Lord v. Accenture LLP
Plaintiff: Mariann Lord
Defendant: Accenture L.L.P.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10875
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Filing 54 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #43 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. . Document filed by Mariann Lord..(Console, Kevin)
February 14, 2022 Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #52 Letter filed by Mariann Lord. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED -- although the Court will consider the sur-reply only to the extent that it actually responds to new arguments made in the reply. Plaintiff shall promptly file her sur-reply on the docket. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/14/2022) (ate)
February 11, 2022 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from KEVIN CONSOLE dated FEBRUARY 11, 2022 re: LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY. Document filed by Mariann Lord. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Console, Kevin)
February 4, 2022 Filing 51 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #43 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. . Document filed by Accenture L.L.P...(Smith, Brian)
January 28, 2022 Filing 50 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #43 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. . Document filed by Mariann Lord. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A-B).(Console, Kevin)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Tiana E. Pequette to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Michael P. Roche to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
January 21, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #47 MOTION for Tiana E. Pequette to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25614371. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 21, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #46 MOTION for Michael P. Roche to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25614153. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 20, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for Tiana E. Pequette to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25614371. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accenture L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tiana E. Pequette with Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Pequette, Tiana)
January 20, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Michael P. Roche to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25614153. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accenture L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael P. Roche with Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Roche, Michael)
January 14, 2022 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Yvette M. Molina in Support re: #43 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action.. Document filed by Accenture L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Offer Letter and Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 2012 Employment Agreement).(Smith, Brian)
January 14, 2022 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #43 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. . Document filed by Accenture L.L.P...(Smith, Brian)
January 14, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. Document filed by Accenture L.L.P...(Smith, Brian)
December 21, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Aubrey Smith on behalf of Accenture L.L.P...(Smith, Brian)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: On December 20, 2021, this case was assigned to the undersigned. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file any motion to compel arbitration no later than January 14, 2022. Plaintiff shall file any opposition no later than January 28, 2022, and Defendant shall file any reply no later than February 4, 2022. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 1/14/2022. Responses due by 1/28/2022 Replies due by 2/4/2022. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/20/2021) (kv)
December 20, 2021 Filing 40 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey; Case Number: 1:21-cv-08646. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
December 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
December 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
December 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
December 20, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/16/2021. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
December 17, 2021 Filing 38 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/16/2021. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION & ORDER Granting #34 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 12/16/2021. (rtm, ) Modified on 12/17/2021 (rtm, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
December 17, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 36 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ACCENTURE LLP re #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery (DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MARIANN LORD re #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CONSOLE, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #34 MOTION to Stay Discovery. Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay Discovery by ACCENTURE LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Kerry C. Donovan in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/15/2021. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone conference on September 15, 2021; and Kevin Console, Esquire, having appeared on behalf of Plaintiff; and Kerry C. Donovan, Esquire, and Michael P. Roche, Esquire, having appeared on behalf of Defendant; and the Court having received and reviewed the parties submissions regarding leave to file a motion to stay [ECF Nos. 30, 32]; and the Court having discussed the same with the parties; it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants request for leave to file a motion to stay [ECF No. 30] is GRANTED. Defendants motion shall be filed by September 24, 2021. Discovery is STAYED pending the disposition of the motion. The telephone status conference scheduled for September 22, 2021, is ADJOURNED until further notice of the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/15/21. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 32 Letter from Kevin Console, Esquire re #30 Letter. (CONSOLE, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER: The Court having received and reviewed Defendant Accenture LLP`s August 25, 2021 correspondence [ECF No. 30] submitted by Kerry C. Donovan, Esquire; it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant`s letter by, September 8, 2021. The Court will have a telephone hearing on September 15, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. to address whether discovery should be stayed pending a ruling on Defendant`s pending motion to change venue for purposes of compelling arbitration. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-278-0296 Access Code 2961061#.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/30/21. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 30 Letter from Defendant Accenture LLP to request leave to file a motion to stay discovery. (DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/16/21. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.] Modified on 12/20/2021 (sjo).
August 13, 2021 Filing 28 Letter from Kevin Console, Esquire. (Attachments: #1 Appendix S)(CONSOLE, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 27 STATEMENT Regarding ESI Discovery by MARIANN LORD. (CONSOLE, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Filing 26 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by MARIANN LORD. (CONSOLE, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tiana Evans Pequette to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12691773.) (DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael P. Roche to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12691716.) (DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Filing 23 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by ACCENTURE LLP. (DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL P. ROCHE and TIANA EVANS PEQUETTE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tiana Evans Pequette, Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 on each admission, payable to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/2/2021. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael P. Roche, Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 on each admission, payable to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/2/2021. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/22/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2021. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 1/28/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/13/2022, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/28/2021. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held by telephone on 7/27/2021. Scheduling order to be entered (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #19 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ACCENTURE LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Kerry C. Donovan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certification of Michael P. Roche, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certification of Tiana Evans Pequette, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by LANE JUSTIN SCHIFF on behalf of MARIANN LORD (SCHIFF, LANE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/6/21. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Court having received and reviewed the July 1, 2021, correspondence [ECF No. 15] submitted on behalf of Defendant by Kerry C. Donovan, Esquire, seeking an adjournment of the initial scheduling conference; and the Court having been advised that Plaintiff does not consent to the request; it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants request is DENIED. All issues relating to a discovery stay will be addressed at the initial scheduling conference on July 27, 2021. The parties are reminded to submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The plan shall be submitted via email to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/2/21. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 15 Letter from Accenture LLP to request adjournment of Rule 16 conference scheduled for July 27, 2021 re 14 Order,. (DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER : The initial scheduling conference on July 27, 2021 at 10:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be submitted via email to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/24/21. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Initial Conference set for 7/27/2021 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/23/2021. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by ACCENTURE LLP.(DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ACCENTURE LLP re #7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York, (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Kerry C. Donovan, #2 Exhibit A)(DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Letter-request: Reply brief due 6/11/2021. So Ordered by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/27/2021. (lm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Accenture to request 10-day extension to file Defendant's reply brief, currently due on June 1, 2021 re #7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York,, #8 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion. (DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MARIANN LORD re #7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(CONSOLE, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York, by ACCENTURE LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Kerry C. Donovan, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACCENTURE LLP identifying ACCENTURE PLC as Corporate Parent.. (DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KERRY C DONOVAN on behalf of ACCENTURE LLP (DONOVAN, KERRY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ACCENTURE LLP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/22/2021. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York,. Motion set for 6/7/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill no longer assigned to case. (mmb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARIANN LORD. ACCENTURE LLP waiver sent on 4/9/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (CONSOLE, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACCENTURE LLP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACCENTURE LLP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12352477) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARIANN LORD.(CONSOLE, KEVIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lord v. Accenture LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariann Lord
Represented By: Lane Justin Schiff
Represented By: Kevin Console
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accenture L.L.P.
Represented By: Kerry C Donovan
Represented By: Kerry Donovan
Represented By: Brian Aubrey Smith
Represented By: Michael P. Roche
Represented By: Tiana Pequette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?