HVN Clothing, Inc. et al v. Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited
Plaintiff: HVN Clothing, Inc. and Harley Viera-Newton
Defendant: Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited doing business as d/b/a Zaful and Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited doing business as Zaful
Case Number: 1:2022cv00027
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Adam E. Urbanczyk dated March 1, 2022. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 36. SO ORDERED. #1 Complaint,. Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited answer due 3/8/2022. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/1/2022) (vfr)
March 1, 2022 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Adam E. Urbanczyk dated March 1, 2022. Document filed by Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited..(Urbanczyk, Adam)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 34. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/9/2022) (jca)
February 9, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited answer due 3/3/2022. (jca)
February 8, 2022 Filing 34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Adam E. Urbanczyk dated February 8, 2022. Document filed by Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited..(Urbanczyk, Adam)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Adam Edward Urbanczyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
February 8, 2022 Filing 32 SECOND MOTION for Adam Edward Urbanczyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit of Adam E. Urbanczyk, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Urbanczyk, Adam)
February 8, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #31 MOTION for Adam Edward Urbanczyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25698114. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Michigan;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 8, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 SECOND MOTION for Adam Edward Urbanczyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
February 7, 2022 Filing 31 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Adam Edward Urbanczyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25698114. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit of Adam E. Urbanczyk, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Urbanczyk, Adam) Modified on 2/8/2022 (bcu).
February 7, 2022 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. Service was made by HUISSIER de JUSTICE SUPPLEANT in accordance with Art. 5 of the Hague Service Convention. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc.; Harley Viera-Newton..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 24, 2022 Minute Entry for Preliminary Injunction Hearing proceedings held via teleconference before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Wesley Mullen present for Plaintiffs. No one present for Defendant. Court reporter present. (ab)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, sufficient cause being shown, and based upon the foregoing findings of fact and conclusions of law, that Defendant and its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys and all other persons in active concert or participation with Defendant, are hereby restrained and enjoined from engaging in any of the following acts or omissions pending the entry of a final judgment in this action or a further order of the Court: and further set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(c), that Plaintiffsshall deposit with the Court the sum of ten thousand dollars ($10,000.00) in cash, cashier's check, or surety bond, as security, which amount is deemed adequate for the payment of such damages as any person may be entitled to recover as a result of wrongful restraint hereunder. Plaintiffs' maintenance in effect of the undertaking dated January 12, 2022 and filed by the Plaintiffs on January 13, 2022, (ECF Doc. 26), shall constitute compliance with this provision. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that service of this Order by email upon the Defendant's legal department (legal@zaful.com) and its outside counsel Dr. Jorg Brettschneider, LL.B. (desk@ecomvat.com), with a hard copy via recognized international express courier to Defendant's principal office at Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited, 29 Boulevard Prince Henri, L-1724, Luxembourg, on or before January 27, 2022, shall constitute good and sufficient service. This Order shall become effective immediately and shall remain in effect until further order of the Court. Within two months of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall either file proof of service of the summons and Complaint or a status letter regarding the same. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/24/2022) (rro) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
January 21, 2022 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wesley M. Mullen dated January 21, 2022 re: Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (ECF Doc. 11). Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email to Counsel for Defendant).(Mullen, Wesley)
January 21, 2022 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton. Related Document Number: [ECF Doc. 11]..(Mullen, Wesley) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 21, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #27 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
January 13, 2022 Filing 26 UNDERTAKING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, BOND #3495354 in the amount of $10,000 posted by Plaintiffs.(km)
January 12, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order (ECF Doc. 24); Motion (ECF Doc. 11); Supporting Papers served on Counsel for Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Ltd.; Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Ltd. on January 11, 2022. Service was made by EMAIL AND FEDEX. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 10, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: TRO held via teleconference on 1/10/2022. Wesley Mullen present for Plaintiffs. No one present for Defendant. Court reporter present. (ab)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65, that a temporary restraining order shall be immediately entered as described herein. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, sufficient cause being shown, and based upon the foregoing findings of fact and conclusions of law, that Defendant and its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys and all other persons in active concert or participation with Defendant, are hereby restrained and enjoined from engaging in any of the following acts or omissions pending the hearing and determination of the Motion or further order of the Court: using the registered HVN Mark for, or in connection with the manufacture, distribution, advertising, promotion, offering for sale, or sale of hats, kimonos, pants, robes, scarves, shorts, sleepwear, swimwear or womens clothing, namely shirts, dresses, skirts and blouses; and (b)using, displaying, reproducing or copying the copyrighted HVN CherryPrint on, or in connection with the manufacture, distribution, advertising,promotion, offering for sale, or sale of any goods. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(c), that Plaintiffs shall deposit with the Court the sum of ten thousand dollars ($10,000.00), in cash, cashiers check, or surety bond, as security, which amount is deemed adequate for the payment of such damages as any person may be entitled to recover as a result of wrongful restraint hereunder. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that service of this Order, the Motion, and all supporting papers by email upon the Defendants legal department (legal@zaful.com) and its outside counsel Dr. Jorg Brettschneider, LL.B. (desk@ecomvat.com), with a hard copy via recognized international express courier to Defendants principal office at Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited, 29 Boulevard Prince Henri, L-1724, Luxembourg, on or before January 11, 2022, shall constitute good and sufficient service. Plaintiffs shall file proof of such service by January 12, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing shall be held on January 24, 2022, at 4:00 p.m., at which Plaintiffs may present their arguments in support of their request for issuance of a preliminary injunction. At such time, Defendant may also be heard as to opposition to Plaintiffs' Application. The hearing will take place remotely by telephone in accordance with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. (Members of the public and press may also attend using the same dial-in information; they will not be allowed to speak during the conference.) Counsel should review and comply with the rules regarding teleconferences in the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, including Rule 2(B)(i), which requires the parties, no later than 24 hours before the conference, to send an email to the Court with a list of counsel who may speak during the teleconference and the telephone numbers from which counsel expect to join the call. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that opposing papers, if any, shall be filed and served by January 17, 2022 (notwithstanding the fact that it is a Court holiday). Any reply shall be filed and served by January 20, 2022. This Temporary Restraining Order is entered at 11:00 a.m. on January 10, 2022, and shall remain in effect for fourteen (14) days. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by Harley Viera-Newton, HVN Clothing, Inc. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/10/22) (yv) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing. Modified on 1/11/2022 (yv).
