Goodman v. Bouzy et al
Plaintiff: Jason Goodman
Defendant: Christopher Ellis Bouzy, Bot Sentiel, Inc. and George Webb Sweigert
Case Number: 1:2021cv10878
Filed: December 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James L Cott
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for #59 Report and Recommendations, #51 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #55 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #36 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Jason Goodman, #50 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Jason Goodman. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Sweigert's motion to dismiss, DENIES D.G.'s motion to intervene, and DENIES all pending motions for judicial notice. By January 3, 2023, Goodman shall file an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 36, 5051, and 55. The Clerk of Court is also directed to terminate George Webb Sweigert as a defendant. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/2023.), George Webb Sweigert terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/13/2022) (kv)
December 13, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 82. Mailed to: Jason Goodman 252 7th Avenue Apt. 6S New York, NY 10001. (dsh)
December 12, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE of Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 12.1 re: #78 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Bot Sentiel, Inc., Christopher Ellis Bouzy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 56).(Berlin, Seth)
December 12, 2022 Filing 80 DECLARATION of Seth D. Berlin in Support re: #78 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Bot Sentiel, Inc., Christopher Ellis Bouzy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Twitter Direct Message, #2 Exhibit 2- Twitter Post, #3 Exhibit 3 - Transcript of Telephone Call).(Berlin, Seth)
December 12, 2022 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #78 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Bot Sentiel, Inc., Christopher Ellis Bouzy..(Berlin, Seth)
December 12, 2022 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Bot Sentiel, Inc., Christopher Ellis Bouzy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Berlin, Seth)
December 12, 2022 Filing 77 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bot Sentiel, Inc., Christopher Ellis Bouzy..(Berlin, Seth)
December 9, 2022 Filing 76 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from J. Goodman, dated 12/9/22 re: Pursuant to your individual rules of practice, I write to express my concern about the prejudicial nature of the decision in the Memorandum Endorsement of ECF #75 etc. The defendants should be compelled to show cause for their failure to answer the Complaint timely and, absent good cause, this case should proceed directly to an inquest etc. Document filed by Jason Goodman.(sc)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #68 Letter filed by Christopher Ellis Bouzy, Bot Sentiel, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: By December 12, 2022, Defendants shall respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Bot Sentiel, Inc. answer due 12/12/2022; Christopher Ellis Bouzy answer due 12/12/2022. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/8/2022) (tg)
December 8, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 75. Mailed to: Jason Goodman 252 7th Avenue Apt. 6S New York, NY 10001. (dsh)
December 7, 2022 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Safe Harbor Notice and Notice for Sanctions Purs. to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 11, served on Seth Berlin, Esq., Counsel for Defendants on 12/6/22. Service was made by via email to Berlin@ballardspahr.com, MishkinM@ballardspahr.com; and by UPS TO C. Bouzy and Bot Sentinel. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth D. Berlin on behalf of Bot Sentiel, Inc., Christopher Ellis Bouzy..(Berlin, Seth)
November 30, 2022 Filing 72 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to CHRISTOPHER ELLIS BOUZY and BOT SENTINEL INC.(km)
November 30, 2022 Filing 71 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
November 28, 2022 Filing 70 AFFIRMATION of Jason Goodman IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
November 28, 2022 ***NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: RE-FILE Document No. 69 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default does not match your proofs of service. The information on the certificate needs to match the proofs of service. The supporting document was not submitted. Please refer to ECF Rule 16.1. (km)
November 23, 2022 Filing 69 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 11/28/2022 (km).
November 23, 2022 Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Seth D. Berlin dated November 23, 2022 re: Defendants Christopher Bouzy and Bot Sentinel Inc.. Document filed by Bot Sentiel, Inc., Christopher Ellis Bouzy..(Berlin, Seth)
November 23, 2022 Filing 67 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 11/23/2022 (km).
