Martines v. Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Ramona Yessenia Tejeda Martines, on behalf of all other persons similarly situated and RAMONA YESSENIA TEJEDA MARTINES, on behalf of themselves and all other persons similarly situated
Defendant: Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp., David Ortiz and Sandy Ortiz
Case Number: 1:2021cv10553
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/28/2022.(ah)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/7/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/10/2019) (jpt)
January 25, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Victor Jose Molina, Jr on behalf of Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp., David Ortiz, Sandy Ortiz..(Molina, Victor)
January 25, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Sharav on behalf of Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp., David Ortiz, Sandy Ortiz..(Sharav, Benjamin)
January 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Sharav on behalf of Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp., David Ortiz, Sandy Ortiz..(Sharav, Benjamin)
January 25, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp...(Sharav, Benjamin)
January 25, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp., David Ortiz, Sandy Ortiz..(Sharav, Benjamin)
December 22, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Sandy Ortiz served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. Service was accepted by David "Doe". Document filed by RAMONA YESSENIA TEJEDA MARTINES, on behalf of themselves and all other persons similarly situated..(Tucker, Clifford)
December 22, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. David Ortiz served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. Service was accepted by David "Doe". Document filed by RAMONA YESSENIA TEJEDA MARTINES, on behalf of themselves and all other persons similarly situated..(Tucker, Clifford)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp. served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. Service was accepted by David "Doe". Document filed by RAMONA YESSENIA TEJEDA MARTINES, on behalf of themselves and all other persons similarly situated..(Tucker, Clifford)
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandy Ortiz..(jgo)
December 10, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp...(jgo)
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Ortiz..(jgo)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tucker, Clifford)
December 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Clifford Ryan Tucker. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:5; Jury Demand code b (Both); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201; the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None); the County code has been modified to Queens;. (jgo)
December 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Clifford Ryan Tucker to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code was not selected on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
December 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Clifford Ryan Tucker re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add party Ramona Yessenia Tejeda Martines with party text 'on behalf of all other persons similarly situated'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
December 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Clifford Ryan Tucker. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ramona Yessenia Tejeda Martines. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
December 10, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Ramona Yessenia Tejeda Martines added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Ramona Yessenia Tejeda Martines. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Tucker, Clifford)
December 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MANGO GROCERY & MEAT MARKET CORP, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ramona Yessenia Tejeda Martines..(Tucker, Clifford)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SANDY ORTIZ, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ramona Yessenia Tejeda Martines..(Tucker, Clifford)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DAVID ORTIZ, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ramona Yessenia Tejeda Martines..(Tucker, Clifford)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tucker, Clifford) Modified on 12/10/2021 (jgo).
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp., David Ortiz, Sandy Ortiz. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25448786)Document filed by Ramona Yessenia Tejeda Martines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Sue, #2 Exhibit Demand by Employee to Inspect Share Records and Minutes, #3 Exhibit Notice of Intention to Enforce Corporate Member Liability for Services Rendered).(Tucker, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martines v. Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Yessenia Tejeda Martines
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: on behalf of all other persons similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMONA YESSENIA TEJEDA MARTINES, on behalf of themselves and all other persons similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mango Grocery & Meat Market Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin Sharav
Represented By: Victor Jose Molina, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ortiz
Represented By: Benjamin Sharav
Represented By: Victor Jose Molina, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Ortiz
Represented By: Benjamin Sharav
Represented By: Victor Jose Molina, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?