In re: Google Digital Advertising Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc., Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Journal, Inc., ECENT Corporation, Clarksburg Publishing Company doing business as WV News, The State of Texas, State of Arkansas, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of Nevada, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Montana, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Flag Publications, Inc., Eagle Printing Company, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Gale Force Media, LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Kinin, Inc., Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Michael Devaney, Nicholas Arrieta, Sara Yberra, Michael Stellman, Mark J. Astarita, Organic Panaceas, LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Progressive, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, SkinnySchool LLC doing business as Maria Marques Fitness, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Multi Media Channels LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Times Journal, Inc., Rome News Media, LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Appen Media Group, Inc., Inform Inc. and Sunny Singh
Defendant: Google LLC, Alphabet Inc., Facebook Inc., Youtube, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., John Doe's 1-100, Meta Platforms Inc. and Gannett Co., Inc.
Interpleader: State of Louisiana and State of South Carolina
Interested Party: The Nation Company, L.P., Genius Media Group, Inc., Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Kimberly Negron and Shoshana Zuboff
Amicus Curiae: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 23 Media Organizations
Case Number: 1:2021md03010
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Filing 666 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/2/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 13, 2023 Filing 665 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 11/2/2023 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sadie Herbert, (212) 805-0310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/4/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2024.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ORDER: granting #660 Letter Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs' request for (a) three common custodians; (b) four custodians specific to plaintiff Daily Mail and five custodians specific to plaintiff Gannett is GRANTED. Those custodians are identified in Attachment B to Plaintiffs' October 20 submission (ECF No. 564). Plaintiffs' request that Google run an additional 10 search terms set forth in Attachment A to Plaintiffs' October 20 submission (ECF No. 564), except String No. 191, is GRANTED. and as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/02/2023) (ama)
November 2, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2023 re: #660 LETTER MOTION to Compel Search Terms and Custodians. Appearing for plaintiffs, John Thorne, Serina Marie Vash, Jordan Elias, Philip Korologos and Henry Kelston. Appearing for defendants, Robert McCallum and Eric Mahr. Court Reporter: Sadie Herbert. Court heard argument. Motion DE 660 granted. See Order, DE 664. (Court Reporter Sadie Herbert) (Nacanther, Florence)
November 1, 2023 Filing 662 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr dated 11/01/2023 re: Search Terms and Custodians. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Mahr, Eric)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER granting #659 Motion for Evan Rosin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
November 1, 2023 Filing 660 LETTER MOTION to Compel Search Terms and Custodians addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Discovery Steering Committee dated November 1, 2023. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Korologos, Philip)
October 31, 2023 Filing 659 MOTION for Evan Rosin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Michigan Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Declaration in Support, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Rosin, Evan)
October 31, 2023 Filing 658 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Evan Rosin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28502586. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Michigan Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Declaration in Support).(Rosin, Evan) Modified on 10/31/2023 (va).
October 31, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #658 FIRST MOTION for Evan Rosin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28502586. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (va)
October 31, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #659 MOTION for Evan Rosin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
October 27, 2023 Filing 663 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 23-910. Petitioner has filed a petition for a writ of mandamus. Respondents oppose. Also pending before the Court are Petitioner's motion for reconsideration of an applications judge's denial of its request to file a reply, Petitioner's motion for a stay, and Respondents' motion to vacate the administrative stay issued by an applications judge. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the mandamus petition is DENIED because Petitioner has not demonstrated that exceptional circumstances warrant the requested relief. See Cheney v. U.S. Dist. Court for Dist. of Columbia, 542 U.S. 367, 38081 (2004). It is further ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration is DENIED, the administrative stay is LIFTED, and the remaining motions are DENIED as moot.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 10/27/2023. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(nd)
October 27, 2023 Filing 657 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (623 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Gannett Co. Inc.'s Complaint., (24 in 1:23-cv-05177-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Gannett Co. Inc.'s Complaint. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc.(Delaware Corporation), Google LLC, Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER: The Court will conduct a conference in Courtroom 11D on November 2, 2023 at 2 p.m. Each side shall file in hard copy and email to Chambers in MS Word a proposed Order granting their requested relief and any other briefing it wishes the Court to consider by November 1 at 11 a.m. and as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 11/2/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/25/2023) (ama)
October 24, 2023 Filing 655 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Discovery Steering Committee dated October 24, 2023 re: error in October 20, 2023 letter. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Korologos, Philip)
October 20, 2023 Filing 654 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Discovery Steering Committee dated October 20, 2023 re: update to Court in response to Court Order (dkt. 634) and request for briefing schedule. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Korologos, Philip)
October 20, 2023 Filing 653 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated 10/20/2023 re: Custodian and Search Term Negotiations. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
October 20, 2023 Filing 652 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #628 MOTION to Dismiss ("Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of the Singh v. Google LLC Complaint."). . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
October 20, 2023 Filing 651 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (625 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Singh Complaint., (22 in 1:23-cv-03651-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Singh Complaint. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Alphabet Inc.(Delaware Corporation). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-03651-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
October 19, 2023 Filing 650 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (623 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Gannett Co. Inc.'s Complaint., (24 in 1:23-cv-05177-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Gannett Co. Inc.'s Complaint. . Document filed by Gannett Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC.(Thorne, John)
October 19, 2023 Filing 649 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeanette Bayoumi on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Bayoumi, Jeanette)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER: granting (645) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (28) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:23-cv-05177-PKC. Application for leave to file amended opposition is Granted. Google may reply by October 27, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/18/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC (ama)
October 19, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 10/27/2023. Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC(ama)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the October 6, 2023 letter request of Inform Inc. ("Inform") (ECF 636) and the response of Google LLC, Alphabet Inc. and YouTube LLC (collectively "Google"). (ECF 646.) Inform seeks to propound additional requests for production of documents and data ("RFPs"). Essential to the efficient management of this MDL is ensuring that discovery is closely coordinated, lest each plaintiff serve its own overlapping requests on its own timeline. The present application is denied without prejudice to Inform proceeding in the following manner: Inform may file draft RFPs on ECF that (1) do not overlap with other RFPs previously served in this MDL; (2) are unique to Inform's status as an online video platform that, in its view, competes with YouTube; and (3) meet the proportionality and other requirements of Rule 26, with a letter explaining why the RFPs satisfy these three requirements. Within seven days, Google shall state the grounds for any objection to the service of the requests, without prejudice to its right to later assert specific objections permitted under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court will then decide whether Inform may serve the requests. The parties are encouraged to meet and confer to narrow areas of disagreement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/18/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-01530-PKC (tg)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER granting #644 Motion for Maureen Kane Berg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 17, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #644 MOTION for Maureen Kane Berg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
October 16, 2023 Filing 645 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Opposition to Google's Partial Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne dated 10/16/2023. Document filed by Gannett Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Opposition, #2 Exhibit B - Redline Opposition & Amended Opposition)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC.(Thorne, John)
October 16, 2023 Filing 644 MOTION for Maureen Kane Berg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by SPX Total Body Fitness LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MN Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit IL Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Declaration Supporting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Berg, Maureen)
October 15, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #643 MOTION for Maureen Kane Berg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28422468. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
October 13, 2023 Filing 643 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - MOTION for Maureen Kane Berg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28422468. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by SPX Total Body Fitness LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Minnesota Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Illinois Supreme Court, #3 Exhibit Declaration Supporting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Berg, Maureen) Modified on 10/15/2023 (vba).
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 23-0910. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the mandamus petition is DENIED because Petitioner has not demonstrated that exceptional circumstances warrant the requested relief. See Cheney v. U.S. Dist. Court for Dist. of Columbia, 542 U.S. 367, 38081 (2004). It is further ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration is DENIED, the administrative stay is LIFTED, and the remaining motions are DENIED as moot. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 10/11/2023. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC. (tp)
October 10, 2023 Filing 641 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated October 10, 2023 re: (636) Letter re Leave to Serve a Supplemental Discovery Request. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Youtube L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-01530-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER granting #635 Motion for Marc B. Collier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 6, 2023 Filing 639 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (623 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Gannett Co. Inc.'s Complaint., (24 in 1:23-cv-05177-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Gannett Co. Inc.'s Complaint. . Document filed by Gannett Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC.(Thorne, John)
October 6, 2023 Filing 638 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (625 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Singh Complaint., (22 in 1:23-cv-03651-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Singh Complaint. . Document filed by Sunny Singh. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-03651-PKC.(Sharp, Dena)
October 6, 2023 Filing 637 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (628 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss ("Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of the Singh v. Google LLC Complaint."). . Document filed by Sunny Singh. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-03651-PKC.(Sharp, Dena)
October 6, 2023 Filing 636 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated October 6, 2023 re: Leave to Serve a Supplemental Discovery Request. Document filed by Inform Inc...(Vash, Serina)
October 6, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #635 MOTION for Marc B. Collier to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the State of Texas. Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (va)
September 29, 2023 Filing 635 MOTION for Marc B. Collier to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the State of Texas. Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit In Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Collier, Marc) Modified on 9/29/2023 (sgz). Modified on 10/3/2023 (va).
September 29, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Fee Due: for #635 MOTION for Marc B. Collier to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the State of Texas. Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. (sgz)
September 29, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #635 MOTION for Marc B. Collier to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the State of Texas. Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28358845..(Collier, Marc)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER. To avoid interference with the schedule in the Eastern District of Virginia, the Court will direct that Google and the plaintiffs DSC meet and confer on the open issues described relating to search terms and custodians and submit the resolution-or the outstanding issues in dispute-to this Court by October 20, 2023. Google claims it needs "advance notice of the specific issues Plaintiffs wish to discuss" so that it may have appropriate individuals attend. Plaintiffs' DSC shall provide such a letter by October 6, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/26/23) (yv)
September 25, 2023 Filing 633 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (592 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Inform Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint., (77 in 1:23-cv-01530-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Inform Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Youtube L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-01530-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
September 22, 2023 Filing 632 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated 09/22/2023 re: #631 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: status of Discovery addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Discovery Steering Committee dated 09/20/2023. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
September 20, 2023 Filing 631 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: status of Discovery addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Discovery Steering Committee dated 09/20/2023. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Korologos, Philip)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER granting #621 Motion for Caroline P. Boisvert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 8, 2023 Filing 629 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #628 MOTION to Dismiss ("Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of the Singh v. Google LLC Complaint."). . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
September 8, 2023 Filing 628 MOTION to Dismiss ("Meta Platforms, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of the Singh v. Google LLC Complaint."). Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
September 8, 2023 Filing 627 DECLARATION of Courtney Shadd in Support re: #625 MOTION to Dismiss Singh Complaint.. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - September 2017 Terms).(Sessions, Justina)
September 8, 2023 Filing 626 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #625 MOTION to Dismiss Singh Complaint. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
September 8, 2023 Filing 625 MOTION to Dismiss Singh Complaint. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
September 8, 2023 Filing 624 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #623 MOTION to Dismiss Gannett Co. Inc.'s Complaint. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Table).(Sessions, Justina)
September 8, 2023 Filing 623 MOTION to Dismiss Gannett Co. Inc.'s Complaint. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
September 8, 2023 Filing 622 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claire Linnea Haws on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Haws, Claire)
September 8, 2023 Filing 621 MOTION for Caroline P. Boisvert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-28259130. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Caroline P. Boisvert, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC.(Boisvert, Caroline) Modified on 9/8/2023 (sgz).
September 8, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (22 in 1:23-cv-05177-PKC, 621 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 88 in 1:21-cv-03446-PKC) MOTION for Caroline P. Boisvert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28259130. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (88 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION for Mark A. Colantonio to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25051662. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC(sgz)
September 7, 2023 Filing 620 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Document filed by Alphabet Inc.(Delaware Corporation), Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sommer, Michael)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 619 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (616 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 79 in 1:23-cv-01530-PKC) Letter, filed by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Youtube L.L.C. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED., ( Replies due by 9/25/2023.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/07/2023) (ama)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 618 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: granting (614) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Stephen M. Hoeplinger and Stephen Mark Hoeplinger terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/07/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER granting #613 Motion for Joseph M. Graham, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 6, 2023 Filing 616 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated 09/06/2023 re: Seeking Clarification of Order Dated May 31, 2023 (ECF No. 562). Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Youtube L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-01530-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
September 1, 2023 Filing 615 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #592 MOTION to Dismiss Inform Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Inform Inc...(Vash, Serina)
September 1, 2023 Filing 614 MOTION for Stephen M. Hoeplinger to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by State of Missouri..(Hoeplinger, Stephen)
September 1, 2023 Filing 613 MOTION for Joseph M. Graham, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-28232654. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate, #3 Exhibit Certificate, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Graham, Joseph)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER: granting #610 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/01/2023) (ama)
September 1, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/8/2023. (ama)
September 1, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (257 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 613 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION for Joseph M. Graham, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28232654. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC(sgz)
August 31, 2023 Filing 611 CONSENT MOTION for Protective Order (Modified). Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Modified Confidentiality Order, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Justus, Bradley)
August 31, 2023 Filing 610 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Singh v. Google LLC Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated 08/31/2023. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
August 31, 2023 Filing 609 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#610) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to dismiss the Advertisers Consolidated Amended Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated 08/31/2023. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin) Modified on 9/1/2023 (lb).
August 30, 2023 Filing 608 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eva Hoi Wah Yung on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Yung, Eva)
August 30, 2023 Filing 607 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Denise Plunkett on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Plunkett, Denise)
August 30, 2023 Filing 606 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Matthew Reiser on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Reiser, Craig)
August 30, 2023 Filing 605 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Mollick, Jason)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER granting #602 Motion for Sara L. Salem to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER granting #601 Motion for Claire L. Leonard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
August 30, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #601 MOTION for Claire L. Leonard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28214737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 30, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #602 MOTION for Sara L. Salem to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28214773. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
August 29, 2023 Filing 602 MOTION for Sara L. Salem to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28214773. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sara Salem, #2 Exhibit Florida Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Salem, Sara)
August 29, 2023 Filing 601 MOTION for Claire L. Leonard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28214737. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Claire Leonard, #2 Exhibit Maryland Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Leonard, Claire)
August 29, 2023 Filing 600 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Murray on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Murray, Sean)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 599 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #598 Letter Order at ECF 0594 filed by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Alphabet Inc. ENDORSEMENT : Application GRANTED. The Clerk is respectfully directed to update the docket to reflect that Justina K. Sessions remains counsel of record in 21-md-3010. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/16/23) (yv)
August 14, 2023 Filing 598 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated 08/14/23 re: Order at ECF 0594. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 23-0910. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's motion for an emergency stay of the JPML order pending this Court's resolution of Petitioner's petition for a writ of mandamus is REFERRED to a three-judge motions panel or the panel that determines the petition for a writ of mandamus. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's request for an administrative stay of the JPML order is granted until the motion for a stay pending resolution of the mandamus petition is determined. We note that the issuance of an administrative stay does not constitute a decision as to the merits of the motion for a stay pending resolution of Petitioner's mandamus petition. See Hassoun v. Searls, 976 F.3d 121, 126 (2d Cir. 2020) (describing extension of administrative stay to permit full consideration of motion). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 8/9/2023. (tp) Modified on 8/10/2023 (tp).
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER granting in part (585) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting in part (586) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting in part (20) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:23-cv-03651-PKC; granting in part (16) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:23-cv-05177-PKC. The Google defendants may proceed as requested in their letter of July 18, 2023 and move to dismiss the complaint of Gannett Co., Inc. incorporating by reference the arguments set forth in their motion to dismiss the Daily Mail complaint (ECF 453 & 454) and moving against the allegations relating to Enhanced Dynamic Allocation and Line Item Caps on the additional grounds of the statute of limitations. The Google defendants may also move to dismiss the complaint of Sunny Singh incorporating by reference the arguments set forth in their motion to dismiss the Advertisers Consolidated Amended Complaint (ECF 446 & 447), including seeking to compel arbitration of Singh's claim. The motions described above shall be filed by September 8, 2023, any response filed by October 6, 2023 and any reply by October 20, 2023. Letter motions ECF 585 and 586 are granted to the extent indicated and should be terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/3/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-03651-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC (vfr)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #590 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY OREDRED that Koren W. Wong-Ervin is withdrawn as counsel for Defendants Google LLC, Alphabet Inc., and YouTube, LLC and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification in the above-captioned proceeding. Attorney Koren Wong-Ervin terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/3/2023) (vfr)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #591 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Before the Court is a Motion to Withdraw Justina K. Sessions as Counsel for the Defendants Google LLC and Alphabet LLC in Associated Newspapers Ltd. And Mail Media, Inc. v. Google LLC and Alphabet Inc. (Case No. 1:21-cv-03446 (PKC)). The Court has determined that the motion should be granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Justina K. Sessions is withdrawn as counsel for the Defendants Google LLC and Alphabet LLC in Associated Newspapers Ltd. And Mail Media, Inc. v. Google LLC and Alphabet Inc. (Case No. 1:21-cv-03446 (PKC)). Attorney Justina K. Sessions terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/3/2023) (vfr)
August 3, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/8/2023. Responses due by 10/6/2023 Replies due by 10/20/2023. (vfr)
July 31, 2023 Filing 593 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #592 MOTION to Dismiss Inform Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
July 31, 2023 Filing 592 MOTION to Dismiss Inform Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
July 27, 2023 Filing 591 MOTION for Justina K. Sessions to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
July 26, 2023 Filing 590 MOTION for Koren W. Wong-Ervin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Justus, Bradley)
July 24, 2023 Filing 589 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne dated 07/24/2023 re: (585 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 16 in 1:23-cv-05177-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Gannett Co., Inc. Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated 7/18/2023. . Document filed by Gannett Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC.(Thorne, John)
July 21, 2023 Filing 588 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated July 21, 2023 re: Agreed Stipulation. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation).(Orsini, Kevin)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL: granting (584) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Allen Zweig terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Allen Zweig terminated in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/19/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
July 18, 2023 Filing 586 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Singh Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated 07/18/23. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Alphabet Inc.(Delaware Corporation).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-03651-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
July 18, 2023 Filing 585 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Gannett Co., Inc. Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated 7/18/2023. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Google LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
July 14, 2023 Filing 584 MOTION for Jason A. Zweig to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw for Jason A. Zweig)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting #582 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicole Anne Veno terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/13/2023) (ama)
July 7, 2023 Filing 582 MOTION for Nicole A. Veno to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by JLaSalle Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Veno, Nicole)
July 7, 2023 Filing 581 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Justina K. Sessions on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. New Address: Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP, 855 Main Street, Redwood City, CA, USA 94063, 650-618-9250..(Sessions, Justina)
July 5, 2023 Filing 580 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsey Handley Taylor on behalf of AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc...(Taylor, Lindsey)
July 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER granting #577 Motion for Arthur L. Shingler, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
July 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER granting #576 Motion for Andrew Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
June 29, 2023 Filing 577 MOTION for Arthur L. Shingler III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27943114. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Arthur L. Shingler, #2 Exhibit A - Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit of Service).(Shingler, Arthur)
June 29, 2023 Filing 576 MOTION for Andrew Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Montana. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew Butler, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Butler, Andrew)
June 29, 2023 Filing 575 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Andrew Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Montana. Return Date set for 6/29/2023 at 11:28 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Butler, Andrew) Modified on 6/29/2023 (sgz).
