Ruchalski v. Skyline Windows, LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas Ruchalski
Defendant: Skyline Windows, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11004
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew R. Capobianco on behalf of Skyline Windows, LLC..(Capobianco, Matthew)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Skyline Windows, LLC waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. Document filed by Thomas Ruchalski..(Console, Kevin)
December 27, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 27, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Console, Kevin)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Skyline Windows, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25504514)Document filed by Thomas Ruchalski..(Console, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruchalski v. Skyline Windows, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ruchalski
Represented By: Kevin Console
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Windows, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?