November 23, 2022 ***NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: RE-FILE Document No. #67 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default lists the wrong name(s) for the party(ies) who was/were served. The information on the certificate needs to match the proofs of service. The supporting document was not submitted. (km)
November 23, 2022 ***NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: RE-FILE Document No. #65 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default lists the wrong name(s) for the party(ies) who was/were served. The information on the certificate needs to match the proofs of service. (km)
November 22, 2022 Filing 66 LETTER from D.G. Sweigert, dated 11/22/22 re: As you know, Plaintiff Jason Goodman will appear on YouTube broadcase hosted by New York attorney, Nathaniel Broughty, a member of the New York Bar to discuss this "default." A previous YouTubevideo broadcast about this instant legal action claimed a "default judgment" had already been issued. Interestingly, Mr. Broughty is also in a legal action against the defendant, Christopher Bouzy in the USDC-NJ, Case #2:22cv6458(SDW). From ECF Doc. 21, it would appear that the Summons was returned unexecuted. Document filed by George Webb Sweigert.(sc)
November 22, 2022 Filing 65 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 11/23/2022 (km).
November 22, 2022 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #65 Affidavit. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sc)
November 21, 2022 Filing 64 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (Corrected)PROPOSED ORDER ENTERING FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT & PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT AND AWARDING PLAINTIFF DAMAGES & FEES & COSTS. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 11/21/2022 (km).
November 21, 2022 ***NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. regarding Document No. #64 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing is premature. You need to obtain a clerk's certificate of default first. Please refer to ECF Rule 16.1. (km)
November 21, 2022 ***NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Regarding Document No. #63 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The document is missing a So Ordered line, with a signature line for the Judge to sign. (km)
November 20, 2022 Filing 63 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - [PROPOSED] ORDER ENTERING A FINAL JUDGMENT & PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT AND AWARDING THE PLAINTIFF DAMAGES, FEES & COSTS. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 11/21/2022 (km).
November 20, 2022 Filing 62 PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, PERMANENT INJUNCTION, DAMAGES, FEES & COSTS re: #60 MOTION for Default Judgment as to. MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
November 20, 2022 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT(Affirmation)OF JASON GOODMAN in Support of re: #60 MOTION for Default Judgment as to. MOTION for Permanent Injunction.. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc) Modified on 11/21/2022 (sc).
November 20, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION for Default Judgment as to C. Bouzy and Bot Sentinel Inc., MOTION for Permanent Injunction, Damages & Fees. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(sc)
November 10, 2022 Filing 59 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: #51 MOTION REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE -ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST MULTIMEDIA SYSTEM DESIGN, INC., JASON GOODMAN, CHIEDF EXECUTIVE OFFICER., #55 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE BY PROPOSED INTERVENOR., #36 MOTION for the Court to t ake Judicial Notice of certain public documents containing facts relevant to this case and, in particular Plaintiff's opposition to defendant George Webb Sweigert's Motion to Dismiss. filed by Jason Goodman, #50 MOTION REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. filed by Jason Goodman. For the reasons stated herein, the Court should grant Sweigert's motion to dismiss at docket numbers 19 and 20, but Goodman should be given leave to amend his complaint against Sweigert. The Court should deny D.G. Sweigert's motion to intervene at docket number 25 as moot and deny the motions for judicial notice at docket numbers 36, 50, 51, and 55. Finally, the Court should direct Goodman to move for a default judgment against Bouzy and Bot Sentinel. Objections to R&R due by 11/25/2022 (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 11/10/2022) (jca)
November 10, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 59. Mailed to: Jason Goodman 252 7th Avenue Apt. 6S New York, NY 10001. (dsh)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Particular Motion: Motion to intervene, ECF No. 25; MTD, ECF Nos. 19-20; Motion to take judicial notice, ECF Nos. 36, 50-51, 55. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Motions referred to James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/9/2022) (kv)
November 9, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 58. Mailed to: Jason Goodman 252 7th Avenue Apt. 6S New York, NY 10001. (dsh)
October 20, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE TO THE CLERK OF RULE 41(a) WITHDRAWAL. Document filed by D.G. Sweigert, Proposed Intervenor. (sc)
October 9, 2022 Filing 56 PROPOSED INTERVENOR'S SUPPLEMENT(APPENDIX) TO ECF #45, Re: to #45 Affirmation in Opposition. (sc)
September 17, 2022 Filing 55 (Motion) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE BY PROPOSED INTERVENOR. Document filed by Proposed Intervenor, D.G. Sweigert. (sc) Modified on 9/19/2022 (sc).
