Triad Holding Co., LLC et al v. Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Triad Holding Co., LLC, Regan R. Ronald and Ronald R. Regan
Defendant: Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc., AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C., doing business as AMA Group, DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P. and AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C. doing business as AMA Group
Case Number: 1:2021cv10695
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C., DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P., Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc...(Goldwater, Andrew)
February 7, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C., DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P., Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Catherine Berta).(Goldwater, Andrew)
January 6, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Initial Conference Order served on AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C. on 01/03/2022. Service was accepted by Vinny R. Document filed by Ronald R. Regan, Triad Holding Co., LLC..(Chociey, Edwin)
January 6, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Initial Conference Order served on DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P. on 12/29/2021. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares. Document filed by Ronald R. Regan, Triad Holding Co., LLC..(Chociey, Edwin)
January 6, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Initial Conference Order served on Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc. on 12/29/2021. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares. Document filed by Ronald R. Regan, Triad Holding Co., LLC..(Chociey, Edwin)
January 6, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 1/3/2022, answer due 2/7/2022. Service was accepted by Vinny R. Document filed by Triad Holding Co., LLC; Ronald R. Regan..(Chociey, Edwin)
January 6, 2022 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P. served on 12/16/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares. Document filed by Triad Holding Co., LLC; Ronald R. Regan..(Chociey, Edwin)
January 6, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc. served on 12/16/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares. Document filed by Triad Holding Co., LLC; Ronald R. Regan..(Chociey, Edwin)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, through their undersigned counsel, that the time for defendants Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc., AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C., doing business as AMA Group, and DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned matter is extended to and including February 7, 2022. SO ORDERED. AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C. answer due 2/7/2022; DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P. answer due 2/7/2022; Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc. answer due 2/7/2022. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/5/2022) (ate)
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C., DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P., Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc...(Goldwater, Andrew)
December 28, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C...(pc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Ronald R. Regan, Triad Holding Co., LLC..(Chociey, Edwin)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This conference will be held via telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Plaintiffs are ordered to serve Defendants with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/22/2021) (tg) Modified on 12/22/2021 (tg).
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C. (vf)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P. (vf)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc.. (vf)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Ronald R. Regan, Triad Holding Co., LLC..(Chociey, Edwin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Ronald R. Regan, Triad Holding Co., LLC.(Chociey, Edwin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Ronald R. Regan, Triad Holding Co., LLC.(Chociey, Edwin)
December 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edwin Francis Chociey, Jr.. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State). (sj)
December 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edwin Francis Chociey, Jr.,. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
December 15, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
December 15, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edwin Francis Chociey, Jr.. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ronald R. Regan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
December 15, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chociey, Edwin)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C., doing business as AMA Group, DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P., Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25468477)Document filed by Triad Holding Co., LLC, Regan R. Ronald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Working Capital Adjustment Agreement, #2 Exhibit Riker Letter to AMA and DCCP, #3 Exhibit A&P Response to Riker Letter, #4 Exhibit Second Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit Third Demand Letter).(Chociey, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triad Holding Co., LLC et al v. Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triad Holding Co., LLC
Represented By: Edwin Francis Chociey, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regan R. Ronald
Represented By: Edwin Francis Chociey, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R. Regan
Represented By: Edwin Francis Chociey, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triad Consulting Engineers Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C., doing business as AMA Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC Capital Partners Fund II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMA Consulting Engineers, P.C. doing business as AMA Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?