Reed International, Inc. v. Afghanistan International Bank
Plaintiff: Reed International, Inc.
Defendant: Afghanistan International Bank
Case Number: 1:2021cv10626
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint.[Second Request] addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher W. Healy dated February 4, 2022. The Application is Granted. Afghanistan International Bank answer due 3/4/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/04/2022) (ama)
February 4, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, [Second Request] addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher W. Healy dated February 4, 2022. Document filed by Afghanistan International Bank..(Healy, Christopher)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff, Reed International, Inc. ("Plaintiff"), and Defendant, Afghanistan International Bank ("Defendant") that: On December 13, 2021, Plaintiffs initiated this action by filing the Complaint against Defendant. (D.N. 1.). The parties seek to engage in good-faith discussions to potentially resolve their dispute. Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint [D.N. 1] is hereby extended up to and including February 11, 2022, that deadline being thirty (30) days from January 12, 2021, Defendant's original deadline to respond to the Complaint. No other extensions have been agreed to or requested. IT IS SO ORDERED., Afghanistan International Bank answer due 2/11/2022., Motions terminated: #6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consent Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Stephen M. Faraci, Sr. dated 12/30/2021. filed by Reed International, Inc.. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/30/2021) (ama)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consent Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Stephen M. Faraci, Sr. dated 12/30/2021. Document filed by Reed International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Faraci, Stephen)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Afghanistan International Bank..(gp)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Afghanistan International Bank, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reed International, Inc...(Faraci, Stephen)
December 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stephen Matthew Faraci, Sr to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stephen Matthew Faraci, Sr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $316,062,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $316,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
December 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
December 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Afghanistan International Bank, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Reed International, Inc...(Faraci, Stephen) Modified on 12/14/2021 (sj).
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faraci, Stephen)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Afghanistan International Bank. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25458317)Document filed by Reed International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Faraci, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed International, Inc. v. Afghanistan International Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed International, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Faraci, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afghanistan International Bank
Represented By: Christopher W. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?