Energy Transportation Group, Inc. v. Borealis Maritime Limited
Plaintiff: Energy Transportation Group, Inc.
Defendant: Borealis Maritime Limited
Case Number: 1:2021cv10969
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so redesignated. (sjo)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah Saul Czarny on behalf of Borealis Maritime Limited..(Czarny, Noah)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jack Yoskowitz on behalf of Borealis Maritime Limited..(Yoskowitz, Jack)
February 2, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Borealis Maritime Limited waiver sent on 12/22/2021, answer due 3/22/2022. Document filed by Energy Transportation Group, Inc...(Clareman, Lloyd)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/4/2022) (kv)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/4/2022) (kv)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by March 7, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/4/2022) (kv)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Borealis Maritime Limited..(pc)
December 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Borealis Maritime Limited, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Energy Transportation Group, Inc...(Clareman, Lloyd)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Energy Transportation Group, Inc...(Clareman, Lloyd)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clareman, Lloyd)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Borealis Maritime Limited. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25500990)Document filed by Energy Transportation Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Revenue Sharing Agreement).(Clareman, Lloyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Transportation Group, Inc. v. Borealis Maritime Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Transportation Group, Inc.
Represented By: Lloyd S Clareman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borealis Maritime Limited
Represented By: Jack Yoskowitz
Represented By: Noah Saul Czarny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?