September 6, 2022 Filing 54 PROPOSED INTERVENOR'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Docket filed by D. G. Sweigert, Proposed Intervenor. (sc) Modified on 9/7/2022 (sc).
July 20, 2022 Filing 53 PROPOSED INTERVENOR'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Documnent filed by D.G. Sweigert, proposed intervenor. (sc)
July 8, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 52. Mailed to: Jason Goodman 252 7th Avenue Apt. 6S New York, NY 10001. (dsh)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) Motion to Intervene. ECF No. 25, MTD, ECF No. 19-20; ECF No. 51. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Motions referred to James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/7/2022) (rro)
July 6, 2022 Filing 51 (Motion)REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE-ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST MULTIMEDIA SYSTEM DESIGN, INC., JASON GOODMAN, CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER. Document filed by D. G. Sweigert, Proposed Intervenor (sc) Modified on 7/6/2022 (sc). Modified on 7/6/2022 (sc).
July 5, 2022 Filing 50 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST(Motion) FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Document filed by Jason Goodman.(sc)
June 24, 2022 Filing 49 CORRECTED SUPPLEMENT(Appendix) TO ECF NO. 45(REPLACES ECF 48), re: to #45 Affirmation in Opposition. (sc)
June 23, 2022 Filing 48 SUPPLEMENT(Appendix) TO ECF NO.45, re: to #45 Affirmation in Opposition. (sc)
June 23, 2022 Filing 47 REPLY TO RESPONSE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS - MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING IF CASE IS NOT DISMISSED. Document filed by George Webb Sweigert. (sc)
June 21, 2022 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Opposition(Affirmation), served on Jason Goodman, Crowdsource the Truth; Christorpher Bouzy/Bot Sentinel; George Webb Sweigert on 6/21/22. Service was made by to Jason Goodman via email: truth@crowdsourcethetruth.com; to C. Bouzy/Bot Sentinel via email: press@botsentinel.com; to George W. Sweigert via email: Georg.webb@gmail.com. (sc)
June 21, 2022 Filing 45 AMENDED OPPOSITION(Affirmation of D.G. Sweigert)TO PLAINTIFF JASON GOODMAN'S DOCUMENT ECF #33, REPLACES DOC. 38(VOLUME OF EXHIBITS ECF 40), re: #33 Affirmation in Opposition. (sc)
June 14, 2022 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Opposition to Non-party Movant's Motion to Intervene, Proof of Service of Process on C. Bouzy and Bot Sentinel Inc., Request for Judicial Notice, Related Case Statement, served on David G. Sweigert on 6/14/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
June 14, 2022 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Opposition to Non-party Movant's Motion to Intervene, Proof of Service of Process on C. Bouzy and Bot Sentinel Inc., Request for Judicial Notice, Related Case Statement, served on C. Bouzy, Bot Sentinel, on 6/14/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
June 14, 2022 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Opposition to Non-party Movant's Motion to Intervene, Proof of Service of Process on C. Bouzy and Bot Sentinel Inc., Request for Judicial Notice, Related Case Statement, served on George Webb Sweigert on 6/14/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
June 14, 2022 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Opposition to Non-party Movant's Motion to Intervene, Proof of Service of Process on C. Bouzy and Bot Sentinel Inc., Request for Judicial Notice, Related Case Statement, served on David G. Sweigert on 6/14/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
June 13, 2022 Filing 40 VOLUME OF EXHIBITS UNDER SEPARATE FILING. Document filed by D. G. Sweigert, Proposed Intervenor. (sc)
June 13, 2022 Filing 39 RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
June 13, 2022 Filing 38 (Affirmation of D. George Sweigert)OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF JASON GOODMAN'S DOCUMENT ECF NO. 33(VOLUME OF EXHIBITS UNDER SEPARATE FILING), re: #33 Affirmation in Opposition. Document filed by D. G. Sweigert, Proposed Intervenor. (sc)
June 13, 2022 Filing 37 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
June 13, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION, re: for the Court to take Judicial Notice of certain public documents containing facts relevant to this case and, in particular, Plaintiff's opposition to defendant George Webb Sweigert's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Jason Goodman.(sc)
June 9, 2022 Filing 35 PROOF(Certificate() OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint, served on Christopher Bouzy, Bot Sentinel, Inc. on 1/15/22. Service was accepted by (affixing to the door of Bouzy's residence/place of business for Bot Sentinel). Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc) Modified on 6/10/2022 (sc).