June 29, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #575 MOTION for Andrew Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Affidavit/ Declaration;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (sgz)
June 29, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #576 MOTION for Andrew Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 29, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #577 MOTION for Arthur L. Shingler III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27943114. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER: The above-action has been accepted as related to IN RE: GOOGLE DIGITAL ADVERTISING ANTITRUST LITIGATION, 21-md-3010(PKC). The newly-filed action will be coordinated for pretrial proceedings with the MDL and is subject to all existing and future Orders and Schedules of this Court entered in the MDL without prejudice to the right of Gannett Co., Inc. to seek certain modifications appropriate to its circumstance. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/22/2023) (tg)
June 16, 2023 Filing 573 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Andrew Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27885321. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Montana. Return Date set for 6/16/2023 at 11:28 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew Butler, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Butler, Andrew) Modified on 6/16/2023(sgz).
June 16, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #573 MOTION for Andrew Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27885321. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Montana;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (sgz)
June 13, 2023 Filing 572 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 8/31/2022 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 13, 2023 Filing 571 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 8/31/2022 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/5/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER denying (569) Letter Motion to Stay re: (569 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 248 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC) LETTER MOTION to Stay Transfer addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr & Justina K. Sessions dated 6/12/2023. in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; denying (248) Letter Motion to Stay re: (569 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 248 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC) LETTER MOTION to Stay Transfer addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr & Justina K. Sessions dated 6/12/2023. in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC One week after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issued an Order of remand, Google applies to the undersigned for a stay of that Order, to be issued by 5 p.m. today. Google states that it also has filed an emergency motion to the JPML for a stay and brings its application to this Court "out of an abundance of caution." Google's stay application is properly considered by the JPML and not this Court. Google points to no authority that gives this Court jurisdiction to sit in review of the JPML. Its application is therefore DENIED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/12/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ks)
June 12, 2023 Filing 569 LETTER MOTION to Stay Transfer addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr & Justina K. Sessions dated 6/12/2023. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
June 8, 2023 Filing 568 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated June 8, 2023 re: June 2, 2023 letter from Philip C. Korologos re: search terms and related discovery discussions. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
June 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL granting (566) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel Strunk terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (246) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Daniel Strunk is withdrawn as counsel for the Plaintiff States, Texas, Idaho, Indiana, Mississippi, North Dakota, South Carolina, and South Dakota and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification in the above-captioned proceeding. Attorney Daniel Strunk terminated in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/4/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (rro)
June 2, 2023 Filing 566 MOTION for Daniel Strunk to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Daniel Strunk as Counsel of Record)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
June 2, 2023 Filing 565 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated June 2, 2023 re: search terms and related discovery discussions. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Korologos, Philip)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER REGARDING COORDINATION OF DISCOVERY: For purposes of this Order, the following definitions will apply: a. "Confidential Information" means material that qualifies as "Confidential Information" as that term is defined in either paragraph l(b) of the MDL Confidentiality Order or paragraph 1(b) of the Virginia Protective Order. b. "Coordinated Case" means the MDL or the Virginia Case. "Coordinated Cases" means the MDL and the Virginia Case. and as set forth herein. This Order shall not come into effect unless and until it has been entered in both the MDL and the Virginia Case. IT IS HEREBY SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/01/2023) (ama)
June 1, 2023 Filing 563 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr & Justina K. Sessions dated 6/1/2023 re: Coordination Order. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order "Redline").(Mahr, Eric)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER: granting #554 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Google correctly points out that Inform is situated differently from other MDL plaintiffs. (ECF 526 at 2.) It does not readily appear that discovery related to the Inform claims would be materially different in kind and scope to that presented by other constituent actions in the MDL. Without prejudging any motion that Google wishes to make, the Court will dissolve the discovery stay in the Court's Order of April 13, 2023. Google may file a motion to dismiss the SAC by July 31, 2023, brief not to exceed 30 pages. Inform may respond by September 1, 2023, brief not to exceed 30 pages and Google may reply by September 23, 2023, brief not to exceed 20 pages. The parties should proceed on the basis that the judge reading their brief is the author of the Opinion and Order of September 13, 2022 and should focus on any distinctions that warrant a different ruling in the case of Inform's SAC. The discovery stay in the Order of April 13, 2023 (ECF 527) is dissolved. Letter motion (ECF 554) should be terminated. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/31/2023) (ama)
May 31, 2023 Filing 561 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/16/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 31, 2023 Filing 560 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 5/16/2023 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/21/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 31, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/31/2023. Responses due by 9/1/2023 Replies due by 9/23/2023. (ama)
May 26, 2023 Filing 559 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated May 26, 2023 re: Response to Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Inform Inc...(Vash, Serina)
May 25, 2023 Filing 558 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Kyle G. Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27789072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kyle G. Bates, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Bates, Kyle) Modified on 5/25/2023 (dsh).
May 25, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #558 MOTION for Kyle G. Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27789072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (dsh)
May 22, 2023 Filing 557 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Henry Jan Kelston on behalf of Vitor Lindo..(Kelston, Henry)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER TO WITHDRAW STEVEN M. JODLOWSKI AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD: granting (552) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06794-PKC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06796-PKC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06824-PKC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06828-PKC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06817-PKC; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06840-PKC; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06871-PKC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06881-PKC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06884-PKC; granting (66) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06888-PKC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06909-PKC; granting (72) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06912-PKC; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06915-PKC; granting (44) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-08032-PKC; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-09523-PKC; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-10186-PKC; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-10187-PKC; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-10188-PKC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-01693-PKC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-01701-PKC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-01704-PKC; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-01705-PKC; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-01971-PKC; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-06997-PKC; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-09810-PKC. The motion of Steven M. Jodlowski to withdraw as attorney of record in the above-referencedaction is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Steven M. Jodlowski be withdrawn as Counsel for the Newspaper Plaintiffs in the above-referenced action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/22/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER TO WITHDRAW STEVEN M. JODLOWSKI AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD: granting (552) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06794-PKC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06796-PKC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06824-PKC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06828-PKC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06817-PKC; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06840-PKC; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06871-PKC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06881-PKC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06884-PKC; granting (66) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06888-PKC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06909-PKC; granting (72) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06912-PKC; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-06915-PKC; granting (44) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-08032-PKC; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-09523-PKC; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-10186-PKC; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-10187-PKC; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:21-cv-10188-PKC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-01693-PKC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-01701-PKC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-01704-PKC; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-01705-PKC; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-01971-PKC; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-06997-PKC; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven M Jodlowski terminated in case 1:22-cv-09810-PKC. The motion of Steven M. Jodlowski to withdraw as attorney of record in the above-referencedaction is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Steven M. Jodlowski be withdrawn as Counsel for the Newspaper Plaintiffs in the above-referenced action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/22/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
May 19, 2023 Filing 554 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File motion to dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Inform, Inc. (ECF No. 535) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated May 19, 2023. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
May 16, 2023 Filing 553 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. Related Document Number: #552 ..(Mitchell, David)
May 16, 2023 Filing 552 MOTION for Steven M. Jodlowski to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Mitchell, David)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER: The Court held a pretrial conference today on the coordination of discovery in this MDL with a similar action brought by different plaintiffs before Judge Brinkema in the Eastern District of Virginia. United States v Google LLC, 23 cv 108 (E.D. Va.) (the "E.D. Va. Action"). The Court notes with gratitude the efforts of Magistrate Judge Anderson of the Eastern District of Virginia in resolving certain issues relating to the draft Coordination Order.The revised draft, following Magistrate Judge Anderson's rulings, has gained the assent of the parties to the E.D. Va. Action. The Court has considered the oral presentations and written submissions of the parties to the MDL relating to the draft Coordination Order. Pursuant to the authority of Rule 16(a)(1), (a)(3), (b)(3)(B)(ii), (c)(2)(F), (L) & (P), Fed. R. Civ. P., the Court is prepared to enter the draft Coordination Order in the MDL (with two minor changes) and will await delivery of a final execution copy. There are additional provisions relevant to coordination that relate solely to the MDL actions and, thus, are set forth in this Order. For good cause shown, the Court may allow parties to the MDL to examine witnesses for additional time beyond the limit set forth in in the Coordination Order or any prior Order of this Court if a party produces documents after the deadline for substantial completion of document production and the belated production has meaningfully impacted the deposition of the witness. To avoid interfering with the timely proceeding of discovery in the E.D. Va. Action, any such extended examination will occur after the conclusion of fact discovery in the E.D. Va. Action. The Court does not presently anticipate lifting the stay of discovery relating to the Network Bidding Agreement ("NBA"). But if the stay is lifted, the Court acknowledges the right of parties to the MDL to conduct discovery relating to the NBA and will enter appropriate Orders at that time. All depositions of MDL plaintiffs are stayed until the conclusion of fact discovery in the E.D. Va. Action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/16/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
May 15, 2023 Filing 550 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr & Justina K. Sessions dated 5/15/2023 re: Substantial Completion of Production. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - J. Sessions Letter).(Mahr, Eric)
May 15, 2023 Filing 549 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated 05/15/2023 re: Coordination Order. Document filed by Meta Platforms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit (Redline Version of Proposed Order)).(Orsini, Kevin)
May 15, 2023 Filing 548 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated May 15, 2023 re: proposing an Order concerning discovery coordination pursuant to the Court's May 9, 2023 Order. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Pre-Trial Order No. 7)).(Korologos, Philip)
May 15, 2023 Filing 547 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr & Justina K. Sessions dated 5/15/2023 re: Coordination Order. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - E.D.V.A. Order).(Mahr, Eric)
May 11, 2023 Filing 546 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Hermes on behalf of Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Hermes, Jessica)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 545 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #544 Letter filed by State of Indiana, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of Nevada, State of Idaho, State of Mississippi, State of Arkansas, State of Missouri, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Utah, State of Alaska, State of Montana, State of South Carolina, State of Florida, State of North Dakota, State of Louisiana. ENDORSEMENT: Having read the letter of May 11 (ECF 544) the Court is unsure that "this issue" (ECF 544 at 3) is well defined or ripe but plaintiff may raise it at the May 16 conference. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 5/16/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/11/2023) (ama)
May 11, 2023 Filing 544 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller dated 05/11/2023 re: Substantial Completion. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas..(Keller, Ashley)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER: Claims by the United States and ce1iain State plaintiffs, similar in nature to those presented in actions in this MDL, are pending before Judge Brinkema in the Eastern District of Virginia. United States v Google LLC, 23 cv 108 (E.D. Va.) (the "E.D. Va. Action"). Fact discovery in the E.D. Va. Action is reportedly set to close on September 9, 2023. Fact discovery in the MDL is set to close on June 24, 2024. There will be a conference on May 16, 2023 at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 11 D to hear the views of the parties. Any party wishing to propose an Order may do so by May 15, 2023 at 5 pm. Counsel for the plaintiffs in the E.D. Va. Action are invited to attend. Google is directed to deliver a copy of this Order to counsel for the plaintiffs in the E.D. Va. Action. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., ( Fact Discovery due by 6/24/2024., Status Conference set for 5/16/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/09/2023) (ama)
May 5, 2023 Filing 542 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated May 5, 2023 re: #536 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Coordination Order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr & Justina K. Sessions dated 4/28/2023. . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Korologos, Philip)
May 5, 2023 Filing 541 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #195 Amended Complaint,, against Google LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas. Related document: #195 Amended Complaint,,..(Keller, Ashley)
May 2, 2023 Filing 540 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Anne Veno on behalf of JLaSalle Enterprises LLC..(Veno, Nicole)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 539 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #529 Response to Motion, filed by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Motions terminated: #528 LETTER MOTION to Compel Google to produce 800,000 documents. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne on behalf of counsel for all private plaintiffs dated 04/21/2023. filed by Mail Media, Inc., Associated Newspapers Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: On Consent of Google and over the limited objection of plaintiffs on timing Google shall produce the approximately 800,000 documents produced by Google to the DOJ to all plaintiffs in the MDL by May 30, 2023. Letter Motion (Doc. 528) is terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/01/2023) (ama)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 538 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #537 Letter, filed by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., The Progressive, Inc., Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Sterling International Consulting Group. ENDORSEMENT: Application to file response by May 5, 2023 is GRANTED. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 5/5/2023) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/01/2023) (ama)
April 29, 2023 Filing 537 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated April 29, 2023 re: Defendants' letter motion (ECF 536). Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Korologos, Philip)
April 28, 2023 Filing 536 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Coordination Order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr & Justina K. Sessions dated 4/28/2023. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order re Coordination of Discovery, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from MDL Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit C - Letter from Meta, #4 Exhibit D - Meta Proposal).(Mahr, Eric)
April 28, 2023 Filing 535 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #81 Amended Complaint, against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Inform Inc.. Related document: #81 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Highlighted Complaint).(Vash, Serina)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER granting #531 Motion for Alexander Izaak Earnhardt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
April 26, 2023 Filing 532 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated April 26, 2023 re: clarifying ECF No. 529. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
April 26, 2023 Filing 531 MOTION for Alexander Izaak Earnhardt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27660031. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Supplement DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Supplement NC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Earnhardt, Alexander)
April 26, 2023 Filing 530 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne on behalf of counsel for all private plaintiffs dated 04/26/2023 re: #528 LETTER MOTION to Compel Google to produce 800,000 documents addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne on behalf of counsel for all private plaintiffs dated 04/21/2023. . Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc...(Thorne, John)
April 26, 2023 Filing 529 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated April 26, 2023 re: #528 LETTER MOTION to Compel Google to produce 800,000 documents addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne on behalf of counsel for all private plaintiffs dated 04/21/2023. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
April 26, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #531 MOTION for Alexander Izaak Earnhardt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27660031. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (dsh)
April 21, 2023 Filing 528 LETTER MOTION to Compel Google to produce 800,000 documents addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne on behalf of counsel for all private plaintiffs dated 04/21/2023. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2023 03 28 Letter to R McCallum re Google Discovery, #2 Exhibit B - 2023 04 12 Letter to Google re DOJ Production and Subpoenas 4863-9549-6029 v, #3 Exhibit C - 2023 04 21 Email Chain).(Thorne, John)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER: The Court will grant Inform leave to amend the First Amended Complaintprovided it does so within 21 days of this Order. Inform has acted in a reasonably timely manner following remand by the Eleventh Circuit. Any defect in the pleading may be raised on a motion to dismiss. The Court accepts good faith representation that Inform intends is to conform its pleading to the Court's rulings on the States' motion to dismiss; any new or additional theories ofliability should be highlighted in a marked copy of the pleading also filed within 21 days. Google may file a pre-motion letter in support of a motion to dismiss 21 days after the filing of the amended pleading and Inform shall respond to the pre-motion letter 7 days thereafter. Discovery by or from Inform is stayed pending further Order of the Court. The parties may brief the issuance of a continued stay in the pre-motion letter and response thereto.. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/12/2023) (ama)
April 10, 2023 Filing 526 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated April 10, 2023 re: respectfully responding to Plaintiff Inform Inc.'s April 4, 2023 letter regarding Google's document discovery (ECF No. 525). Document filed by Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
April 4, 2023 Filing 525 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated April 4, 2023 re: Document Discovery. Document filed by Inform Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence from Inform's Counsel to Google's Counsel, #2 Exhibit Correspondence from Google's Counsel to Inform's Counsel).(Vash, Serina)
March 31, 2023 Filing 524 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #455 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SPX PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
March 31, 2023 Filing 523 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #449 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC, ALPHABET INC., AND YOUTUBE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PUBLISHERS' AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
March 31, 2023 Filing 522 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #451 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS NEWSPAPER PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
March 31, 2023 Filing 521 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #453 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS DAILY MAIL'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
March 31, 2023 Filing 520 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #446 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERTISERS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
March 31, 2023 Filing 519 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #460 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Advertisers' Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
March 31, 2023 Filing 518 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #462 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Newspapers' Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 517 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #516 Letter filed by SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The docket entry should be corrected to reflect that only Fred Isquith, Jr. has withdrawn and that Fred Isquith, Sr. remain as counsel to the SPX Plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/31/2023) (ama)
March 31, 2023 Filing 516 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Fred T. Isquith Sr. dated March 31, 2023 re: Correction of Administrative Error in docket No 515. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC..(Isquith, Frederick)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL granting (514) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Frederick Taylor Isquith, terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (90) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Fred Taylor Isquith terminated in case 1:21-cv-06870-PKC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Fred Taylor Isquith terminated in case 1:21-cv-07045-PKC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fred Isquith Jr. is withdrawn as counsel for the SPX Plaintiffs and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification in the above-captioned proceeding. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/30/23) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC (yv) Modified on 3/31/2023 (ama). Modified on 3/31/2023 (ama).
