United King Film Distribution Ltd et al v. Does 1-10 d/b/a Israel.tv
Plaintiff: United King Film Distribution Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Charlton Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd and Keshet Broadcasting Ltd
Defendant: Does 1-10 d/b/a Israel.tv
Case Number: 1:2021cv11024
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Referring Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Does 1-10 d/b/a Israel.tv served on 1/24/2021, answer due 2/14/2021. Service was made by Email, as per OSC (Dkt. # 19). Document filed by Keshet Broadcasting Ltd ; United King Film Distribution Ltd; Charlton Ltd; HOT Communication Systems Ltd; D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd; Reshet Media Ltd., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of OSC dated 1/19/2022 and documents in support thereof served on Does 1-10, d/b/a Israel.tv on January 24, 2022. Service was made by Email, as per OSC (Dkt. # 19). Document filed by Keshet Broadcasting Ltd ; United King Film Distribution Ltd; Charlton Ltd; HOT Communication Systems Ltd; D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd; Reshet Media Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-copies of service via "Contact Us" website page and by email).(Kaufman, Mark)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Does 1-10 d/b/a Israel.tv..(gp)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Does 1-10, d/b/a Israel.tv, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd..(Kaufman, Mark)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE granting #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery; granting #8 MOTION to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email and other electronic means. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for leave to take expedited discovery, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference, is GRANTED. Plaintiff may issue a Rule 45 subpoena to each of the vendors providing services to the website located at www.israel.tv (the Website) consisting of Google, Mycloud.my, Facebook, Name.com, Cloudflare, Visa, Mastercard, Roku, the Apple App Store, the Amazon.com App Store, Joel A. Boyle, and Jewella Privacy Service, Inc., to obtain the names, addresses, telephone numbers and email addresses of the operator and/or owners of the Website (the "Defendants"); and it is further ORDERED, that service of copies of the Courts Order, the Complaint, Summons, and Plaintiff's ex parte application (together with all supporting declarations and other documents) on the Defendants shall be deemed sufficient by providing a link to a folder on DropBox containing such court documents, and sending such link to Defendants through the Website's "Contact Us" customer support portal and through the email addresses info@israel.tv, support@israel.tv and israeltv.com@fab.JewellaPrivacy.com (and also attaching to the email copies of the Order, the Complaint and Summons) and to any other email address that become known to Plaintiffs by means of the above-described expedited discovery or associated with Defendants' business. Plaintiffs shall promptly file proof of such service. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 1/19/2022) (jca) Modified on 1/19/2022 (jca).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #18 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd. Related Document Number: [Dkt. #8]..(Kaufman, Mark) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 1/19/2022 (dt).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of Eran Presenti (Amended) in Support re: #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. MOTION to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email and other electronic means.. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Israeli Court Order dated Feb. 4, 2021, #2 Exhibit B - Israeli Court Order dated May 25, 2021, #3 Exhibit C - DomainTools Summary re: the Website, #4 Exhibit D - Visa payment and repayment, #5 Exhibit E - Nagra analysis of website, #6 Exhibit F - "Israel Radio" App on Apple App Store, #7 Exhibit G - OP Innovate report re: Joel Boyle, #8 Exhibit H - Fedex package to Turkey, returned, #9 Exhibit I - email response from info@israel.tv).(Kaufman, Mark)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Mark S. Kaufman in Support re: #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. MOTION to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email and other electronic means.. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Israel.tv Website home page, #3 Exhibit 3 - Israel.tv "Contact Us" website page, #4 Exhibit 4 - Amazon App Store for Israel.tv app, #5 Exhibit 5 - Israel.tv channel on Roku, #6 Exhibit 6 - Jewella to Kaufman email).(Kaufman, Mark)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Telephone Conference held on 1/14/2022 at 11:15 a.m. (rsh)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/10/2022) (vfr)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of David Schwegman, Ph.D in Support re: #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. MOTION to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email and other electronic means.. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Census Data Analysis).(Kaufman, Mark)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Robert Brake in Support re: #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. MOTION to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email and other electronic means.. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd..(Kaufman, Mark)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Noy Peretz in Support re: #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. MOTION to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email and other electronic means.. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screenshots of Charlton shows on Website, #2 Exhibit B - Screenshots of HOT shows on Website, #3 Exhibit C - Screenshots of Keshet shows on Website, #4 Exhibit D - Screenshots of Reshet shows on Website, #5 Exhibit E - Screenshots of United King shows on Website, #6 Exhibit F - Screenshots of YES shows on Website).(Kaufman, Mark)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Albertino Matalon in Support re: #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. MOTION to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email and other electronic means.. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email with NYC subscriber to infringing Website).(Kaufman, Mark)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Eran Presenti in Support re: #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. MOTION to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email and other electronic means.. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Israeli Court Order dated Feb. 4, 2021, #2 Exhibit B - Israeli Court Order dated May 25, 2021, #3 Exhibit C - DomainTools Summary re: the Website, #4 Exhibit D - Visa payment and repayment, #5 Exhibit E - Email response from info@israel.tv, #6 Exhibit F - FedEx package to address in Turkey, returned as undeliverable).(Kaufman, Mark)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. MOTION to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email and other electronic means. . Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd..(Kaufman, Mark)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Discovery., MOTION to Serve Summons and Complaint by Email and other electronic means. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark S. Kaufman dated 1/3/2022, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Israel.tv Website Home Page, #4 Exhibit 3- Israel.tv Website Contact Us page, #5 Exhibit 4- Jewella to Kaufman email, #6 Exhibit 5 - Israel TV channel on Roku).(Kaufman, Mark)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kaufman, Mark)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10 d/b/a Israel.tv. Document filed by Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Plaintiffs' Original Works, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Registered Copyrights).(Kaufman, Mark)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mark S. Kaufman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark S. Kaufman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Mark S. Kaufman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Origin and Jurisdiction were not selected. (pc)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kaufman, Mark) Modified on 12/27/2021 (pc).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Kaufman, Mark)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Charlton Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd..(Kaufman, Mark)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25506528)Document filed by Keshet Broadcasting Ltd, United King Film Distribution Ltd, Charlton Ltd, HOT Communication Systems Ltd, D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd, Reshet Media Ltd..(Kaufman, Mark) Modified on 12/27/2021 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United King Film Distribution Ltd et al v. Does 1-10 d/b/a Israel.tv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United King Film Distribution Ltd
Represented By: Mark S. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.B.S. Satellite Services (1998) Ltd
Represented By: Mark S. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOT Communication Systems Ltd
Represented By: Mark S. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlton Ltd
Represented By: Mark S. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reshet Media Ltd
Represented By: Mark S. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshet Broadcasting Ltd
Represented By: Mark S. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 d/b/a Israel.tv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?