June 9, 2022 Filing 34 (Affirmation of Jason Goodman)PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, re: #19 Remark. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
June 9, 2022 Filing 33 (Affirmation of Jason Goodman)PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY MOVANT DAVID GEORGE SWEIGERT'S MOTION TO INTERVENE, re: #29 Appendix, #27 Letter. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
June 1, 2022 Filing 32 PROPOSED INTERVENOR'S SUPPLEMENT(Appendix) TO ECF NO. 27, re: #27 Letter. Document filed by D.G. Sweigert, Proposed Intervenor(sc) Modified on 6/1/2022 (sc).
May 23, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 30-31. Mailed to: Jason Goodman 252 7th Avenue Apt. 6S New York, NY 10001. (dsh)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) Particular Motion: Motion to intervene, ECF No. 25, MTD, ECF No. 19-20. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/20/2022) (kv)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: To date, no answer, motion, or other response has been filed by either of these defendants. Given these circumstances, the Court hereby orders as follows: 1.Plaintiff Goodman is directed to respond to defendant Sweigert's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction by June 10, 2022. Any reply papers will be due by June 24, 2022. 2.Plaintiff Goodman is directed to respond to nonparty D.G. Sweigerts application to intervene by June 10, 2022. Any reply papers will be due by June 24, 2022. 3.As noted, it is not clear whether defendants Bouzy and Bot Sentinel have been properly served, as it appears the only service was made bymail and not by personal service. To the extent plaintiff Goodman is seeking to serve these defendants electronically, any application to that effect, or any other information supporting the fact that service was properly made, should be submitted to the Court no later than June10, 2022. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 6/10/2022, Replies due by 6/24/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 5/20/2022) (jca)
May 4, 2022 Filing 29 PROPOSED INTERVENOR'S SUPPLEMENT TO ECF #27, re: APPENDIX to #27 Letter. Document filed by D.G. Sweigert. (sc)
April 27, 2022 Filing 28 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by George Webb Sweigert. USCA Case Number 22-40. Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 4/27/2022..(nd)
April 20, 2022 Filing 27 CORRECTED LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from D. G. Sweigert, dated 4/20/22 re: I write to protect my interests to a professional reputation as a computer security expert. I seek to intervene in this action pursuant to Rule 24 as a co-plaintiff etc. (sc)
April 19, 2022 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from D. G. Sweigert, dated 4/19/22 re: I write as a potential intervenor. I write to protect my interests to a professional reputation as a computer security expert; and I seek to intervene in this action pursuant to Rule 24 as a co-Plaintiff etc. (sc)
April 13, 2022 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from D. G. Sweigert, dated 4/13/22 re: I write on behalf of myself, a non-attorney pro se potential intervenor. I write to protect my interest to a professional reputation as a computer security expert. I seek to intervene in this action pursuant to Rule 24 etc. Document filed by George Webb Sweigert.(sc)
April 7, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Related Case Statement; served on C. Bouzy, Bot Sentinel, and George W. Sweigert on 4/7/22. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
April 7, 2022 Filing 23 RELATED CASE STATEMENT, re: - Defendants have been served, and Sweigert has acknowledged service but no Notice of Appearance for Christopher Bouzy or Bot Sentinel has been entered. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
March 21, 2022 Filing 22 JUDICIAL NOTICE, re: of a related filing in an unrelated litigation pertaining to an order from Judge Valerie Caproni of the USDC-SDNY in The National Academy of Television Arts & Sciences et al. v. Multimedia System Design, Inc. See Case 1:20cv7269 -VEC-OTW ECF #156. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
February 7, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Bot Sentiel, Inc. served on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022; Christopher Ellis Bouzy, served on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022. Service was made by Cert. Mail. Document filed by Bot Sentiel, Inc.; Christopher Ellis Bouzy. (sc)
January 13, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE TO CLERK OF COURT, GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT, DENIAL OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, LIMITS OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS PURS. TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(2). Document filed by George Webb Sweigert. (sc)
January 10, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION OF ERRATA IN COURT DOCUMENTS BY GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT. Document filed by George Webb Sweigert. (sc)
January 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #14 Order. Document filed by George Webb Sweigert. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Jason Goodman 252 7th Avenue Apt. 6S New York, NY 10001, at, on 1/5/2022 Re: #15 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (aan)