March 30, 2023 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #516 Order Granting Motion to withdraw as counsel. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ama)
March 29, 2023 Filing 514 MOTION for Fred T. Isquith Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Isquith, Fred) Modified on 3/31/2023 (yv).
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER RELATING TO INDIVIDUAL PUBLISHER ACTIONS: The Court is pleased to welcome Mr. Farrell as counsel in this action. In his letter of February 28, 2023 (ECF 480-1), he asks the Court to "direct the parties to further meet and confer regarding a separate track for Newspaper Plaintiff discovery responses and report back in short order." The Court declines to do so. The fact that individual publishers who have elected to bring their own actions parallel to the Publisher Class Action are represented by the same law firm, alone and in combination with the other considerations cited by Mr. Farrell, does not justify "a separate track for discovery...." Some form or variation on bellwether discovery of a few individual publisher plaintiffs with fact sheets submitted by all others is, the Court submits, an unworkable solution in the context of these Sherman Act claims. Section 1 and 2 claims brought by a business entity asserting injury as a result of a wide array of anticompetitive measures is quite different in complexity from individual personal-injury claims in a mass tort action. The responses from each individual publisher plaintiff logically can be expected to vary greatly. Application DENIED without prejudice to the Courts consideration of other measures aimed at efficiencies as discovery pursuant to PTO-5 progresses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/22/2023) (ama)
March 21, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #511 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge P. Kevin Castel for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
March 21, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #512 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge P. Kevin Castel for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
March 20, 2023 Filing 512 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Facebook Inc.. Document filed by Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06910-PKC.(Rubin, Jonathan)
March 20, 2023 Filing 511 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Google LLC, Alphabet Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc.. Document filed by Vitor Lindo. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Wolfson, Tina)
March 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Tina Wolfson. RE-FILE Document No. #510 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the individual party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were not selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct individual filer/filers - select the correct individual party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
March 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Rubin. RE-FILE Document No. #509 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the individual party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were not selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct individual filer/filers - select the correct individual party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
March 17, 2023 Filing 510 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Vitor Lindo. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Wolfson, Tina) Modified on 3/20/2023 (tp).
March 17, 2023 Filing 509 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06910-PKC.(Rubin, Jonathan) Modified on 3/20/2023 (tp).
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE: NOW THEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED: Except as specifically set forth herein, this Order does not alter or affect the applicability of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. The production specifications set forth in this Stipulation and Order apply to Documents and ESI that is to be produced in the first instance in the above-captioned litigation. The parties will meet and confer concerning the applicability of this Stipulation and Order to any Documents to be reproduced in this action that were previously produced in another action or as part of a pre-complaint investigation. The production specifications set forth in this Stipulation and Order do not apply to databases, data sources, logs, and other structured data except as described in paragraph L below. Subject to paragraph I.2 above, the parties agree to produce documents in the formats described in Appendix 1 to this Order. If particular documents warrant a different format, the parties will cooperate to arrange for the mutually acceptable production of such documents. The parties agree, to the extent practicable, not to materially degrade the searchability of the documents as part of the document production process. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/17/2023) (ama)
March 15, 2023 Filing 507 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anna Schneider on behalf of State of Montana. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Anna K. Schneider, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Schneider, Anna)
March 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #503 Motion for Noah Stephen Heinz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER TO WITHDRAW MARTHA REISER AS COUNSEL granting (502) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Martha Reiser terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/10/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06871-PKC (va)
March 10, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #503 MOTION for Noah Stephen Heinz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-27447604. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
March 9, 2023 Filing 504 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated March 9, 2023 re: State Plaintiffs' Remand Letter. Document filed by Google LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
March 9, 2023 Filing 503 MOTION for Noah Stephen Heinz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-27447604. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Heinz, Noah)
March 9, 2023 Filing 502 MOTION for Martha Reiser to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order)).(Orsini, Kevin)
March 9, 2023 Filing 501 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated March 8, 2023 re: Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Sessions, Justina)
March 8, 2023 Filing 500 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Plaintiffs Group dated March 8, 2023 re: Proposed ESI Order (Per 2/22/2023 Minute Entry). Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Coslett, Caitlin)
March 8, 2023 Filing 499 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated March 8, 2023 re: opposition to Inform Inc.'s request to file a motion to amend its complaint [ECF 479]. Document filed by Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL: granting #497 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brooke Clason Smith terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/07/2023) (ama)
March 7, 2023 Filing 497 MOTION for Brooke Clason Smith to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER GRANTING THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THEIR UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS SPX'S CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL: granting (484) Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (85) Motion to Seal in case 1:21-cv-06870-PKC; granting (49) Motion to Seal in case 1:21-cv-07045-PKC. The Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to file their Memorandum of Law in Opposition toDefendant Google LLC's Motion to Dismiss SPX's Consolidated Amended Class ActionComplaint Under Seal is GRANTED. The Memorandum submitted to this Court and filed on the public docket with redactions in accordance with the sections highlighted in yellow on the under seal version submitted to this Court, leaving in place redactions only related to documents designated confidential or higher by Google LLC pursuant to the Protective Order (ECF No. 297) ia provisionally approved.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/06/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC (ama)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 495 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 6: For reasons explained in Pre-Trial Order No. 1 and on the record at the September 24, 2021 conference, proceedings with regard to the States' state law claims have been stayed. Google has outlined the perceived deficiencies in the States' DTPA claims and the remedies sought by the States pursuant to those claims in a pre-motion letter dated October 28, 2022. (ECF 357.) The States now seek to amend their state law Deceptive Trade Practices Act("DTPA") claims, including allegations relating to remedy. (ECF 466.) The States' application does not relate to the federal antitrust claims nor to the States' state law analogues to the federal antitrust claims. Google opposes the application (ECF 473), arguing that the States have been afforded a full and fair opportunity to assert their strongest and best DTP A claims. The Court will allow the States to file a further amended complaint amending the Third Amended Complaint only as it relates to the DTP A and remedies for violations of the DTPA provided it does so within 60 days of this Order. Google's time to answer the further amended pleading is stayed pending further Order of this Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/06/2023) (ama)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL: granting #437 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney Johnathan R Carter and David A.F. McCoy terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/06/2023) (ama)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER REGARDING STATE PLAINTIFF STATE LAW CLAIMS: NOW THEREFORE, the Parties, through their respective counsel, hereby stipulate as follows: To the extent that any State Plaintiff alleges a state antitrust claim in the TAC based on allegations that the Network Bidding Agreement between Google and Meta Platforms, Inc. (f/k/a as Facebook) (the "NBA") constitutes an illegal contract, combination or conspiracy, such claim is hereby deemed dismissed. To the extent that any State Plaintiff alleges a state antitrust claim in the TAC basedon allegations that Google's use of Enc1ypted User IDs constitutes monopolization or attempted monopolization of markets for ad exchanges, large-advertiser buying tools, and/or small-advertiser buying tools, such claim is deemed to have failed to allege that such conduct is anticompetitive. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/06/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
March 6, 2023 Filing 492 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated March 6, 2023 re: Newspaper Plaintiffs' February 28, 2023 Letter [ECF 480-1]. Document filed by Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
March 3, 2023 Filing 491 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #446 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERTISERS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT., #460 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Advertisers' Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Kinin, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa..(Sharp, Dena)
March 3, 2023 Filing 490 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #446 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERTISERS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Kinin, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa..(Sharp, Dena)
March 3, 2023 Filing 489 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (451 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS NEWSPAPER PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT., (462 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Newspapers' Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Mitchell, David)
March 3, 2023 Filing 488 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (453 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS DAILY MAIL'S AMENDED COMPLAINT., (71 in 1:21-cv-03446-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS DAILY MAIL'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Thorne, John)
March 3, 2023 Filing 487 DECLARATION of Fred T. Isquith Jr. in Opposition re: (43 in 1:21-cv-07045-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SPX PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT., (79 in 1:21-cv-06870-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SPX PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT., (455 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SPX PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT.. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
March 3, 2023 Filing 486 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (43 in 1:21-cv-07045-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SPX PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT., (455 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SPX PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. [SEALED]. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Facebook Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Google LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Inform Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, John Doe's 1-100, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Kimberly Negron, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 23 Media Organizations, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Michael Stellman(individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated ), Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Youtube, LLC, Shoshana Zuboff, Google L.L.C, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #484 .(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
March 3, 2023 Filing 485 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (43 in 1:21-cv-07045-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SPX PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT., (455 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SPX PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. [REDACTED]. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
March 3, 2023 Filing 484 MOTION to Seal . Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Slip Sheet, #2 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED ORDER])Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
March 3, 2023 Filing 483 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (449 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC, ALPHABET INC., AND YOUTUBE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PUBLISHERS' AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT., (136 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC, ALPHABET INC., AND YOUTUBE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PUBLISHERS' AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
March 3, 2023 Filing 482 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/22/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 3, 2023 Filing 481 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2023 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sadie Herbert, (212) 805-0310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 28, 2023 Filing 480 NOTICE of Notice of Filing Letter. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Paul T. Farrell, Jr.).(Davidson, Stuart)
February 28, 2023 Filing 479 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated February 28, 2023 re: Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Inform Inc...(Vash, Serina)
February 27, 2023 Filing 478 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - JPML Filing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
February 27, 2023 Filing 477 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier and Ashley Keller dated 02/27/2023 re: Venue Issue. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
February 24, 2023 Filing 476 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated 02/24/2023 re: State Law Stipulation. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Google's Proposed Stipulation, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' February 22nd Redline)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
February 24, 2023 Filing 475 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller dated 02/24/2023 re: State Law Stipulation. Document filed by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Stipulation Provisions, #2 Exhibit B - Agreed and Disagreed Stipulation Provisions)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER granting #469 Motion for Jonathan K. Van Patten to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
February 23, 2023 Filing 473 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated 02/23/2023 re: Response to State Plaintiffs Letter (ECF 466) Requesting Leave to Amend. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
February 23, 2023 Filing 472 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by State of South Dakota..(Lafrentz, Yvette)
February 23, 2023 Filing 471 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan K Van Patten on behalf of State of South Dakota..(Van Patten, Jonathan)
February 23, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #469 MOTION for Jonathan K. Van Patten to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 22, 2023 Filing 470 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by State of Utah..(Pincock, Tara)
February 22, 2023 Filing 469 MOTION for Jonathan K. Van Patten to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of South Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Jonathan Van Patten, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission).(Van Patten, Jonathan)
February 22, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Oral Argument held on 2/22/2023 re: #468 . The Court hears argument on proposed ESI Order. Within 14 days, the parties should further meet and confer. Court reserves decision. (Court Reporter Sadie Herbert) (Nacanther, Florence)
February 22, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #467 MOTION for Jonathan K. Van Patten to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27369139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of South Dakota;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
February 21, 2023 Filing 468 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated February 21, 2023 re: Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Submission re ESI).(Sessions, Justina)
February 21, 2023 Filing 467 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jonathan K. Van Patten to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27369139. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of South Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Jonathan Van Patten, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Van Patten, Jonathan) Modified on 2/22/2023 (vba).
February 16, 2023 Filing 466 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier dated 02/16/2023 re: Response to Dkt. 392. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
February 13, 2023 Filing 465 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brittany Lynn Sukiennik on behalf of Meta Platforms, Inc...(Sukiennik, Brittany)
February 10, 2023 NOTICE: The conference scheduled for February 16, 2023 is adjourned to February 22, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D. (Nacanther, Florence)
February 8, 2023 Filing 464 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated February 8, 2023 re: Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 463 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #462 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Newspapers' Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 462 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Newspapers' Consolidated Amended Complaint. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ).(Orsini, Kevin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 461 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #460 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Advertisers' Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 460 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Advertisers' Consolidated Amended Complaint. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ).(Orsini, Kevin)
February 3, 2023 Filing 459 DECLARATION of COURTNEY SHADD in Support re: #457 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS ORGANIC PANACEAS' CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT.. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 458 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #457 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS ORGANIC PANACEAS' CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 457 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS ORGANIC PANACEAS' CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 456 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #455 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SPX PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 455 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS SPX PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Document filed by Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 454 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #453 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS DAILY MAIL'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 453 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS DAILY MAIL'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 452 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #451 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS NEWSPAPER PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 451 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS NEWSPAPER PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT. Document filed by Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 450 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #449 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC, ALPHABET INC., AND YOUTUBE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PUBLISHERS' AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 449 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC, ALPHABET INC., AND YOUTUBE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PUBLISHERS' AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 448 DECLARATION of COURTNEY SHADD in Support re: #446 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERTISERS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT.. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 447 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #446 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERTISERS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 446 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS GOOGLE LLC AND ALPHABET INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERTISERS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER: The Conference presently scheduled for February 15, 2023 at 2 p.m. is adjourned to February 16, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11D. The sole issue that the Court will entertain at the Conference is the dueling ESI protocols. The Court has the submission of the plaintiffs' Coordinating Committee, as well as defendants' submissions. If any party is of the view that the written submissions are inadequate, they are invited to make a written submission by February 8, 2023. It therefore should be appropriate to hear from one lawyer from each side on the issue of the ESI protocol. By February 8, each side shall send to the Chambers email in-box (CastelNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) an electronic version of their proposed ESI protocol in MS Word format. To repeat, the Conference is not an opportunity for a lawyer for a party to raise anissue not germane to the above-stated purpose of the Conference. SO ORDERED., ( Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/02/2023) (ama)
February 2, 2023 Filing 442 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Stuart A. Davidson on behalf of AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. New Address: Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP, 225 NE Mizner Boulevard, Suite 720, Boca Raton, Florida, 33432, 561/750-3000..(Davidson, Stuart)
February 1, 2023 Filing 445 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Northern District of California, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge P. Kevin Castel, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/1/2023) (vba)
February 1, 2023 Filing 444 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Northern District Georgia, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge P. Kevin Castel, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/1/2023) (vba)
February 1, 2023 Filing 441 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated 2/01/2023 re: February 15, 2023 Case Management Conference. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' RFPs)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
February 1, 2023 Filing 440 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier dated 02/01/2023 re: Per Court's PTO No. 5 [Dkt. 394] Plaintiffs' Topics and Positions for CMC Scheduled February 15, 2023. Document filed by Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc, Appen Media Group, Inc., Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Clarksburg Publishing Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
January 20, 2023 Filing 439 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier dated 01/13/2023 re: Plaintiffs' Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Genius Media Group, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc, Appen Media Group, Inc., Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Clarksburg Publishing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Brown, Alex)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER REGARDING CLAWBACK DOCUMENTS: granting in part #368 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's motion (ECF 368) is GRANTED in part. The privilege claim as to the first document,'627, has been withdrawn. The claim of privilege as to the redaction on '804 is not upheld. The redaction on '029 is upheld on the grounds of privilege and work product. The privilege claim on the first redaction on '469 is withdrawn, on the second redaction on 469 is upheld and the redaction on '470 not upheld. Apart from the ruling on the four documents, plaintiffs also complain of the adequacy of the descriptions on Google's privilege log for the remainder of the 58 clawback documents. The parties are directed to meet and confer on this issue within 21 days and, if appropriate, agree upon supplementation of the privilege log or other relief. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion. (ECF 368.). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/17/2023) (ama)
January 17, 2023 Filing 437 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: David A.F. McCoy and Johnathan R. Carter, New Attorney: Amanda Wentz . Document filed by State of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Substitution).(Wentz, Amanda)
January 14, 2023 Filing 436 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier dated 01/13/2023 re: Plaintiffs' Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc, Appen Media Group, Inc., Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Clarksburg Publishing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
January 13, 2023 Filing 435 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated January 13, 2023 re: Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 434 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated January 13, 2023 re: Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Mahr, Eric)
January 13, 2023 Filing 433 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #406 Complaint, #416 Amended Complaint, #404 Complaint against Google LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Google LLC, Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra. Related document: #406 Complaint, #416 Amended Complaint, #404 Complaint.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #430 .(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER: Meta Platforms, Inc. ("Meta") asserts in a letter dated January 4, 2023 that because all discovery relating to the Network Bidding Agreement ("NBA") has been stayed and, it asserts, that all claims against it relate to the NBA, then all discovery against it is stayed. The syllogism appears correct, provided the premise that all claims against it relate to the NBA is correct. Because no pleading against Meta has ever been before the Court for a ruling and none is cited in the letter, the Court is unable to accommodate the request that the Court confirm that [discovery] deadlines in PTO-5... do not apply to it.The Court does note that no other party has taken issue with the assertion in the January 4, 2023 letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/12/2023) (ama)
January 12, 2023 Filing 431 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by State of Idaho..(DeLange, Brett)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 430 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER GRANTING THE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE UNREDACTED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL: granting (403) Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (64) Motion to Seal in case 1:21-cv-06870-PKC; granting (29) Motion to Seal in case 1:21-cv-07045-PKC. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/05/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC (ama)