January 10, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Responses due by 1/17/2022, Replies due by 1/20/2022.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Telephone Conference set for 1/24/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (yv)
January 10, 2022 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Harley Viera-Newton (CORRECTED - WITH SIGNATURE) in Support re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - HVN Mark - Certificate of Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - HVN Cherry Print - Certificate of Copyright Registration).(Mullen, Wesley)
January 10, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order (ECF Doc. 18) served on Counsel for Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Ltd. on 1/7/22. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 10, 2022 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wesley M. Mullen dated January 10, 2022 re: Recent email correspondence from Defendant (as discussed at 1/10/22 Conference on Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF Doc. 11) for TRO and Preliminary Injunction). Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Recent Email Correspondence with Defendant).(Mullen, Wesley)
January 7, 2022 Filing 20 PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton. Related Document Number: [ECF Doc. 11]..(Mullen, Wesley) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 7, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order (ECF Doc. 18) served on Counsel for Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Ltd. on 1/7/22. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that all parties appear for a conference with the Court on January 10, 2022, at 10:15 a.m. regarding Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, see ECF No. 11. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key.... Plaintiffs shall immediately serve a copy of this Order on Defendant by emailing Defendants legal department and outside counsel, as stated in Plaintiffs' January 6, 2022 letter. SEE ORDER. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/7/2022) (ab)
January 7, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document No. #20 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
January 6, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order (ECF Doc. 10); Individual Rules and Practices served on Counsel for Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Ltd. on 1/6/22. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 6, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Wesley M. Mullen dated January 6, 2021 re: Cover Letter to Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction (ECF Doc. 11). Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 6, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Wesley M. Mullen in Support re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11/17/21 Hr'g Tr. (Related Shein Action), #2 Exhibit 2 - 11/17/21 Injunction (Related Shein Action), #3 Exhibit 3 - 12/24/21 Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - 12/28/21 Email from Zaful to Pls' Counsel, #5 Exhibit 5 - 12/29/21 Email from Pls.' Counsel to Zaful, #6 Exhibit 6 - 12/30/21 Email from Def's Counsel to Pls' Counsel, #7 Exhibit 7 - 12/30/21 Email from Pls' Counsel to Def's Counsel, #8 Exhibit 8 - 1/3/22 Email from Pls' Counsel to Def's Counsel, #9 Exhibit 9 - 1/4/22 Email from Pls' Counsel to Def's Counsel, #10 Exhibit 10 - 1/4/22 Email from Pls' Counsel to Def's Counsel, #11 Exhibit 11 - 1/5/22 Email from Defendant to Pls' Counsel, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1/5/22 Email from Pls' Counsel to Defendant, #13 Exhibit 13 - 1/6/22 Notice Email from Pls' Counsel to Def's Counsel, #14 Exhibit 14 - 1/5/22 Letter from Agent for Service of Process, #15 Exhibit 15 - Defendant Terms of Use).(Mullen, Wesley)
January 6, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Alleine Castro in Support re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 12/24/21 Cease and Desist Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Website Depicting Counterfeit Goods, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Confirmation, #4 Exhibit 4 - Shipping Label, #5 Exhibit 5 - Photograph of Counterfeit Goods, #6 Exhibit 6 - Photograph of Counterfeit Goods).(Mullen, Wesley)
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Harley Viera-Newton in Support re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - HVN Mark - Certificate of Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - HVN Cherry Print - Certificate of Copyright Registration).(Mullen, Wesley)
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ., MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton..(Mullen, Wesley) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/7/2022 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/6/2022) (ks)
January 6, 2022 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:21-cv-08852-GHW-KHP and declined by Judge Gregory Woods and returned to wheel for assignment. (aea)
January 6, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
January 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
January 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(sj)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited..(sj)
January 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 4, 2022 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 1:21cv8852. (sj)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-8852 (GHW). Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mullen, Wesley)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25533949)Document filed by HVN Clothing, Inc., Harley Viera-Newton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Zaful Website Offering Counterfeit HVN Goods).(Mullen, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HVN Clothing, Inc. et al v. Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HVN Clothing, Inc.
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley Viera-Newton
Represented By: Wesley Martin Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited doing business as d/b/a Zaful
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lomeway E-Commerce (Luxembourg) Limited doing business as Zaful
Represented By: Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?