Desroseris v. Summit Security Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Desroseris
Defendant: Summit Security Services, Inc. and Allied Universal Security Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv10941
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joseph Desroseris..(Wolin, Alan)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joseph Desroseris..(Wolin, Alan)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Allied Universal Security Services, LLC served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022; Summit Security Services, Inc. served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Joseph Desroseris..(Wolin, Alan)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allied Universal Security Services, LLC, Summit Security Services, Inc...(pc)
December 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alan Edward Wolin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Allied Universal Security Services, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Summit Security Services, Inc. and Allied Universal Security Services, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Desroseris..(Wolin, Alan)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wolin, Alan)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied Universal Security Services, LLC, Summit Security Services, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25497519)Document filed by Joseph Desroseris..(Wolin, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desroseris v. Summit Security Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Desroseris
Represented By: Alan Edward Wolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Security Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Universal Security Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?