January 5, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2023. Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC(ama)
January 4, 2023 Filing 429 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated January 4, 2023 re: Pre-Trial Order No. 5. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 428 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 29, the Parties hereto, through their respective Counsel of record, hereby stipulate to the following regarding the scope of expert discovery and testimony in the Actions. And as set forth herein. The Parties are not required to produce or exchange logs reflecting any of the aforementioned items that are not subject to discovery or production pursuant to this Stipulation and Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/03/2023) (ama)
January 3, 2023 Filing 427 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Kimberly Negron, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra..(Keller, Ashley)
January 3, 2023 Filing 426 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by State of Arkansas..(McCoy, David)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting #424 Motion for Amanda Jean Wentz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
December 21, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #424 MOTION for Amanda Jean Wentz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27114655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
December 20, 2022 Filing 424 MOTION for Amanda Jean Wentz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27114655. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Supporting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission).(Wentz, Amanda)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (36 in 1:21-cv-07045-PKC, 421 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 71 in 1:21-cv-06870-PKC) Response to Motion, filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/19/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC (ama)
December 19, 2022 Filing 422 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (64 in 1:21-cv-06870-PKC) MOTION to Seal Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC.(Isquith, Fred)
December 16, 2022 Filing 421 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated December 16, 2022 re: (403 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Orsini, Kevin)
December 16, 2022 Filing 420 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Justina K. Sessions re: (418 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) Response to Motion, DECLARATION OF JUSTINA K. SESSIONS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL (64 in 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 29 in 1:21-cv-07045-PKC, 403 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC). Document filed by Youtube, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Facebook Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Kimberly Negron, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 23 Media Organizations, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Shoshana Zuboff, Google L.L.C, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #403 .(Sessions, Justina)
December 16, 2022 Filing 419 DECLARATION of Justina K. Sessions re: (418 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) Response to Motion, DECLARATION OF JUSTINA K. SESSIONS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL (64 in 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 29 in 1:21-cv-07045-PKC, 403 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC). Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
December 16, 2022 Filing 418 RESPONSE to Motion re: (64 in 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 29 in 1:21-cv-07045-PKC, 403 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 417 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING STATE PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS: NOW THEREFORE, Google and State Plaintiffs ("the parties"), through their respectivecounsel, hereby stipulate as follows: Where the Opinion and Order has determined the viability of any federal antitrust claim based on certain conduct, the parties stipulate that the Opinion and Order is also determinate of any state antitrust claim based on that same conduct; Any state law antitrust claim is deemed dismissed to the extent that it is based on conduct alleged to serve as a basis for a federal antitrust claim that the Opinion and Order dismissed; The parties have not reached any agreement-and this Stipulation should not beinterpreted as expressing a view-as to whether any state law antitrust claim based on conduct, other than conduct described in paragraph 2, should be deemed dismissed; If any portion of the Opinion and Order is reversed on appeal, Google will not take the position that State Plaintiffs, by entering into this Stipulation, have waived any state antitrust claim based on such portion of the Opinion and Order; The Opinion and Order did not dete1mine the viability of the State Plaintiffs' claims arising under the deceptive trade practice acts of the various State Plaintiffs; and The parties have not reached any agreement-and this Stipulation should not be interpreted as expressing a view-as to whether State Plaintiffs may further amend their pleadings with respect to state antitrust claims or any other claims.The Stipulation is entered as an Order of the Court with the following provisions: By February 24, 2023, the parties shall submit a stipulation describing with particularity, the claims or portions of claims governed by paragraph 2. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/14/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
December 12, 2022 Filing 416 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #406 Complaint, #404 Complaint against Google LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC. Related document: #406 Complaint, #404 Complaint..(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
December 9, 2022 Filing 415 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated December 9, 2022 re: Stipulation Regarding State Plaintiffs' State Law Claims. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
December 7, 2022 Filing 414 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kate Lv on behalf of Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Lv, Kate)
December 7, 2022 Filing 413 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walter W. Noss on behalf of Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Noss, Walter)
December 7, 2022 Filing 412 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher M. Burke on behalf of Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Burke, Christopher)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER granting #407 Motion for Mikaela M. Bock to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 410 REQUEST TO REMOVE OR FORMALLY SEAL FILING PURSUANT TO ELECTRONIC CASE FILING RULES AND INSTRUCTIONS 13.26 & 21.7: granting (409) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (66) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-cv-06870-PKC; granting (31) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-cv-07045-PKC. Doc. 404 shall remain sealed. File new redacted Consolidated Amended Complaint within 7 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/06/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC (ama)
December 6, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #407 MOTION for Mikaela M. Bock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27043105. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
December 5, 2022 Filing 409 LETTER MOTION to Seal Permanently or Remove Filing from Docket for ECF No. 404 addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from SPX Total Body Fitness, LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, and Mint Rose Day Spa LLC dated December 5, 2022. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
December 5, 2022 Filing 408 COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. Document filed by JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., The Progressive, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., Mikula Web Solutions, Inc...(Korologos, Philip)
December 5, 2022 Filing 407 MOTION for Mikaela M. Bock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27043105. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mikaela M. Bock, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Bock, Mikaela)
December 2, 2022 Filing 406 COMPLAINT against Google LLC. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC..(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
December 2, 2022 Filing 405 ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of UNDER SEAL CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re: (29 in 1:21-cv-07045-PKC) MOTION to Seal Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Facebook Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Google LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Kimberly Negron, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 23 Media Organizations, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Youtube, LLC, Shoshana Zuboff, Google L.L.C, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #403 .(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
December 2, 2022 Filing 404 COMPLAINT against Google LLC. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC..(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
December 2, 2022 Filing 403 MOTION to Seal Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Slip Sheet, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
December 2, 2022 Filing 402 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #401 Complaint,,,,,, against Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Google LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Marion Publishing Company, J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Rome News Media, LLC, Multi Media Channels LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Journal, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Coastal Point LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Appen Media Group, Inc., Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Eagle Printing Company, ECENT Corporation, Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Newton County Appeal Inc., Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Google LLC, Facebook Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc.. Related document: #401 Complaint,,,,,,.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #392 .(Mitchell, David)
December 2, 2022 Filing 401 COMPLAINT against Google LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27036606)Document filed by Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Rome News Media, LLC, J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Journal, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Coastal Point LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Eagle Printing Company, ECENT Corporation, Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Newton County Appeal Inc., Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Appen Media Group, Inc...(Mitchell, David)
December 2, 2022 Filing 400 COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27036031)Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc...(Thorne, John)
December 2, 2022 Filing 399 COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27034917)Document filed by Kinin, Inc., Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC..(Sharp, Dena)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: granting #378 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Jennifer M. Oliver is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center LLC, and Rodrock Chiropractic, PA (the "Cliffy Care plaintiffs"), and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned matter. MoginRubin LLP will continue to represent Plaintiffs Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc.,Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center LLC, and Rodrock Chiropractic, PA. Attorney Jennifer M. Oliver terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/30/2022) (ama)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #396 Letter filed by Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., AIM MEDIA TEXAS OPERATING, LLC, Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Journal, Inc., Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, ECENT Corporation, Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Rome News Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Marion Publishing Company, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Gale Force Media, LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Coastal Point LLC, Times Journal, Inc., Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Eagle Printing Company, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Appen Media Group, Inc., Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Flag Publications, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/22/2022) (ama)
November 22, 2022 Filing 396 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated November 22, 2022 re: Plaintiff Appen Media Group. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Appen Media Group, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Mitchell, David)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO SEALLIMITED PERSONAL INFORMATION IN EXHIBITS A, B, C, AND D TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MCCALLUM IN SUPPORT OF GOOGLE LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS WITHHELD AS PRIVILEGED: granting #386 Motion to Seal. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/18/2022) (ama)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Civil Case Management Plans (the "Plans") have been submitted by or with the input of the parties in accordance with Rule 26(f)(3), Fed. R. Civ. P., and Pretrial Order No. 2 (Doc. 309). Having considered those Plans and any accompanying submissions, the Court enters the following Scheduling Order: Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except pursuant to the procedures set forth in Pre-Trial Order Nos. 2, 3 and 4. Any motion to amend or join additional parties (except as to the state law claims, as to which amendments are stayed pending further Order) shall be filed within 30 days of this Order. The parties shall negotiate an appropriate protocol regarding Electronically Stored Information and present either an agreed-upon proposed stipulation, or their respective positions as to those portions of the stipulation on which they do not agree, by January 13, 2023. The parties reserve all rights to object to discovery, including on relevance grounds. In view of the Opinion and Order of September 13, 2022, discovery relating to the Network Bidding Agreement is stayed pending further Order. Initial disclosures, pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1), if they have not been previously served, shall be served by January 13, 2023. The parties shall comply with their obligations under Rule 26(e) to supplement or correct initial disclosures in a timely manner. All fact discovery shall be completed by June 28, 2024. The Court has considered the substantial document production that has already been made in these actions and the complexities and other exceptional circumstances presented by these actions. The parties are to conduct discovery in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Southern District of New York. The interim deadlines may be extended by the written consent of the parties without application to the Court, provided that all fact discovery is completed by the date set forth in paragraph 5 above: Initial requests for production of documents and data shall be served byJanuary 27, 2023. The parties shall substantially complete production of documents, including data responsive to the initial requests, within four months of service. No Interrogatories shall be served except in compliance with Local Rule 33.3(a) without first obtaining leave of Court, except as follows: defendants may serve one set of interrogatories not to exceed 25 questions on each named plaintiff, including named class representatives, in each MemberCase by January 27, 2023. Requests to Admit for the purpose of authenticating documents may be served no later than 45 days prior to the close of fact discovery identified in paragraph 5 above. Depositions of fact witnesses shall be completed by the close of fact discovery identified in paragraph 5 above. And as set forth herein. All expert discovery shall be completed by December 27, 2024. Plaintiffs shall serve opening reports of all experts within 45 days after the close of fact discovery. Defendant(s) shall serve responsive expert reports within 45 days after the service of plaintiffs' expert reports. Plaintiffs may then serve any rebuttal expert reports within 45 days after the service of defendant(s)' reports. Depositions of experts shall be completed within 45 days following the service by plaintiffs of rebuttal expert reports. The parties are invited to negotiate an appropriate stipulation regarding expert testimony and present either the agreed-upon proposed stipulations, or their respective positions as to those portions of the stipulations on which they do not agree, by January 12, 2024. Absent further Order from the Court, motions for class certification are deferred until after the close of fact and expert discovery. Plaintiffs in the proposed class actions will move for certification within 30 days after the close of expert discovery. Defendant(s) will respond to the certification motions within 30 days after their filing, and each of the class plaintiffs may file a reply within 20 days after the filing of defendant(s)' responses. All motions and applications shall be governed by the Court's Individual Practices, including pre-motion letter requirements. Pursuant to the authority of Rule 16(c)(2), any motion for summary judgment will be deemed untimely unless a pre-motion letter relating thereto is filed no later than 14 days after the date set by the Court for the close of expert discovery. No party shall file any summary judgment motions prior to the close of expert discovery. The time for filing Final Pre-Trial Submissions is stayed pending further Order of this Court. The next Case Management Conference will be held on February 15, 2023 at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 11D. No matter may be raised at the Conference unless a letter detailing the party's position is filed with the Court 14 day in advance of the Conference. Any response shall be filed 7 days thereafter. This procedure shall apply to all future Conferences. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2024. Expert Discovery due by 12/27/2024. Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/21/2022) (ama)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER TO WITHDRAW DANIEL V. DORRIS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting (383) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion of Daniel V. Dorris to withdraw as attorney of record in the above-entitled litigation is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Daniel V. Dorris be withdrawn as Counsel for Associated Newspapers Ltd. and Mail Media, Inc. in the above-referenced actions. Attorney Daniel V. Dorris terminated in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC. Attorney Daniel V. Dorris terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/18/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC (tg)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 4 granting #316 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #318 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #320 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #325 Motion for Leave to File Document; terminating #357 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; terminating #367 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court Orders as follows: 1. Conforming Amendments and/or Motions to Amend have been filed by Lead Counsel in the Advertiser Class Action (Doc 316), Lead Counsel in the Publisher Class Action (Doc 320), Counsel in the Associated Newspapers and Mail Media individual publisher action (Doc 318) and Counsel for 24 Newspaper plaintiffs in individual publisher actions (Doc 325). Without conceding that the proposed amended pleadings state a claim for relief, defendant Google LLC, including to the extent applicable Alphabet, Inc. and YouTube LLC (collectively "Google") do not oppose the filing of the amended pleadings subject to its right to move to dismiss the amended pleadings (Doc 354). Google seeks leave to move to dismiss the proposed amended pleadings (Doc 367). In the case of the motions filed by Lead Counsel in the Advertiser Class Action and counsel for 24 Newspaper plaintiffs in the individual publisher actions, Meta Platforms, Inc. ("Meta") opposes the amendments on grounds of futility (Docs 355 & 356). The Court will grant leave to file the amended pleadings (Docs 316, 318, 320 and 325) without adjudicating the issue of futility, and subject to the right of each defendant to move to dismiss the amended pleadings. The amended pleadings (each of which has been submitted as part of the motions to amend) shall be separately filed by December 2, 2022. 2. Plaintiffs SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Skinny School LLC and Mint Rose Day Spa LLC assert that they may amend their complaints as of right. 1 Pursuant to the Court's authority under Rule 16(b)(3)(A), Fed. R. Civ. P., any amended pleading to be filed as of right shall be filed by December 2, 2022. 3. By February 3, 2023, Google and, to the extent applicable, Meta may move to dismiss each of the federal claims in the amended pleadings authorized or contemplated in paragraphs 1 and 2 hereof and the complaint in any other Member Case of this MDL (other than the action brought by the State Plaintiffs), including the Organic Panaceas complaint. Each set of plaintiffs may respond by March 3, 2023 and Google and Meta may each reply by March 31, 2023. Each party's main briefs may not exceed 30 pages and reply briefs may not exceed 20 pages. In view of the Court's September 13, 2022 Opinion and Order addressing many overlapping issues, the parties may reference but should not brief issues that have been decided by the Court in the September 13 ruling unless necessitated by the unique allegations of the non-movant's pleading. 4. Google seeks to file a motion to dismiss the state law claims in the State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Doc 357). The State Plaintiffs seek to amend their pleadings before any motion to dismiss is filed. The Court will continue the stay of Google's time to answer, the time for any amendment by the State Plaintiffs and any motion practice on the state law claims without prejudice to the right of any party to apply to the Court to dissolve the stay ninety days after entry of this Order. The State Plaintiffs and Google shall meet and confer on a stipulation as to the effect on any of the state law claims of the Court's Opinion and Order of September 13, 2022, including preservation of a party's right to appeal or reinstate a state law claim that survives or is dismissed premised on the ruling on the analogue federal antitrust claim, and report to the Court within 21 days. 5. The stay in paragraph 4 shall also apply to any state law claim in any of the other Member Cases of this MDL. 6. The Clerk shall terminate the parties' motions and letter motions (Docs 316, 318, 320, 325, 357, 367 in 21-md-3010; Doc 54 in 21-cv-3446; Doc 214 in 21- cv-6841; and Doc 115 in 21-cv-7034). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/18/2022) (vfr)
November 18, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2022. Motions due by 2/3/2023. Responses due by 3/3/2023 Replies due by 3/31/2023. (vfr)
November 16, 2022 Filing 390 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #368 MOTION to Compel Google LLC to Produce Documents Withheld as Privileged and Clarifying Guidelines for Production . . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra..(Sharp, Dena)
November 14, 2022 Filing 389 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Robert J. McCallum in Support re: #386 MOTION to Seal Limited Personal Information in Exhibits A, B, C, and D to the Declaration of Robert J. McCallum in Support of Google LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Compelling Production of Documents Withheld as Privile. Document filed by Youtube, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Facebook Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Unredacted), #2 Exhibit B (Unredacted), #3 Exhibit C (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit D (Unredacted))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #386 .(Mahr, Eric)
November 14, 2022 Filing 388 DECLARATION of Robert J. McCallum in Support re: #386 MOTION to Seal Limited Personal Information in Exhibits A, B, C, and D to the Declaration of Robert J. McCallum in Support of Google LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Compelling Production of Documents Withheld as Privile. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D (Redacted)).(Mahr, Eric)
November 14, 2022 Filing 387 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #386 MOTION to Seal Limited Personal Information in Exhibits A, B, C, and D to the Declaration of Robert J. McCallum in Support of Google LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Compelling Production of Documents Withheld as Privile . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Mahr, Eric)
November 14, 2022 Filing 386 MOTION to Seal Limited Personal Information in Exhibits A, B, C, and D to the Declaration of Robert J. McCallum in Support of Google LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Compelling Production of Documents Withheld as Privileged. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Motion to Seal).(Mahr, Eric)
November 14, 2022 Filing 385 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #368 MOTION to Compel Google LLC to Produce Documents Withheld as Privileged and Clarifying Guidelines for Production . . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Mahr, Eric)
November 14, 2022 Filing 384 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated November 14, 2022 re: #367 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated November 4, 2022. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
November 11, 2022 Filing 383 MOTION for Daniel V. Dorris to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Thorne, John)
November 10, 2022 Filing 382 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Dena C. Sharp and Tina Wolfson dated November 10, 2022 re: #367 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated November 4, 2022. . Document filed by Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Kinin, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa..(Sharp, Dena)
November 10, 2022 Filing 381 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated November 10, 2022 re: Response to Google's Pre-Motion Letter ECF 367. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Flag Publications, Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Journal, Inc., Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Matters Letter Relates To).(Vash, Serina)
November 10, 2022 Filing 380 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Fred T. Isquith Sr. dated November 10, 2022 re: (367 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated November 4, 2022. . Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06870-PKC, 1:21-cv-07045-PKC.(Isquith, Frederick)
November 10, 2022 Filing 379 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated November 10, 2022 re: (367 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated November 4, 2022. . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
November 10, 2022 Filing 378 MOTION for Jennifer Marie Oliver to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06910-PKC.(Mogin, Daniel)
November 10, 2022 Filing 377 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne dated November 10, 2022 re: (367 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated November 4, 2022. . Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Thorne, John)
November 9, 2022 Filing 376 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #316 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Advertiser Class Action Complaint . . Document filed by Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Kinin, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa..(Sharp, Dena)
November 9, 2022 Filing 375 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (325 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [Newspaper Plaintiffs]. . Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Jodlowski, Steven)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting #370 Motion for Christopher C. Goodnow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #366 Motion for Marie W.L. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
November 9, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (370 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 60 in 1:21-cv-03446-PKC) MOTION for Christopher C. Goodnow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-26931002. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC(sgz)
November 7, 2022 Filing 372 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated November 7, 2022 re: response to Dkt. No. #358 . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Orsini, Kevin)
November 7, 2022 Filing 371 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated 11/07/2022 re: Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O).(Mahr, Eric)
November 7, 2022 Filing 370 MOTION for Christopher C. Goodnow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-26931002. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christopher C. Goodnow, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Goodnow, Christopher)
