Todie-Reyes v. Orellana
Plaintiff: Eugene A. Todie-Reyes
Defendant: Cinthia Carolina Reyes Orellana
Case Number: 1:2021cv10444
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Eugene A. Todie-Reyes.(sc)
January 12, 2022 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Eugene A. Todie-Reyes at 65-44 Saunders St., F-16, Rego Park, NY 11374. (Attachments: # 1 Amended IFP Application)(dsh)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR AMENDED IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fees or submit an AMENDED IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fees due by 2/10/2022. AMENDED In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 2/10/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/11/2022) (Attachments: #1 Amended IFP Application) (dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Eugene A. Todie-Reyes.(sc)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fees or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fees due by 1/10/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/10/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/9/2021) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 9, 2021 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Eugene A. Todie-Reyes at 65-44 Saunders St., F-16, Rego Park, NY 11374. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application) (dsh)
December 9, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cinthia Carolina Reyes Orellana. Document filed by Eugene A. Todie-Reyes..(rdz)
December 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todie-Reyes v. Orellana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene A. Todie-Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinthia Carolina Reyes Orellana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?