Grain D'or LLC v. Wizman
Plaintiff: Grain D'or LLC
Defendant: Inbar Wizman
Case Number: 1:2021cv10652
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ct
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on March 8, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 3/8/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/10/2022) (va)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Inbar Wizman..(gp)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Inbar Wizman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Grain D'or LLC..(Roth, Richard)
December 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
December 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard Alan Roth to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): plaintiff or plaintiffs attorney information section of form is not provided. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
December 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
December 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
December 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Alan Roth. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Inbar Wizman, Grain D'or LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf)
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Grain D'or LLC..(Roth, Richard)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Inbar Wizman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Grain D'or LLC..(Roth, Richard) Modified on 12/14/2021 (vf).
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roth, Richard)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Inbar Wizman. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25462524)Document filed by Grain D'or LLC..(Roth, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grain D'or LLC v. Wizman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grain D'or LLC
Represented By: Richard Alan Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inbar Wizman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?