January 5, 2022 Appeal Fee Due: for #18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Appeal fee due by 1/19/2022. (tp)
January 5, 2022 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by George Webb Sweigert were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
January 5, 2022 Appeal Remark as to #18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by George Webb Sweigert. IFP Denied 01/04/2022. (tp)
January 5, 2022 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/4/2022) (kv)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants Christopher Ellis Bouzy; Bot Sentinel, Inc.; and George Webb Sweigert. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/4/2022) (kv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Nonparty David George Sweigert has filed a number of documents, including a notice of related litigation, two declarations, an "amicus curiae brief," and two affidavits. No. 21-CV-10878, Docs. 2-8. Nonparties are not permitted to file documents in a case unless they have been granted permission to intervene under Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because David George Sweigert is a nonparty, and he has not been granted permission to file documents in this case, the Clerk of Court is directed to strike these documents from the docket. (ECF Nos. 2-8.) The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff Jason Goodman and to David George Sweigert and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/4/2022) (kv)
January 4, 2022 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #14 Order,,,,, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing..(kv)
January 4, 2022 Mailed a copy of #14 Order to Jason Goodman at 252 7th Avenue, Apt. 6S, New York, NY 10001; and to David George Sweigert at 209 St. Simons Cove, Peachtree, GA 30269-4201. (kh)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Webb Sweigert, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christopher Ellis Bouzy, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bot Sentinel, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jason Goodman. (sc)
January 3, 2022 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2022 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2022 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2022 Mailed a copy of Summons Issued to Jason Goodman at 252 7th Avenue, Apt. 6S, New York, NY 10001. (sha)
January 3, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bot Sentiel, Inc., Christopher Ellis Bouzy, George Webb Sweigert. (sha)
December 30, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT(Affirmation) of George Webb Sweigert IN SUPPORT OF DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR CONSPIRACY - TO DEFAME. Document filed by George Webb Sweigert. (sc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 8 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #8 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #14 Order. AFFIDAVIT(Affirmation)IN SUPPORT OF DISMISSAL/ CONSPIRACY TO DEFAME. Document filed by George Webb Sweigert. (sc) Modified on 1/4/2022 (kv).
December 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
December 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #7 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #14 Order. AFFIDAVIT(Affirmation) of George Webb Sweigert IN SUPPORT OF DISMISSAL/CONSPIRACY TO DEFAME. Document filed by George Webb Sweigert. (sc) Modified on 1/4/2022 (kv).
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #6 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #14 Order. DECLARATION of George Webb Sweigert-DENIAL OF JURISDICTION PURS. TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(2). Document filed by George Webb Sweigert. (sc) Modified on 1/4/2022 (kv).
December 24, 2021 Filing 5 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #5 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #14 Order. AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF BY NON-PARTY D. GEORGE SWEIGERT. (sc) Modified on 1/4/2022 (kv).
December 24, 2021 Filing 4 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #4 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #14 Order. DECLARATION OF NON-PARTY D. GEORGE SWEIGERT. Attached as exhibits are true and accurate copies of pleadings and Internet artifacts. (sc) Modified on 12/27/2021 (sc). Modified on 1/4/2022 (kv).
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #3 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #14 Order. DECLARATION OF NON-PARTY D. GEORGE SWEIGERT. (sc) Modified on 1/4/2022 (kv).
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #2 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #14 Order. NOTICE OF RELATED LITIGATION. Document filed by George Webb Sweigert. (sc) Modified on 1/4/2022 (kv).
December 22, 2021 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: Check $402.00 processed by the Finance Department on 12/22/2021, Receipt Number 465401291096. (jcf)
December 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bot Sentiel, Inc., Christopher Ellis Bouzy, George Webb Sweigert. Document filed by Jason Goodman..(rdz)
December 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman v. Bouzy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ellis Bouzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bot Sentiel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Webb Sweigert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?