November 4, 2022 Filing 369 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #368 MOTION to Compel Google LLC to Produce Documents Withheld as Privileged and Clarifying Guidelines for Production . . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Partial Clawback Retraction).(Sharp, Dena)
November 4, 2022 Filing 368 MOTION to Compel Google LLC to Produce Documents Withheld as Privileged and Clarifying Guidelines for Production . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra..(Sharp, Dena)
November 4, 2022 Filing 367 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated November 4, 2022. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
November 4, 2022 Filing 366 MOTION for Marie W.L. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Supporting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Nevada Supreme Court, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the California Supreme Court).(Martin, Marie)
November 4, 2022 Filing 365 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated 11/04/2022 re: Response to State Plaintiffs' November 3, 2022 Letter. Document filed by Google LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
November 4, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #366 MOTION for Marie W.L. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 4, 2022 Pro Hac Vice Fee Due: for #361 MOTION for Marie W.L. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. (laq)
November 4, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #361 MOTION for Marie W.L. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the motion to appear pro hac vice was not filed in civil cases 1:21-cv-03446. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the lead case and a separate Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in each case and pay the filing fee for each motion - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sac)
November 3, 2022 Filing 364 ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of The Newspaper Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Pursuant to the Court's October 24, 2022 Order re: (39 in 1:21-cv-06884-PKC, 57 in 1:21-cv-06840-PKC, 54 in 1:21-cv-06912-PKC, 47 in 1:21-cv-06796-PKC, 39 in 1:21-cv-06881-PKC, 33 in 1:21-cv-06909-PKC, 30 in 1:22-cv-01705-PKC, 25 in 1:21-cv-08032-PKC, 31 in 1:21-cv-06824-PKC, 39 in 1:21-cv-06817-PKC, 23 in 1:22-cv-01704-PKC, 42 in 1:21-cv-06828-PKC, 22 in 1:21-cv-10186-PKC, 31 in 1:22-cv-06997-PKC, 48 in 1:21-cv-06888-PKC, 30 in 1:21-cv-06915-PKC, 22 in 1:22-cv-01971-PKC, 21 in 1:21-cv-10187-PKC, 56 in 1:21-cv-06871-PKC, 353 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 24 in 1:22-cv-01693-PKC, 36 in 1:21-cv-06794-PKC, 22 in 1:21-cv-10188-PKC, 24 in 1:22-cv-01701-PKC, 28 in 1:21-cv-09523-PKC) Order,,,. Document filed by Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Rome News Media, LLC, J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Journal, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Coastal Point LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Eagle Printing Company, ECENT Corporation, Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Newton County Appeal Inc., Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Facebook Inc., Google LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Newspaper Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [Filed Under Seal])Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #353 .(Mitchell, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 363 NOTICE of The Newspaper Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Pursuant to the Court's October 24, 2022 Order re: (39 in 1:21-cv-06884-PKC, 57 in 1:21-cv-06840-PKC, 54 in 1:21-cv-06912-PKC, 47 in 1:21-cv-06796-PKC, 39 in 1:21-cv-06881-PKC, 33 in 1:21-cv-06909-PKC, 30 in 1:22-cv-01705-PKC, 25 in 1:21-cv-08032-PKC, 31 in 1:21-cv-06824-PKC, 39 in 1:21-cv-06817-PKC, 23 in 1:22-cv-01704-PKC, 42 in 1:21-cv-06828-PKC, 22 in 1:21-cv-10186-PKC, 31 in 1:22-cv-06997-PKC, 48 in 1:21-cv-06888-PKC, 30 in 1:21-cv-06915-PKC, 22 in 1:22-cv-01971-PKC, 21 in 1:21-cv-10187-PKC, 56 in 1:21-cv-06871-PKC, 353 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 24 in 1:22-cv-01693-PKC, 36 in 1:21-cv-06794-PKC, 22 in 1:21-cv-10188-PKC, 24 in 1:22-cv-01701-PKC, 28 in 1:21-cv-09523-PKC) Order,,,. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - placeholder [filed under seal], #2 Exhibit 2 - Newspaper Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [Redacted])Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Mitchell, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 362 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller dated 11/03/2022 re: Reply to pre-motion letter Doc. 357. Document filed by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
November 3, 2022 Filing 361 MOTION for Marie W.L. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Supporting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the Nevada Supreme Court, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from the California Supreme Court).(Martin, Marie)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (324) Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. ENDORSEMENT: Motion provisionally granted. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/1/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC (jca)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER PROVISIONALLY GRANTING DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO SEAL LIMITED PERSONA INFORMATION IN EXHIBIT A TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MCCALLUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO SEAL LIMITED PERSONAL INFORMATION IN THE OCTOBER 21, 2022 PRIVILEGE LOG in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC; granting (349) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. ORDERS that the redacted content within the publicly filed Privilege Log in Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. McCallum in Support of Google LLC's Motion to Seal Limited Personal Information in the October 21, 2022 Privilege Log shall be maintained under seal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/1/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (jca)
October 31, 2022 Filing 358 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier, David Boies, Dena C. Sharp, Tina Wolfson dated 10/31/2022 re: Per Court's Instructions in Pre-Trial Order No. 2 - Plaintiffs Lead Attorneys submit Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
October 28, 2022 Filing 357 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss and to Strike addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated 10/28/2022. Document filed by Google LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
October 26, 2022 Filing 356 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: (325 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [Newspaper Plaintiffs]. . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Orsini, Kevin)
October 26, 2022 Filing 355 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: (316 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Advertiser Class Action Complaint . . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Orsini, Kevin)
October 26, 2022 Filing 354 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated October 26, 2022 re: Private Plaintiffs' October 5, 2022 motions for leave to amend (ECF Nos. 316, 318, 320, 325). Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER GRANTING NEWSPAPER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL: The Court, having reviewed the relevant submissions and determined that the information sought to be redacted by Meta Platforms, Inc. is competitively sensitive and the interests in preventing competitive harm outweigh any applicable presumption of access, see Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 120 (2d Cir. 2006), hereby: ORDERS that the Newspaper Plaintiffs file a public version of their proposed Amended Complaint that redacts information highlighted in Exhibit A to Meta Platform, Inc.'s Response in Support of the Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal, and that the unredacted proposed Amended Complaint be filed under seal. The sealing application is provisionally approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/24/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ks)
October 21, 2022 Filing 352 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Robert J. McCallum in Support re: #349 MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Youtube, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Facebook Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Unredacted Privilege Log))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #349 .(Mahr, Eric)
October 21, 2022 Filing 351 DECLARATION of Robert J. McCallum in Support re: #349 MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Privilege Log)).(Mahr, Eric)
October 21, 2022 Filing 350 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #349 MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Mahr, Eric)
October 21, 2022 Filing 349 MOTION to Seal . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re: Motion to Seal).(Mahr, Eric)
October 21, 2022 Filing 348 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr dated October 21, 2022 re: October 7, 2022 Court Order (ECF 333). Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Mahr, Eric)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting #340 Motion for David A.F. McCoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 20, 2022 Filing 346 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Related Document Number: #323 ..(Orsini, Kevin) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 20, 2022 Filing 345 DECLARATION of Kevin J. Orsini in Support re: (323 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2-3 of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022.. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Orsini, Kevin)
October 20, 2022 Filing 344 DECLARATION of Amit Bhojwani in Support re: (323 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2-3 of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022.. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Orsini, Kevin)
October 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (27 in 1:21-cv-09523-PKC, 346 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 21 in 1:21-cv-10186-PKC, 35 in 1:21-cv-06794-PKC, 38 in 1:21-cv-06881-PKC, 53 in 1:21-cv-06912-PKC, 21 in 1:22-cv-01971-PKC, 32 in 1:21-cv-06909-PKC, 41 in 1:21-cv-06828-PKC, 29 in 1:21-cv-06915-PKC, 38 in 1:21-cv-06884-PKC, 46 in 1:21-cv-06796-PKC, 30 in 1:21-cv-06824-PKC, 38 in 1:21-cv-06817-PKC, 29 in 1:22-cv-01705-PKC, 21 in 1:21-cv-10188-PKC, 55 in 1:21-cv-06871-PKC, 20 in 1:21-cv-10187-PKC, 23 in 1:22-cv-01701-PKC, 24 in 1:21-cv-08032-PKC, 47 in 1:21-cv-06888-PKC, 22 in 1:22-cv-01704-PKC, 23 in 1:22-cv-01693-PKC, 30 in 1:22-cv-06997-PKC, 56 in 1:21-cv-06840-PKC) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (tp)
October 19, 2022 Filing 343 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (323 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2-3 of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022. ("Response in Support of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal"). Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Google LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #334 .(Orsini, Kevin)
October 19, 2022 Filing 342 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (323 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2-3 of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022. . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Redactions)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Orsini, Kevin)
October 19, 2022 Filing 341 RESPONSE to Motion re: #323 LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2-3 of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022., #324 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Declaration of Philip C. Korologos. . Document filed by Google LLC..(Mahr, Eric)
October 19, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #340 MOTION for David A.F. McCoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the State of Arkansas. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26831433. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sac)
October 18, 2022 Filing 340 MOTION for David A.F. McCoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the State of Arkansas. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26831433. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(McCoy, David)
October 17, 2022 Filing 339 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Solomon B. Cera on behalf of Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. New Address: Cera LLP, 201 California Street, Suite 1240, San Francisco, California, United States 94111, (415) 777-2230..(Cera, Solomon)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting #337 Motion for Mary Frances Jowers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 15, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #337 MOTION for Mary Frances Jowers to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the State of South Carolina. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26812301. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>/F. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
October 13, 2022 Filing 337 MOTION for Mary Frances Jowers to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the State of South Carolina. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26812301. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Text).(Jowers, Mary)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting #335 Motion for Sabria McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 12, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #335 MOTION for Sabria McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
October 10, 2022 Filing 335 MOTION for Sabria McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Florida Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit NY Certificate Of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(McElroy, Sabria)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER: in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC; granting (323) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. The application to file under seal is provisionally GRANTED.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/07/202) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER: in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC; terminating (331) Letter Motion for Conference re: (331 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Conference re: (297) Protective Order. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller dated 10/06/2022. in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. Google shall file a privilege log within 14 days. Plaintiffs may file a motion 14 days thereafter. Submission of exemplars in camera approved. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/07/202) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting #315 Motion for James P. Denvir to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 6, 2022 Filing 331 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #297 Protective Order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller dated 10/06/2022. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2022.08.10 Letter from J. Sessions).(Keller, Ashley)
October 6, 2022 Filing 330 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sabria McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26782194. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit FL Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(McElroy, Sabria) Modified on 10/6/2022 (aea).
October 6, 2022 Filing 329 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022 re: Sealed Exhibits 2 -3 to Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend. Document filed by Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Rome News Media, LLC, J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Journal, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Eagle Printing Company, ECENT Corporation, Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Newton County Appeal Inc., Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Newspaper Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 3 - Newspaper Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Redline)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #323 .(Mitchell, David)
October 6, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #330 MOTION for Sabria McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26782194. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (aea)
October 6, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #315 MOTION for James P. Denvir to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-26779438. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 5, 2022 Filing 328 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #325 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [Newspaper Plaintiffs]. . Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Schedule of Actions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Newspaper Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [Redacted], #3 Exhibit 3 - Newspaper Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Redline [Redacted]).(Mitchell, David)
October 5, 2022 Filing 327 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Philip Korologos in Support re: (118 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC, 324 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Declaration of Philip C. Korologos.. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Progressive, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc, THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., Alphabet Inc., Mark J. Astarita, Google L.L.C, JLASALLE ENTERPRISES LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Youtube L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted), #2 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #324 .(Korologos, Philip)
October 5, 2022 Filing 326 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (118 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC, 324 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Declaration of Philip C. Korologos. . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
October 5, 2022 Filing 325 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [Newspaper Plaintiffs]. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend).(Mitchell, David)
October 5, 2022 Filing 324 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Declaration of Philip C. Korologos. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
October 5, 2022 Filing 323 LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2-3 of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc...(Mitchell, David)
October 5, 2022 Filing 322 DECLARATION of Philip Korologos in Support re: (115 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC, 320 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
October 5, 2022 Filing 321 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (115 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC, 320 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint . . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
October 5, 2022 Filing 320 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
October 5, 2022 Filing 319 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (318 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 54 in 1:21-cv-03446-PKC) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Daily Mail Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redline Complaint & Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Catalogue of Amendments)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Thorne, John)
October 5, 2022 Filing 318 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Thorne, John)
October 5, 2022 Filing 317 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #316 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Advertiser Class Action Complaint . . Document filed by Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Kinin, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consolidated Advertiser Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redline version of Consolidated Advertiser Class Action Complaint).(Sharp, Dena)
October 5, 2022 Filing 316 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Advertiser Class Action Complaint . Document filed by Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Kinin, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Advertiser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend).(Sharp, Dena)
October 5, 2022 Filing 315 MOTION for James P. Denvir to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-26779438. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Denvir, James)
September 30, 2022 Filing 314 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys - W. Mark Lanier, David Boies, Dena C. Sharp and Tina Wolfson dated 09/30/2022 re: PLA Letter to Update the Court re. Case Management Plan and Discovery Steering Committee. Document filed by The State of Texas.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
September 30, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #313 MOTION for Marie W.L. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26750902. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California 415-865-7000. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
September 29, 2022 Filing 313 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Marie W.L. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26750902. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Nevada, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Martin, Marie) Modified on 9/30/2022 (sgz).
September 20, 2022 Filing 312 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Archana Tamoshunas on behalf of Mark J. Astarita. New Address: Taus, Cebulash & Landau, LLP, 123 William Street, Suite 1900A, New York, New York, USA 10038, 212-931-0704..(Tamoshunas, Archana)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 PRETRIAL- ORDER NO. 3: The Court Orders as follows: Any Individual Action, i.e., an action that is not a putative class action or the action brought by the States, may make Conforming Amendments or move to amend on the same schedule and subject to the same conditions and requirements as set forth in Paragraphs 1-4 of Pre-Trial Order No. 2, with the same rights and obligations afforded to defendant. Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys (as defined in Pre-Trial Order No. 2) shall within 14 days designate a Discovery Steering Committee whose membership shall not exceed five lawyers, including at least one lawyer who represents a plaintiff in an Individual Action. The Discovery Steering Committee shall perform such tasks as are assigned to it from time to time by Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys. The Discovery Steering Committee may, in turn, assign specific tasks to other lawyers. Among other responsibilities, the Discovery Steering Committee shall draft a common set of Rule 34 requests and common set of interrogatories consistent with Local Civil Rule 33.3(a) and a common set of non-party discovery requests, and shall submit a draft set to all counsel for a plaintiff in the MDL, who may submit comments to the Discovery Steering Committee within 7 days of receipt of the draft. The Discovery Steering Committee shall consider such comments before service of the requests. Counsel for any plaintiff may apply to the Court for leave to serve a supplemental discovery request that complies with Rule 26 and is non-duplicative of the requests served by the Discovery Steering Committee. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/16/2022) (ama)
September 15, 2022 Filing 310 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Marie W.L. Martin. Document filed by State of Nevada..(Newman, Michelle)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2: Pursuant to the authority of Rules 16(b) and 23(d)(1), the Court Orders as follows: Any Class Action (by and through its Lead Class Counsel in the case of publishers or Interim Co-Lead Counsel as to advertisers) or any individual plaintiff, i.e., a plaintiff not asserting a class claim, may within 21 days submit a proposed amended pleading containing only Conforming Amendments (both clean copy and copy marked to show changes). Defendant shall set forth its consent or objection within 7 days. If the amended pleading contains only Conforming Amendments, the Court anticipates granting leave to amend and lifting the stay on discovery. "Conforming Amendments" are amendments that (a) add claims or allegations of anticompetitive conduct that were asserted in the TAC and survived the Court's September 13 Opinion & Order or remove claims or allegations of anticompetitive conduct asserted in the TAC that did not survive the September 13 Opinion & Order; (b) amend the allegations of individual harm to the plaintiffs, allegations specific to the named plaintiffs, the class definitions, the state law claims, the damages and relief sought; or (c) are necessitated by the party or counsel's obligations under Rule 11. Any Class Action (by and through Lead Counsel) or any individual plaintiff who wishes to amend its pleading to make amendments that do not fall entirely within the definition of Conforming Amendments may file a motion to amend within 21 days, the defendant or defendants may oppose the motion 21 days thereafter and plaintiff may reply 14 days thereafter. The motion shall annex the proposed amended pleading (clean copy and copy marked to show changes). The pre-motion letter requirement is waived for the motion to amend. Discovery is stayed in such an action pending the hearing and determination of the motion to amend. If no amendment is sought by a plaintiff, defendant or defendants shall answer the complaint or submit a pre-motion letter within 30 days. Lead Counsel for the State plaintiffs (Mr. Lanier), Interim Lead Co-Counsel for the putative advertiser class (Ms. Sharp and Ms. Wolfson) and Lead Counsel for the Publisher Class (Mr. Boies) are collectively referred to as the "Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys." Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys shall meet and confer on a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order and each Lead Counsel may designate other counsel to participate in discussions. Within 21 days of this Order, Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys shall submit a joint proposal to counsel for defendant and counsel for any individual plaintiff, whose input and proposed changes should be solicited, considered, discussed and, to the extent of agreement, incorporated in a proposal to be submitted by Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys to the Court within 45 days. Any party may submit written objections or counterproposals within 7 days of the submission to the Court by Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys. The Court will then issue an Order. The Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order need not and should not provide for every contingency. But it should address at least the matters in the Court's proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order for an ordinary case (omitting paragraphs 1, 2, 9, 10 and 12) modified for the needs of these coordinated cases. Some issues, such as the timing of class certification motions, will be unique to fewer than all cases. The Court is open to expanding the number of deponents above the presumptive limit in Rule 30(a)(2)(A)(1) but will only do so-and may do so from time to time-upon identification of the particular witnesses by name (unless a Rule 30(b)(6) witness) and description of the matters on which he or she has unique knowledge. There will be no duplicative questioning of witnesses, and, absent good cause, no deponent will be examined more than once. The Local Civil Rules of this District, including Local Civil Rule 33.3, and the Court's Individual Practices fully apply to this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/14/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 OPINION AND ORDER re: (217 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. filed by Google LLC, (176 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. filed by Google LLC. For the reasons explained, Google's motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to Count IV and otherwise DENIED. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion. (21-md-3010, Docket # 217; 21-cv-6841, Docket # 176.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/13/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (rro)
August 31, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Oral Argument held on 8/31/2022 re: #217 MOTION to Dismiss. Court reserves decision. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch and Martha Martin) (Nacanther, Florence)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (207 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 306 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) Letter, filed by State of Indiana, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Idaho, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of Louisiana. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED without prejudice to the use of Courtroom Connect for live streaming of the transcript. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/26/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
August 26, 2022 Filing 306 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller dated 08/26/2022 re: Oral Argument Scheduled for August 31, 2022. Document filed by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNEL: granting (303) Motion to Withdraw (303 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/24/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC. *** Attorney Nicholas G. Grimmer terminated. (ama) Modified on 8/24/2022 (ama).
