RWS and Associates Entertainment, Inc. v. Iron, Wood & Glitter, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RWS AND ASSOCIATES ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Defendant: IRON, WOOD & GLITTER, LLC, d/b/a IWG PRODUCTIONS, RYAN PALMER, JEREMY WOOD and Iron, Wood & Glitter, LLC doing business as IWG Productions
Case Number: 1:2021cv10955
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meghan Travers Meade on behalf of RWS and Associates Entertainment, Inc...(Meade, Meghan)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of 12/22/2021 Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on All Defendants on 12/27/2021. Service was accepted by Matthew Lockaby (Lockaby PLLC). Service was made by Electronic Mail (Signed Waivers of Service for All Defendants Returned via Electronic Mail to Plaintiff's Counsel). Document filed by RWS and Associates Entertainment, Inc...(Barbatsuly, George)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jeremy Wood waiver sent on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022. Document filed by RWS and Associates Entertainment, Inc...(Barbatsuly, George)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ryan Palmer waiver sent on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022. Document filed by RWS and Associates Entertainment, Inc...(Barbatsuly, George)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Iron, Wood & Glitter, LLC waiver sent on 12/27/2021, answer due 2/25/2022. Document filed by RWS and Associates Entertainment, Inc...(Barbatsuly, George)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 5, 2022 at 4:45 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. (Initial Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/22/2021) (rro)
December 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney George Peter Barbatsuly. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: RWS AND ASSOCIATES ENTERTAINMENT, INC., IRON, WOOD & GLITTER, LLC, d/b/a IWG PRODUCTIONS, RYAN PALMER, JEREMY WOOD. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
December 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by RWS AND ASSOCIATES ENTERTAINMENT, INC...(Barbatsuly, George)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barbatsuly, George)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IRON, WOOD & GLITTER, LLC, d/b/a IWG PRODUCTIONS, RYAN PALMER, JEREMY WOOD. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25499383)Document filed by RWS AND ASSOCIATES ENTERTAINMENT, INC...(Barbatsuly, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RWS and Associates Entertainment, Inc. v. Iron, Wood & Glitter, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RWS AND ASSOCIATES ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: George Peter Barbatsuly
Represented By: Meghan Travers Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRON, WOOD & GLITTER, LLC, d/b/a IWG PRODUCTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY WOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron, Wood & Glitter, LLC doing business as IWG Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?