Homesite Insurance Company of New York v. K&K Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company of New York as subrogee of Polina Margasova and Homesite Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: K&K Construction a/k/a Katselnik & Katselnik Group, Inc. a/k/a Katselnik & Katselnik, Inc. and a/k/a K&K Group, Inc., K&K Construction, Inc., Katselnik & Katselnik Group, Inc., Katselnik & Katselnik, Inc. and K&K Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00023
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. K&K Construction, Inc. served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Homesite Insurance Company of New York..(Wallace, Michael)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Michael F Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
February 4, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Michael F. Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Michael F. Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Homesite Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Notarized Affidavit with Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order).(Wallace, Michael)
February 3, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for Michael F. Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25673593. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Supporting Affidavit Missing Notary;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - MOTION for Michael F. Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25673593. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Homesite Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order).(Wallace, Michael) Modified on 2/3/2022 (vba).
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to K&K Construction, Inc...(sj)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to K&K Construction, Inc. a/k/a Katselnik & Katselnik Group, Inc. a/k/a Katselnik & Katselnik, Inc. a/k/a K&K Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Homesite Insurance Company of New York..(Paolini, Thomas)
January 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas Paolini to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name as to whom the summons request is for must match exactly in docket entry as pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
January 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Paolini. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Homesite Insurance Company of New York, K&K Construction, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
January 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas Paolini. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $227,750,000; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to (none); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
January 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Homesite Insurance Company of New York as subrogee of Polina Margasova..(Paolini, Thomas)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to K&K Construction a/k/a Katselnik & Katselnik Group, Inc. a/k/a Katselnik & Katselnik, Inc. and a/k/a K&K Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Homesite Insurance Company of New York as subrogee of Polina Margasova..(Paolini, Thomas) Modified on 1/4/2022 (sj).
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Paolini, Thomas)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against K&K Construction a/k/a Katselnik & Katselnik Group, Inc. a/k/a Katselnik & Katselnik, Inc. and a/k/a K&K Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25532131)Document filed by Homesite Insurance Company of New York as subrogee of Polina Margasova..(Paolini, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homesite Insurance Company of New York v. K&K Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company of New York as subrogee of Polina Margasova
Represented By: Thomas Paolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Michael F. Wallace
Represented By: Thomas Paolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&K Construction a/k/a Katselnik & Katselnik Group, Inc. a/k/a Katselnik & Katselnik, Inc. and a/k/a K&K Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&K Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katselnik & Katselnik Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katselnik & Katselnik, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&K Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?