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, attorney Maxwell H. Sawyer no longer represents Plaintiffs in this matter, and shall be removed from the ECF docket. Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP, and no party is prejudiced by Mr. Sawyer's withdrawal. The Clerk terminates CM/ECF notices as to Maxwell H. Sawyer for this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/23/2022) (ama)
August 23, 2022 Filing 303 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel. Document filed by The State of Texas..(Young, Trevor)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting (302) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Maxwell H Sawyer terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (Nacanther, Florence)
August 12, 2022 Filing 302 MOTION for Maxwell H. Sawyer to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Davidson, Stuart)
August 4, 2022 Filing 301 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dennis Stewart on behalf of Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.. New Address: Gustafson Gluek PLLC, 600 W. Broadway, Suite 3300, San Diego, CA, USA 92101, (619) 595-3299..(Stewart, Dennis)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER: re: (217 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (217 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. The Court will hear argument on Google's motion to dismiss the States' Third Amended Complaint on August 31, 2022 at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 11D. SO ORDERED.:( Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/28/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #298 Motion for Daniel Strunk to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
May 26, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #298 MOTION for Daniel Strunk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-26197748. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
May 25, 2022 Filing 298 MOTION for Daniel Strunk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-26197748. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Strunk, Daniel)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/11/22) (yv)
May 11, 2022 Filing 296 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated May 10, 2022 re: Confidentiality Order. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
May 10, 2022 Filing 295 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A).(Mahr, Eric)
May 10, 2022 Filing 294 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier and Ashley Keller dated May 10, 2022 re: Confidentiality Order Update. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appendix A-Source Code Companion, #2 Exhibit Appendix B-Plfs Confidentiality Order Redline, #3 Exhibit Appendix C-Plfs Proposed Confidentiality Order).(Lanier, W.)
May 5, 2022 Filing 293 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (217 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint., (176 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Google LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
May 3, 2022 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 290 Transcript. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (Deleted as per Transcriber request) (js)
May 3, 2022 Filing 292 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/19/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
May 3, 2022 Filing 291 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/19/2022 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
May 3, 2022 Filing 289 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vadim Egoul on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Egoul, Vadim)
April 26, 2022 Filing 288 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Zina Bash on behalf of State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota. New Address: Keller Postman LLC, 111 Congress Avenue, Suite 500, Austin, TX, USA 78701, (501) 690-0990. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Bash, Zina)
April 26, 2022 Filing 287 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brooke Clason Smith on behalf of State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota. New Address: Keller Postman LLC, 150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100, Chicago, IL, USA 60606, (312) 741-5220. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Smith, Brooke)
April 26, 2022 Filing 286 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jason Allen Zweig on behalf of State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota. New Address: Keller Postman LLC, 150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100, Chicago, IL, USA 60606, (312) 741-5220. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Zweig, Jason)
April 26, 2022 Filing 285 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ashley C. Keller on behalf of State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota. New Address: Keller Postman LLC, 150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100, Chicago, IL, USA 60606, (312) 741-5220. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
April 19, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Case Management Conference held on 4/19/2022. Parties to submit revised proposed confidentiality order within 21 days. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch) (Nacanther, Florence)
April 18, 2022 Filing 284 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Ellen Margolis on behalf of Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Margolis, Sara)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT META PLATFORM, INC.'S MOTION TO CHANGE PARTY NAME ON DOCKET granting #279 Motion re: #279 MOTION to Change Party Name on Docket . Upon consideration of Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc.'s motion to change the party name on the docket of Civil Action No. 1:21-md-3010-PKC to reflect Defendant's name change from Facebook, Inc. to Meta Platforms, Inc., it is hereby GRANTED; and it is further: ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall change the party name on the docket of Civil Action No. 1:21-md-3010-PKC from "Facebook, Inc." to "Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc." (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/14/2022) (ate)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER: denying (281) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. The Conference relates principally to a dispute over the protective order between private litigants and Google. The States are welcome to be heard if they having something relevant to say but their attendance is optional. Application DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/14/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
April 13, 2022 Filing 281 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Mark Lanier and Ashley Keller dated April 13, 2022. Document filed by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas..(Zweig, Jason)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER: There will be a conference on Tuesday, April 19, 2022 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 11D to address matters related to discovery. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 4/19/2022 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/12/2022) (ama)
April 11, 2022 Filing 279 MOTION to Change Party Name on Docket . Document filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order).(Orsini, Kevin)
April 11, 2022 Filing 278 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Facebook Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
April 11, 2022 Filing 277 NOTICE of Change of Party Name. Document filed by Facebook Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER GRANTING THE STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA'S MOTION TO AMEND CASE CAPTION granting (265) Motion to Amend/Correct (265 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption. in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. Before the Court is the State of North Dakota's Motion to Amend Case Caption. After consideration of the motion, the Court is of the opinion the Motion should be GRANTED. The Case Caption is to be amended indicating Drew H. Wrigley as the Attorney General for North Dakota, in lieu of Wayne Stenehjem. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/6/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (tg)
April 6, 2022 Filing 275 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated April 6, 2022 re: Confidentiality Order. Document filed by Facebook Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
April 6, 2022 Filing 274 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr dated April 6, 2022 re: Confidentiality Order. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Agreed Protective Order).(Mahr, Eric)
April 6, 2022 Filing 273 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference On behalf of: Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota; the Advertiser Class; the Publisher Class; Plaintiffs Associated Newspapers, Ltd. and Mail Media, Inc.; and Direct Action Newspaper Plaintiffs addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller dated 04/06/2022. Document filed by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Draft of Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Texas Protective Order FINAL, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Confidentiality Agreement FINAL (TX CID))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
April 6, 2022 Filing 272 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller dated 04/06/2022 re: Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota; the Advertiser Class; the Publisher Class; Plaintiffs Associated Newspapers, Ltd. and Mail Media, Inc.; and Direct Action Newspaper Plaintiffs; Defendant Google LLC; and Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc., submission of draft confidentiality order. Document filed by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Joint Protective Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER: As the Court explained, the States' Third Amended Complaint is a bellwether for the pleadings of other plaintiffs (to the extent applicable to a private party's claim) and so the brief of the Publisher Plaintiffs (Doc 267-3) will be deemed filed on their behalf as parties to the MDL. Google's date for reply is extended to May 5, 2022 and its page limit increased to 30 pages. SO ORDERED., ( Replies due by 5/5/2022.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/06/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
April 1, 2022 Filing 270 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr dated 04/01/2022 re: Response to State Plaintiffs' Letter Dated March 29, 2022. Document filed by Google LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
March 29, 2022 Filing 269 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller dated 03/29/2022 re: In re Google Digital Advertising, 1:21-md-03010 (PKC); State of Texas, et al. v. Google LLC, No. 1:21-cv-06841 (PKC). Document filed by State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
March 28, 2022 Filing 268 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated March 28, 2022 re: respectfully responding to Publisher Plaintiffs' pre-motion letter dated March 24, 2022, ECF 267. Document filed by Google LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
March 24, 2022 Filing 267 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos on behalf of Publisher Plaintiffs dated March 24, 2022 re: pre-motion letter for filing a Motion for Leave to File a Joint Amicus Brief. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
March 24, 2022 Filing 266 RESPONSE to Motion re: (184 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 265 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption. Response and Statement of Non-Opposition to the State of North Dakota's Motion to Amend Case Caption. Document filed by Google LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
March 22, 2022 Filing 265 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption. Document filed by State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Lanier, W.)
March 22, 2022 Filing 264 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: (176 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint., (217 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Keller, Ashley)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER terminating #253 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; terminating #254 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; terminating #255 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Certain movants have sought to be appointed interim lead counsel for essentially the class as defined in their own pleading. They propose in essence that each would serve as interim counsel in the class action that they have filed and envision multiple advertiser class actions against Google LLC and potentially others. They place great emphasis on the differences in the contours in the class definitions they propose and the legal theories they pursue. They propose that each of the separately led class actions would coordinate with the others and have a liaison counsel who would communicate to the Court the unified the position of the various constituencies, or their differences of opinion. All would-be interim counsel profess their devotion to efficiency and non-duplication of efforts. As further set forth in this Order. Nothing herein impairs or intrudes on the attorney-client relationship between the named class representatives in the Cliffy Care and SPX actions and their respective counsel. They are eligible to be considered by co-interim counsel as class representatives and, if not so selected, free to become class members of any class that emerges. They are also free to pursue individual actions on their own. The Clerk is respectfully directed to terminate the motions. (Doc 253, 254, 255.) SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/3/2022) (ks)
March 2, 2022 Filing 262 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #253 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC..(Sharp, Dena)
March 2, 2022 Filing 261 RESPONSE to Motion re: #255 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #254 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Advertiser Class Executive Committee., #253 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC..(Isquith, Frederick)
March 2, 2022 Filing 260 RESPONSE to Motion re: #255 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #254 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Advertiser Class Executive Committee., #253 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . OF THE CLIFFY CARE PLAINTIFFS TO THE APPLICATIONS BY THE SUREFREIGHT AND SPX PLAINTIFFS FOR APPOINTMENT AS INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL FOR CERTAIN CLASSES OF DIGITAL ADVERTISERS. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa..(Rubin, Jonathan)
February 24, 2022 Filing 259 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC..(Isquith, Frederick)
February 23, 2022 Filing 258 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #259) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC..(Isquith, Frederick) Modified on 2/24/2022 (lb).
February 23, 2022 Filing 257 DECLARATION of Fred T. Isquith, Sr. in Support re: #255 MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9).(Isquith, Frederick)
February 23, 2022 Filing 256 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #255 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC..(Isquith, Frederick)
February 23, 2022 Filing 255 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC..(Isquith, Frederick)
February 23, 2022 Filing 254 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Advertiser Class Executive Committee. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TCL Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit RLF Firm Resume).(Lambert, April)
February 23, 2022 Filing 253 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Girard Sharp LLP Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Ahdoot Wolfson, PC Firm Resume).(Sharp, Dena)
February 23, 2022 Filing 252 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE CLASS OF NON-FACEBOOK ADVERTISERS HARMED BY THE FACEBOOK-GOOGLE NETWORK BIDDING AGREEMENT. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 memo of law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Rubin, Jonathan)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER granting motion to withdraw as counsel: granting #247 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Rachel Renee Johnson terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/23/2022) (ama)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO SEAL LIMITED PERSONAL INFORMATION IN EXHIBIT A TO THE DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. EWALT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I THROUGH IV OF STATE PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT: granting (219) Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (178) Motion to Seal in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC. ENDORSEMENT: Motion (Doc. 219) should be terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/16/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER: The Court will entertain written applications for the appointment of Interim Counsel for the Putative Class of Advertisers filed by February 23, 2022. Any responses or objections to any application shall be filed by March 2, 2022. Letter motion (Doc 248) should be terminated by the Clerk. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/11/2022) ( Responses due by 3/2/2022) (ks)
February 9, 2022 Filing 248 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Dena C. Sharp and Tina Wolfson dated February 9, 2022 re: Advertiser Leadership. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC..(Sharp, Dena)
February 9, 2022 Filing 247 MOTION for Rachel Renee Johnson to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Vitor Lindo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Wolfson, Tina)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting #245 Motion for Bethan R. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
February 9, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #245 MOTION for Bethan R. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25702775. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 8, 2022 Filing 245 MOTION for Bethan R. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25702775. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bethan R. Jones, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 PA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Jones, Bethan)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER: Having considered the arguments of the parties, the Court ORDERS as follows: Within 30 days of this Order, Google shall produce to all plaintiffs in the above- captioned MDL (1) all documents without limitation produced by Google or any corporate affiliate to the state of Texas from January 1, 2018 through September 24, 2021, whether pursuant to a CID, voluntarily or otherwise; and (2) to the extent not subsumed by (1), all documents without limitation produced by Google or any corporate affiliate prior to September 24, 2021 to any plaintiff in the above-captioned MDL, including in any action commenced in the Northern District of California. The production shall be protected by the existing protective order. Google is advised that failure to fully comply will result in sanctions pursuant to Rule 37(b), Fed. R. Civ. P., which may include the striking of its answer and entry of judgment against it. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/07/2022) (ama)
February 6, 2022 Filing 243 RESPONSE re: #241 Letter,,,,,, . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 4, 2022 Filing 242 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated February 4, 2022 re: #219 MOTION to Seal Limited Personal Information in Exhibit A to the Declaration of Andrew J. Ewalt in Support of Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Facebook Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
February 4, 2022 Filing 241 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne on behalf of counsel for all private plaintiffs dated February 4, 2022 re: Request for an order compelling Google production. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc...(Thorne, John)
February 3, 2022 Filing 240 RESPONSE re: #239 Letter,, . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
February 1, 2022 Filing 239 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos on behalf of counsel for all private plaintiffs dated February 1, 2022 re: Request for an order compelling the production by Google of all of the approximately 2 million documents it has previously produced to the States in their investigations leading to the Texas AG complaint. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Korologos, Philip)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #236 Motion for Jeffrey A. Lamken to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 27, 2022 Filing 237 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caleb Hayes-Deats on behalf of Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Hayes-Deats, Caleb)
January 27, 2022 Filing 236 MOTION for Jeffrey A. Lamken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25645498. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey A. Lamken, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Lamken, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #234 Motion for Robert E. Litan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 27, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #236 MOTION for Jeffrey A. Lamken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25645498. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 26, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #234 MOTION for Robert E. Litan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25635708. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 25, 2022 Filing 234 MOTION for Robert E. Litan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25635708. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing), #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Litan, Robert)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: granting (231) in case 21md3010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Jonathon D. Byrer hereby withdraws as counsel for Plaintiffs Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P. and The Progressive, Inc. and shall be removed from the Case Management/ Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned matter. Korein Tillery, LLC will continue to represent Plaintiffs Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P. and TheProgressive, Inc. Attorney Jonathon D. Byrer terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/25/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC (ama)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL: granting (230) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Robert E. Litan hereby withdraws as counsel for Plaintiffs Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P. and The Progressive, Inc. and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned matters. Korein Tillery, LLC will continue to represent Plaintiffs Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P. and The Progressive, Inc. Attorney Robert E. Litan terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/25/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC (ama)
January 24, 2022 Filing 231 MOTION for Jonathon D. Byrer to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(O'Keefe, Carol)
January 24, 2022 Filing 230 MOTION for Robert E. Litan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(O'Keefe, Carol)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting #223 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Jacqueline Hsiang Liu is withdrawn as counsel for Defendants Google LLC, Alphabet Inc., and YouTube, LLC and shall be removed from the Case Management/Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned proceeding. Attorney Jacqueline Hsiang Liu terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/24/2022) (ama)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting #224 Motion for Mikaela E. Evans-Aziz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #212 Motion for Koren W. Wong-Ervin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting #208 Motion for Mark P. Hirschboeck to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #207 Motion for Eric J. Maier to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 24, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #224 MOTION for Mikaela E. Evans-Aziz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25621569. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 21, 2022 Filing 224 MOTION for Mikaela E. Evans-Aziz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25621569. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (CA), #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Evans-Aziz, Mikaela)
January 21, 2022 Filing 223 MOTION for Jacqueline Hsiang Liu to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Sessions, Justina)
January 21, 2022 Filing 222 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Andrew J. Ewalt in Support re: (219 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 178 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC) MOTION to Seal Limited Personal Information in Exhibit A to the Declaration of Andrew J. Ewalt in Support of Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Unredacted))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #219 .(Ewalt, Andrew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 221 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Ewalt in Support re: (219 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 178 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC) MOTION to Seal Limited Personal Information in Exhibit A to the Declaration of Andrew J. Ewalt in Support of Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Ewalt, Andrew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 220 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (219 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 178 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC) MOTION to Seal Limited Personal Information in Exhibit A to the Declaration of Andrew J. Ewalt in Support of Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Google LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
January 21, 2022 Filing 219 MOTION to Seal Limited Personal Information in Exhibit A to the Declaration of Andrew J. Ewalt in Support of Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
January 21, 2022 Filing 218 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #217 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Google LLC..(Mahr, Eric)
January 21, 2022 Filing 217 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 3/22/2022.(Mahr, Eric)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #203 Motion for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #202 Motion for Daniel G. Bird to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #201 Motion for Jan Rybnicek to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #200 Motion for Andrew J. Ewalt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
January 21, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #207 MOTION for Eric J. Maier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25610374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 21, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #212 MOTION for Koren W. Wong-Ervin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25614176. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 21, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #208 MOTION for Mark P. Hirschboeck to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25610460. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 20, 2022 Filing 212 MOTION for Koren W. Wong-Ervin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25614176. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Koren W. Wong-Ervin, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Wong-Ervin, Koren)
January 20, 2022 Filing 211 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John David Harkrider on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Harkrider, John)
January 20, 2022 Filing 210 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel S. Bitton on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Bitton, Daniel)
January 20, 2022 Filing 209 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eliana M. Pfeffer on behalf of Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Pfeffer, Eliana)
