Brown v. Building Engines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Defendant: Building Engines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10893
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 jd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The above-referenced action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron for general pretrial management, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions and settlement, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). All pretrial motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and discovery, must be made to Judge Aaron and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-stewart-d-aaron. An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Wednesday, March 30, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. The conference shall be conducted by telephone. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (888) 278- 0296 (or (214) 765-0479) and enter access code 6489745. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 2/16/2022) (js)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Emily S. Kimmelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Emily S. Kimmelman for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 2/16/2022) (kl)
February 16, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Emily S. Kimmelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25734976. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 15, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Emily S. Kimmelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25734976. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Building Engines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 PA COGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Kimmelman, Emily)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian A. Herman on behalf of Building Engines, Inc...(Herman, Brian)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jones Lang LaSalle, Inc. for Building Engines, Inc.. Document filed by Building Engines, Inc...(Herman, Brian)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/14/2022) (va)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Building Engines, Inc. waiver sent on 12/22/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. Document filed by Michael Brown..(Levine, Bonnie)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Building Engines, Inc...(pc)
December 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bonnie Levine. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,500,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,500,000; the County code has been modified to Kings;. (pc)
December 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Building Engines, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Brown..(Levine, Bonnie)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levine, Bonnie)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Building Engines, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-25491256)Document filed by Michael Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Building Engines June 7 2021 Announcement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mutual Confidentiality and Non-disclosure Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - JLL Oct 21 2021 Press Release Announcing Building Engines Strategic Acquisition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Building Engines Nov 30 2021 Announcement).(Levine, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Building Engines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Represented By: Bonnie Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Engines, Inc.
Represented By: Brian A. Herman
Represented By: Emily Kimmelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?