Border Protection, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by ACLU, ACLU Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ACLU, ACLU Foundation..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tewari, Shreya)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Aviation Administration, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Federal Protective Service, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration, United States Marshals Service, United States Secret Service. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25433549)Document filed by ACLU Foundation, ACLU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(Tewari, Shreya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACLU
Represented By: Shreya Tewari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACLU Foundation
Represented By: Shreya Tewari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman
Represented By: Robert Andrew Hodgson
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Shreya Tewari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: Brett Max Kaufman
Represented By: Robert Andrew Hodgson
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Shreya Tewari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau Of Investigation
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Protective Service
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshals Service
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Secret Service
Represented By: Jean-David Barnea
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?