January 20, 2022 Filing 208 MOTION for Mark P. Hirschboeck to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25610460. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark P. Hirschboeck, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Hirschboeck, Mark)
January 20, 2022 Filing 207 MOTION for Eric J. Maier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25610374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric J. Maier, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 IL Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Maier, Eric)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (177) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Before the Court is a Motion to Withdraw Jamie L. Boyer as counsel for Plaintiff Genius Media Group, Inc. in this matter. The Court has determined that the motion should be GRANTED. It is hereby, ORDERED that Jamie L. Boyer is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiff Genius Media Group, Inc. in this matter; and ORDERED that the clerk terminate CM/ECF notices as to Jamie L. Boyer for this matter. SO ORDERED. Attorney Jamie L Boyer terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/19/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC. (mml)
January 19, 2022 Filing 205 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Lonergan on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Lonergan, Jessica)
January 19, 2022 Filing 204 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justina K. Sessions on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
January 19, 2022 Filing 203 MOTION for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25607524. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel V. Dorris, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 IL Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Dorris, Daniel)
January 19, 2022 Filing 202 MOTION for Daniel G. Bird to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25606887. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel G. Bird, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 MD Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Bird, Daniel)
January 19, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #201 MOTION for Jan Rybnicek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25600698. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 19, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #200 MOTION for Andrew J. Ewalt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25600562. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 19, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #202 MOTION for Daniel G. Bird to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25606887. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 19, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #203 MOTION for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-25607524. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 18, 2022 Filing 201 MOTION for Jan Rybnicek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25600698. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jan Rybnicek, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rybnicek, Jan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 200 MOTION for Andrew J. Ewalt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25600562. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew J. Ewalt, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Ewalt, Andrew)
January 18, 2022 Filing 199 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Kaplin on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Kaplin, Lauren)
January 18, 2022 Filing 198 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert John McCallum on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(McCallum, Robert)
January 18, 2022 Filing 197 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric J. Mahr on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Mahr, Eric)
January 18, 2022 Filing 196 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie S Elmer on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Elmer, Julie)
January 14, 2022 Filing 195 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #152 Amended Complaint,, against Google LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by State of North Dakota, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of South Dakota, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arkansas, State of Montana, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of South Carolina, State of Mississippi, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Nevada. Related document: #152 Amended Complaint,,..(Lanier, W.)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER: granting (174) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (164) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC. The motion to seal the Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED as to the employee names, job titles and contact information identified in paragraphs 114, 115, 157, 251, 352, 364, 371, 385, 397 and 415 but is otherwise DENIED. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion. (21 MD 3010 Docket # 174; 21 Civ. 6841 Docket # 164.) Plaintiffs are directed to publicly file a version of the Third Amended Complaint that conforms to this Order no later than January 14, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/12/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
January 12, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC(ama)
January 12, 2022 Terminate Transcript Deadlines Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC(ama)
January 7, 2022 Filing 193 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jonathan Rubin on behalf of Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. New Address: MoginRubin LLP, 2101 L Street NW, Suite 300, Washington D.C., United States 20037, 202-630-0616..(Rubin, Jonathan)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...Having considered Ms. Vash's letter of December 17 for certain plaintiffs and Ms. Sessions letter of December 21 for Google, it is hereby Ordered by the Court that, as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: (190 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and Interim Protective Order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated December 17, 2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/21/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (vfr)
December 21, 2021 Filing 191 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated December 21, 2021 re: #190 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and Interim Protective Order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated December 17, 2021. . Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Sessions, Justina)
December 17, 2021 Filing 190 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and Interim Protective Order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated December 17, 2021. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Vash, Serina)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (188 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) Response to Motion filed by Facebook Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The intent in granting Google's application was to shield names, job titles and contact information of employees of Google who are not senior executives. The plaintiffs need not redact the titles of Facebook's Chief Executives from the Third Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/06/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
December 6, 2021 Filing 188 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated December 6, 2021 re: #174 MOTION to Seal Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Facebook Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
December 3, 2021 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion re: (164 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 174 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Lanier, W.)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (184 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Facebook Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/1/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ate)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: granting #179 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Abby L. Dennis hereby withdraws as counsel for Plaintiffs Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P. and The Progressive, Inc. and shall be removed from the Case Management/ Electronic Case Files (CM/ECF) notification list in the above-captioned matter. Boies Schiller Flexner will continue to represent Plaintiffs Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P. and The Progressive, Inc. Attorney Abby Lauren Dennis terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/30/2021) (ama)
November 26, 2021 Filing 184 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated November 26, 2021 re: #174 MOTION to Seal Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Facebook Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
November 26, 2021 Filing 183 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Ali Nasiri Amini re: (181 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) Response to Motion to Seal. Document filed by Google LLC, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #174 .(Mahr, Eric)
November 26, 2021 Filing 182 DECLARATION of Ali Nasiri Amini re: (181 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) Response to Motion to Seal. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
November 26, 2021 Filing 181 RESPONSE to Motion re: (164 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 174 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Google LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
November 23, 2021 Filing 180 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. Related Document Number: #179 ..(Korologos, Philip)
November 23, 2021 Filing 179 MOTION for Abby L. Dennis to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
November 16, 2021 Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: (164 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 174 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Organic Panaceas, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Thorne, John)
November 15, 2021 Filing 177 MOTION for Jamie L. Boyer to Withdraw as Attorney for Genius Media Group, Inc.. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(O'Keefe, Carol)
November 12, 2021 Filing 176 REDACTION to (174 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Third Amended Complaint. THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT - REDACTED by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North DakotaFiled In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Lanier, W.)
November 12, 2021 Filing 175 ***SELECTED PARTIES***EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: (152 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by State of North Dakota, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of South Dakota, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arkansas, State of Montana, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of South Carolina, State of Mississippi, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Nevada, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of South Dakota, State of North Dakota, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #174 .(Lanier, W.)
November 12, 2021 Filing 174 MOTION to Seal Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - to be Filed Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Lanier, W.)
November 12, 2021 Filing 173 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Frederic Rottgers on behalf of Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa..(Rottgers, Peter)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #169 Motion for Theodore W. Maya to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
November 10, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #169 MOTION for Theodore W. Maya to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25310724. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 9, 2021 Filing 171 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason M Lindner on behalf of Kinin, Inc...(Lindner, Jason)
November 9, 2021 Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason S. Hartley on behalf of Kinin, Inc...(Hartley, Jason)
November 9, 2021 Filing 169 MOTION for Theodore W. Maya to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25310724. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Theodore Maya, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Maya, Theodore)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Google's letter of October 13, 2021 (Doc 145) and plaintiffs' letter of October 15, 2021 (Doc 148). While neither side has sought specific relief, it is appropriate for the Court to restate its direction at the September 24, 2021 conference regarding document production. Google shall produce to all plaintiffs in the MDL the documents previously produced to any of the state plaintiffs in their digital advertising investigations, whether voluntarily, pursuant to CIDs or otherwise. At the risk of redundancy, Google may not withhold from the foregoing those documents that have also been produced to the DOJ. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/5/2021) (js)
November 5, 2021 Filing 167 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Lombardo on behalf of Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06910-PKC.(Lombardo, Richard)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER ESTABLISHING PROTOCOL FOR RECORDKEEPING OF CLASS COUNSEL'S TIME AND EXPENSES: re: #137 Notice (Other), filed by Surefreight Global LLC, Vitor Lindo, Hanson Law Firm, PC ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/04/2021) (ama)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #161 Motion for Richard Frank Lombardo to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #160 Motion for Peter Frederic Rottgers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #159 Motion for Jason Michael Lindner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #158 Motion for Jason Scott Hartley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
November 3, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #158 MOTION for Jason Scott Hartley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25280177. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 3, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #159 MOTION for Jason Michael Lindner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25280190. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 3, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #160 MOTION for Peter Frederic Rottgers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25280197. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 3, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #161 MOTION for Richard Frank Lombardo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25280199. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 2, 2021 Filing 161 MOTION for Richard Frank Lombardo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25280199. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Oliver, Jennifer)
November 2, 2021 Filing 160 MOTION for Peter Frederic Rottgers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25280197. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Oliver, Jennifer)
November 2, 2021 Filing 159 MOTION for Jason Michael Lindner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25280190. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kinin, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Oliver, Jennifer)
November 2, 2021 Filing 158 MOTION for Jason Scott Hartley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25280177. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kinin, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Oliver, Jennifer)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #155 Motion for Bradley D. Justus to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 28, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #155 MOTION for Bradley D. Justus to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER GRANTING MDL PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXPEDITED INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER: granting #154 Motion for Protective Order. Please visit the Court's Website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov for Sealed Records Filing Instructions. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/21/2021) (ama)
October 27, 2021 Filing 155 MOTION for Bradley D. Justus to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bradley D. Justus, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Justus, Bradley)
October 25, 2021 Filing 154 MOTION for Protective Order - Unopposed Motion for Expedited Interim Protective Order. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Lanier, W.)
October 22, 2021 Filing 153 REDACTION to (160 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 160 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC) Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,, Order on Motion to Seal,,,, Second Amended Complaint with Redactions per Court's Order [Dkt 160] by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North DakotaFiled In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Lanier, W.)
October 22, 2021 Filing 152 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #81 Amended Complaint, against Google LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by State of North Dakota, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of South Dakota, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arkansas, State of Montana, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of South Carolina, State of Mississippi, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Nevada. Related document: #81 Amended Complaint,..(Lanier, W.)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (150 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) Letter filed by Facebook Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Names, contact information, including email addresses of Facebook employees if any should be redacted before the Second Amended Complaint is publicly filed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/21/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
October 21, 2021 Filing 150 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated 10/21/2021 re: Order granting in part and denying in part defendant Google, LLC's Motion To Seal Limited Items In The Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Facebook Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #146 Motion for Robert J. Gralewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
October 18, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #146 MOTION for Robert J. Gralewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 15, 2021 Filing 148 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier and Ashley Keller dated 10/15/2021 re: Response to Google's 10/13/2021 letter [Dkt. 145] seeking to adjust the Court's Order [Dkt. 129]. Document filed by The State of Texas..(Lanier, W.)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER: granting in part and denying in part (114) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting in part and denying in part (116) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting in part and denying in part (143) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting in part and denying in part (144) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC. Google's sealing motion is GRANTED as to paragraphs 123, 185, 192, 200, 205, 239 and 241 of the Second Amended Complaint. It is DENIED as to paragraphs 16, 40, 62, 63, 110, 126, 139, 155, 178, 179, 182, 218, 219, 222, 224, 225, 231, 232, 234, 240, 252 and 255. Plaintiffs are directed to publicly file a version of the Second Amended Complaint that conforms to this Order no later than October 22, 2021. The Clerk is directed to terminate Google's motion and the related letter-motion. (21 MD 3010, Docket # 114, 116; 21 Civ. 6841, Docket # 143, 144.) SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/15/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
October 15, 2021 Filing 146 MOTION for Robert J. Gralewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JLaSalle Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Gralewski, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Gralewski, Robert)
October 13, 2021 Filing 145 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions and Eric Mahr dated October 13, 2021 re: respectfully writing to correct an error made during the September 24, 2021 case management conference. Document filed by Google LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER: granting (136) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (156) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC. Having heard both sides on the issue of scheduling, the Court sets the following schedule and page limits on amended pleadings and the motion to dismiss: The Third Amended Complaint shall be filed by November 12, 2021. Google shall answer or move by January 21, 2022. The requirement of any further pre-motion letter is excused for any motion to dismiss. Pursuant to the Court's authority under Rule 16(b)(3)(A), Fed. R. Civ. P., the deadline for any further motion to amend the complaint by the state plaintiffs is February 14, 2022. State plaintiffs shall respond to any motion to dismiss by March 22, 2022. Google may reply by April 21, 2022. Google and the state plaintiffs may each submit a 40-page brief on their opening brief on any motion to dismiss and Google may submit up to a 20- page brief on any reply. The Clerk is directed to terminate the following letter-motion: 21 md 3010, Docket # 136; 21 cv 6841, Docket # 156. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/13/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama)
October 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2021. Motions due by 2/14/2022. Responses due by 3/22/2022 Replies due by 4/21/2022. (ama)
October 12, 2021 Filing 143 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/24/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 12, 2021 Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2021 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 8, 2021 Filing 141 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier and Ashley Keller dated 10/08/2021 re: Status Update to Court in response to 9/24/21 Hearing and 9/24/21 Minute Order [Dkt.129]. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Nicholas Arrieta, Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 23 Media Organizations, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra..(Lanier, W.)
October 8, 2021 Filing 140 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier and Ashley Keller dated 10/08/2021 re: Court's 9/7/21 Order [Dkt. 61] and in response to Google's letter [Dkt. 136].. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas..(Lanier, W.)
October 8, 2021 Filing 139 SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne dated October 8, 2021 re: Response to September 24, 2021 Order, ECF No. 129. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Thorne, John)
October 1, 2021 Filing 138 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne dated October 1, 2021 re: Response to September 24, 2021 Order, ECF No. 129. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mail Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Expert Declaration of Professor Anthony Sebok)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC.(Thorne, John)
October 1, 2021 Filing 137 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Protocol for Recordkeeping of Class Counsel's Time and Expenses re: #129 Order,,,,,,,. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Protocol for Recordkeeping of Class Counsel's Time and Expenses).(Sharp, Christina)
September 30, 2021 Filing 136 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated September 30, 2021. Document filed by Google LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting (132) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; granting (153) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/30/2021) Attorney David M. Ashton terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; Attorney David M. Ashton terminated in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKCFiled In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC . Attorney terminate CM/ECF notices as to David M. Ashton and R. Floyd Walker terminated (ama) Modified on 9/30/2021 (ama).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Dennis J. Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 29, 2021 Filing 133 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by The State of Texas. Related Document Number: #132 ..(Grimmer, Nicholas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 132 MOTION for David M. Ashton and R. Floyd Walker to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The State of Texas.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Grimmer, Nicholas)
September 29, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #131 MOTION for Dennis J. Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25122807. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 28, 2021 Filing 131 MOTION for Dennis J. Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25122807. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit ISO Motion for PHV, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Stewart, Dennis)
September 28, 2021 Filing 130 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Robert J. Gralewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25120575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JLaSalle Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Gralewski, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Gralewski, Robert) Modified on 9/28/2021 (wb).
September 28, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #130 MOTION for Robert J. Gralewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25120575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: As a result of todays pretrial conference in this proceeding, the Court orders as follows: 1. The parties are directed to negotiate and submit a proposed protective order, subject to which Google shall produce to plaintiffs in all cases those documents that Google has previously produced to the State of Texas and to certain class plaintiffs. Google shall produce the documents within 30 days of the entry of the protective order. The production shall not include third-party documents, witness examinations or documents produced to the U.S. Department of Justice. The production shall not constitute a waiver by Google of any defense. 2. With the exception of The State of Texas, et al. v. Google LLC, 21 Civ. 6841, defendants deadline to answer or respond to all complaints is stayed. 3. General discovery is stayed. The Court anticipates that general discovery will commence following a decision on the anticipated motion to dismiss in the Texas v. Google matter. 4. Counsel for state plaintiffs, individual plaintiffs and putative class plaintiffs are directed to coordinate through a Plaintiffs Coordinating Committee the drafting of ESI protocols and Rule 34 requests. 5. No later than October 1, 2021, plaintiffs counsel in Associated Newspapers Ltd. et al. v. Google LLC et al., 21 Civ. 3446, shall submit a letter-brief explaining why there is not a present conflict in its simultaneous representation of Associated Newspapers and Facebook and why it should be permitted to attend meetings of the Plaintiffs Coordinating Committee. Any party may submit a letter response no later than October 8, 2021.6. Plaintiffs counsel in Surefreight Global LLC et al. v. Google LLC et al., 21 Civ. 7001, shall submit a proposed revised order on time-and-expense protocols no later than October 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/24/2021) (tg)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Scott Grzenczyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 24, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Pretrial Conference held on 9/24/2021 in all cases. Court rulings, see Order. (Court Reporter Carol Ganley) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: granting (125) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. SO ORDERED. Attorney Kimberley Biagioli terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/23/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC (ama) Modified on 9/23/2021 (ama).
September 23, 2021 Filing 126 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by State of Missouri. Related Document Number: #125 ..(Hoeplinger, Steve)
September 23, 2021 Filing 125 MOTION for Kimberley Biagioli to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by State of Missouri..(Hoeplinger, Steve)
September 23, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #124 MOTION for Scott Grzenczyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25098166. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
September 22, 2021 Filing 124 MOTION for Scott Grzenczyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25098166. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standings, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Scott Grzenczyk, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Grzenczyk, Scott)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: The conference scheduled for Friday, September 24, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 11D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Ceremonial Courtroom 9C is set as an overflow courtroom. Remote telephone information is provided below: Dial in: 1 888-363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/20/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
September 20, 2021 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Renee Johnson on behalf of Vitor Lindo..(Johnson, Rachel)
September 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #121 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
September 17, 2021 Filing 121 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Google LLC. Related Document Number: [116 (and 144 on 21-cv-6841)]..(Mahr, Eric) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 17, 2021 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Alok Verma in Support re: (144 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 116 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Limited Items in the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Google LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
September 17, 2021 Filing 119 DECLARATION of Dan Taylor in Support re: (144 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 116 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Limited Items in the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (under seal))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
September 17, 2021 Filing 118 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Dan Taylor in Support re: (144 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 116 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Limited Items in the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Google LLC, Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal: #116 .(Mahr, Eric)
September 17, 2021 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (144 in 1:21-cv-06841-PKC, 116 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Limited Items in the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Google LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
September 17, 2021 Filing 116 MOTION to Seal Limited Items in the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Google LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Mahr, Eric)
September 17, 2021 Filing 115 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Aaron Zigler dated September 17, 2021 re: Plaintiffs' Response to Court's 09/07/21 Order [Dkt. 61]. Document filed by Shoshana Zuboff..(Zigler, Aaron)
September 17, 2021 Filing 114 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Letter Brief . Document filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 23 Media Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Letter Brief of Amici Curiae)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06841-PKC.(Townsend, Katielynn)
September 17, 2021 Filing 113 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier and Ashley Keller dated 09/17/2021 re: Plaintiffs' Response to Court's 09/07/21 Order [Dkt. 61]. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas..(Lanier, W.)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #108 Motion for Sean P. Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #107 Motion for Hsiao (Mark) C. Mao to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #106 Motion for James R. Dugan, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Abby L. Dennis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 17, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #106 MOTION for James R. Dugan, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #107 MOTION for Hsiao (Mark) C. Mao to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25072268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #108 MOTION for Sean P. Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25072316. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 16, 2021 Filing 108 MOTION for Sean P. Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25072316. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rodriguez, Sean)
September 16, 2021 Filing 107 MOTION for Hsiao (Mark) C. Mao to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25072268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Mao, Mark)
September 16, 2021 Filing 106 MOTION for James R. Dugan, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Louisiana, State of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Dugan, James)
September 16, 2021 Filing 105 MOTION for Abby L. Dennis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25070313. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (NC), #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Dennis, Abby)
September 16, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #89 MOTION for James R. Dugan, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25051875. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Louisiana; Missing Notarized Affidavit/ Declaration;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 16, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #105 MOTION for Abby L. Dennis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25070313. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Trevor E. D. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Sophia Rios to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Mark A. Colantonio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Robert P. Fitzsimmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Clayton J. Fitzsimmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Timothy Z. LaComb to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #84 Motion for John C. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Michael C. Dell'Angelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Caitlin G. Coslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Paul T. Farrell, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Patrick F. Madden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 14, 2021 Filing 93 MOTION for Trevor E. D. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-25057066. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit Texas Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit State Bar of Texas Certificate of Good Standing).(Young, Trevor)
September 14, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION for Sophia Rios to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-25057225. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (CA), #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rios, Sophia)
September 14, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #93 MOTION for Trevor E. D. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-25057066. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #92 MOTION for Sophia Rios to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-25057225. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by TerriAnne Benedetto on behalf of State of Louisiana, State of South Carolina..(Benedetto, TerriAnne)
September 13, 2021 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT of James R. Dugan, II in Support re: #89 MOTION for James R. Dugan, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25051875. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by State of Louisiana, State of South Carolina..(Dugan, James)
September 13, 2021 Filing 89 MOTION for James R. Dugan, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25051875. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Louisiana, State of South Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Dugan, James)
September 13, 2021 Filing 88 MOTION for Mark A. Colantonio to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25051662. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Colantonio, Mark)
September 13, 2021 Filing 87 MOTION for Robert P. Fitzsimmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25051594. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Errata Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Fitzsimmons, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 86 MOTION for Clayton J. Fitzsimmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25051512. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Fitzsimmons, Clayton)
September 13, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #86 MOTION for Clayton J. Fitzsimmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25051512. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #88 MOTION for Mark A. Colantonio to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25051662. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #87 MOTION for Robert P. Fitzsimmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25051594. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 13, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #83 MOTION for Michael C. Dell'Angelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25047133. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #84 MOTION for John C. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25047349. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #82 MOTION for Caitlin G. Coslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25046899. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #85 MOTION for Timothy Z. LaComb to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25047434. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 85 MOTION for Timothy Z. LaComb to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25047434. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(LaComb, Tim)
September 10, 2021 Filing 84 MOTION for John C. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25047349. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John C. Herman in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Vash, Serina)
September 10, 2021 Filing 83 MOTION for Michael C. Dell'Angelo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25047133. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Dell'Angelo, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION for Caitlin G. Coslett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25046899. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Coslett, Caitlin)
September 10, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #79 MOTION for Patrick F. Madden to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25038957. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #80 MOTION for Paul T. Farrell, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25041349. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 9, 2021 Filing 81 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by State of North Dakota, State of Florida, State of Alaska, State of South Dakota, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arkansas, State of Montana, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of South Carolina, State of Mississippi, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Nevada..(Lanier, W.)
September 9, 2021 Filing 80 MOTION for Paul T. Farrell, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25041349. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul T. Farrell, Jr., #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - WV, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - OH, #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing - KY, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service).(Farrell, Paul)
September 9, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION for Patrick F. Madden to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25038957. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Madden, Patrick)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Maxwell H. Sawyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Stuart A. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Paul J. Geller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Steven M. Jodlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #67 Motion for David W. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Eric L. Cramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #70 MOTION for Paul J. Geller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034854. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #65 MOTION for Eric L. Cramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25033241. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #67 MOTION for David W. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034586. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #69 MOTION for Steven M. Jodlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034746. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #71 MOTION for Stuart A. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034925. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #72 MOTION for Maxwell H. Sawyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034960. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 8, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION for Maxwell H. Sawyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034960. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Maxwell H. Sawyer, #2 Exhibit A - Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Sawyer, Maxwell)
September 8, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION for Stuart A. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034925. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stuart A. Davidson, #2 Exhibit A - Certs. of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Davidson, Stuart)
September 8, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION for Paul J. Geller to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034854. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul J. Geller, #2 Exhibit A - Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Geller, Paul)
September 8, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION for Steven M. Jodlowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034746. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven M. Jodlowski, #2 Exhibit A - Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Jodlowski, Steven)
September 8, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer M. Oliver on behalf of Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa..(Oliver, Jennifer)
September 8, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for David W. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25034586. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David W. Mitchell, #2 Exhibit A Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service).(Mitchell, David)
September 8, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Chad Johnson on behalf of AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Johnson, Christopher)
September 8, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION for Eric L. Cramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25033241. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Cramer, Eric)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Solomon B. Cera to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Pamela A. Markert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #56 Motion for April Dawn Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 8, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #56 MOTION for April Dawn Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25025640. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 8, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #60 MOTION for Solomon B. Cera to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25029234. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #58 MOTION for Pamela A. Markert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25028994. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file the Second Amended Complaint is granted. The Second Amended Complaint forthwith shall be filed in the redacted form submitted to this Court. 2. Defendants' time to answer or move with respect to the Second Amended Complaint is set as September 30, 2021. In lieu of filing an answer, defendants may file a pre-motion letter in accordance with the undersigned's Individual Practices setting forth in detail the grounds for any motion to dismiss. Defendants may propose a schedule on the proposed motion. 3. If defendants file a pre-motion letter, then by October 8, 2021 plaintiffs shall file a response stating unequivocally whether they wish to further amend the complaint, including for the purpose of winnowing or clarifying their claims. They may also respond to the proposed schedule. Let the parties show cause in writing by September 17, 2021 why the Second Amended Complaint ought not be publicly filed in unredacted form. See Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2006). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/7/21) (yv)
September 7, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION for Solomon B. Cera to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25029234. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit in support of motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Cera, Solomon)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 7, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION for Pamela A. Markert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25028994. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit in support of motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Markert, Pamela)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: The October 14 conference will be accelerated to September 24, 2021 at 11 a.m. in a courtroom to be announced. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/7/2021) (va)
September 7, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION for April Dawn Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25025640. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Lambert, April)
September 3, 2021 Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier, Ashley Keller dated 09/03/2021 re: Pre-Trial Order No. 1. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Lanier, W.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin J. Orsini dated September 3, 2021 re: Pre-Trial Order No. 1. Document filed by Facebook Inc...(Orsini, Kevin)
September 3, 2021 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated September 3, 2021 re: Pre-Trial Order No. 1. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Sessions, Justina)
September 3, 2021 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller and W. Mark Lanier dated 09/03/2021 re: Reply in Support Of Plaintiff States' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas..(Keller, Ashley)
September 3, 2021 Filing 51 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated September 3, 2021 re: Pre-Trial Order No. 1. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Flag Publications, Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, HD Media Company, LLC, Journal, Inc...(Vash, Serina)
September 3, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Serina Marie Vash on behalf of AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Flag Publications, Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, HD Media Company, LLC, Journal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Clients).(Vash, Serina)
September 3, 2021 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan Rubin dated September 3, 2021 re: Response to Pre-Trial Order No. 1. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Rubin, Jonathan)
September 3, 2021 Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Fred Isquith dated September 3, 2021 re: Response to Pre-Trial Order No. 1. Document filed by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC..(Isquith, Fred)
September 3, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #47 MOTION for Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 2, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION for Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Rubin, Jonathan)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Daniel J. Mogin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #38 Motion for George A. Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Daniel J. Nordin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Daniel C. Hedlund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 2, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kate M. Baxter-Kauf on behalf of Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SkinnySchool LLC..(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
September 2, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heidi M. Silton on behalf of Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SkinnySchool LLC..(Silton, Heidi)
September 2, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Daniel J. Mogin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Daniel J. Mogin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Mogin, Daniel)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: There will be a conference on all cases on October 14, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. in a courtroom to be announced. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/1/2021) (tg)
September 1, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for George A. Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25009844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DC certificate of good standing, #2 Exhibit B - IL certificate of good standing, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit in support of motion, #4 Text of Proposed Order for admission pro hac vice).(Zelcs, George)
September 1, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Daniel J. Nordin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25008316. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit ISO Motion for PHV, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Nordin, Daniel)
September 1, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Daniel C. Hedlund to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25008134. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit ISO Motion for PHV, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Hedlund, Daniel)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Robert E. Litan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Michael J. Fuller, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 1, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #32 MOTION for Daniel J. Mogin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25006167. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 1, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #28 MOTION for Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25004003. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 1, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Robert E. Litan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25005006. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #29 MOTION for Michael J Fuller Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 1, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for George A. Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25009844. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 1, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #36 MOTION for Daniel C. Hedlund to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25008134. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #37 MOTION for Daniel J. Nordin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25008316. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos, George A. Zelcs and Eric L. Cramer dated August 31, 2021 re: information concerning the Publisher Class Case and response to the Court's Pre-Trial Order No. 1. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
August 31, 2021 Filing 32 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Daniel J. Mogin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25006167. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Mogin, Daniel) Modified on 9/1/2021 (wb).
August 31, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Robert E. Litan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25005006. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - DC certificate of good standing, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit in support of motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Litan, Robert)
August 31, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Alfred Wallenstein on behalf of Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Wallenstein, Marc)
August 31, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Michael J Fuller Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Journal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in Supp of Mot for PHV, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Fuller, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 28 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25004003. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Rubin, Jonathan) Modified on 9/1/2021 (wb).
August 31, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael E. Klenov on behalf of Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(Klenov, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol Lee O'Keefe on behalf of Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc...(O'Keefe, Carol)
August 31, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #25 MOTION for Michael J Fuller Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of West Virginia and Mississippi;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
August 31, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #23 MOTION for Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida; the filing fee was not paid; Affidavit is not notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael J Fuller Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Motion for PHV- Fuller, #2 Exhibit Exh A-COG, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06794-PKC, 1:21-cv-06828-PKC.(Fuller, Michael) Modified on 8/31/2021 (wb).
August 30, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Archana Tamoshunas on behalf of Hanson Law Firm, PC..(Tamoshunas, Archana)
August 30, 2021 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jonathan L. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Rodrock Chiropractic Pa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Rubin, Jonathan) Modified on 8/31/2021 (wb).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #18 Motion for Jordan Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/30/2021) (ama)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #17 Motion for Dena C. Sharp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/30/2021) (ama)
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr on behalf of Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC..(Isquith, Frederick)
August 30, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Jordan Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24993105. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #17 MOTION for Christina (Dena) C. Sharp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-24993011. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr dated August 27, 2021 re: Response to State Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Google LLC..(Mahr, Eric)
August 27, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Jordan Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24993105. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Elias, Jordan)
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Christina (Dena) C. Sharp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-24993011. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Sharp, Christina)
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael J Fuller Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-24990154. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Journal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Motion for PHV- Fuller, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-06794-PKC, 1:21-cv-06828-PKC.(Fuller, Michael) Modified on 8/30/2021 (wb).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Jacqueline Hsiang Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
August 25, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Jacqueline Hsiang Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24976604. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Jacqueline Hsiang Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24976604. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Liu, Jacqueline)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Zina Gelman Bash to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier, Ashley Keller dated 08/18/2021 re: Pursuant to the Court's Pre-Trial Order No. 1 [Dkt. 4]. Document filed by The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Lanier, W.)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley K. King on behalf of Vitor Lindo..(King, Bradley)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore W. Maya on behalf of Vitor Lindo..(Maya, Theodore)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tina Wolfson on behalf of Vitor Lindo..(Wolfson, Tina)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Zina Gelman Bash to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-24947599. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Bash, Zina)
August 18, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Zina Gelman Bash to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-24947599. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fred Taylor Isquith on behalf of SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC..(Isquith, Fred)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kate M. Baxter-Kauf on behalf of SPX Total Body Fitness LLC..(Baxter-Kauf, Kate)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heidi M. Silton on behalf of SPX Total Body Fitness LLC..(Silton, Heidi)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 1: This Order applies to: (a) all cases that have been or are subsequently transferred or conditionally transferred to the undersigned by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the Panel); and (b) the action that was pending in this District prior to the Panel's initial transfer order: Associated Newspapers, et al. v. Google LLC et al., 21 Civ. 3446 (PKC). Paragraphs 1-5 are ORDERS of this Court. Paragraphs 6-11 set forth the Court's preliminary observations, for which comments are solicited: 1. Any judicial stay in place in any action is modified to permit the parties to comply with this and any subsequent Order of this Court. 2. All counsel are required to promptly register for and participate in this Court's CM/ECF filing system. 3. All parties are bound by the undersigned's Individual Practices that will apply to all cases in the MDL and any subsequent tagalongs. (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/practice_documents /PKC%20Individual%20Practices%20-%20Revised%20Jan%202020_0.pdf) 4. The above caption shall be used on all filings. If the filing relates to fewer than all actions in the MDL, then the individual action to which the filing applies should be unambiguously identified. 5. The state plaintiffs shall forthwith submit to the Court their proposed motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, together with unredacted copies of their proposed second amended complaint and the original and first amended complaint. By August 27, 2021, defendant shall either consent to the motion to amend or file its opposition, reserving any futility arguments for any motion to dismiss. A reply, if any, may be filed by the state plaintiffs seven days thereafter. ( Responses due by 8/27/2021) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/13/2021) (ate)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jonathan M. Jacobson dated 08/13/2021 re: Letter To Inform Court of Matter Developments. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A).(Jacobson, Jonathan)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan M. Jacobson on behalf of Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Jacobson, Jonathan)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of California, Delaware, District of Columbia, Indiana, Maryland, Mississippi, New Jersey, New York, Ohio, Pennsylvania, Texas, West Virginia and Wisconsin, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge P. Kevin Castel, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/10/2021) (sjo)
August 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 12, 2021 CASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:21-cv-03446 (PKC). (sjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Google Digital Advertising Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Newspapers Ltd.
Represented By: John Thorne
Represented By: W. Mark Lanier
Represented By: Serina Marie Vash
Represented By: Daniel G Bird
Represented By: Daniel V. Dorris
Represented By: Eliana M. Pfeffer
Represented By: Eric J. Maier
Represented By: Mark Hirschboeck
Represented By: Bethan R Jones
Represented By: Caleb Hayes-Deats
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Christopher Goodnow
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mail Media, Inc.
Represented By: John Thorne
Represented By: W. Mark Lanier
Represented By: Serina Marie Vash
Represented By: Daniel G Bird
Represented By: Daniel V. Dorris
Represented By: Eliana M. Pfeffer
Represented By: Eric J. Maier
Represented By: Mark Hirschboeck
Represented By: Bethan R Jones
Represented By: Caleb Hayes-Deats
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Christopher Goodnow
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated
Represented By: David W. Mitchell - PHV
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Steven M. Jodlowski - PHV
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr
Represented By: Serina Marie Vash
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Chad Johnson
Represented By: Clayton J. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: