Smolen v. The Federal Aviation Administration
Plaintiff: Robert E. Smolen
Defendant: The Federal Aviation Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00044
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. (see Doc. #12 for Service Date & Answer Due Date). Service was made by Mail, to the U.S. Dept. of Justice c/o Attorney General of the United States, 950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Washington, DC 20630. Document filed by Robert E. Smolen. (sc) Modified on 2/18/2022 (sc).
February 18, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Federal Aviation Administration, served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. Service was made by Mail to U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York, 1 St. Andrews Plaza, NY, NY 10007. Document filed by Robert E. Smolen. (sc)
February 18, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. The Federal Aviation Administration, served on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Service was accepted by Neena Williams, Admin. Asst. General Counsel's Office, FAA, Wash., DC 20591. Document filed by Robert E. Smolen. (sc)
February 16, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Federal Aviation Administration answer due 4/1/2022. (va)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS the Government's request to extend its time to respond to the complaint to April 1, 2022. The Clerk's office is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this memo endorsement to Plaintiff Smolen. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/16/2022) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (va) Modified on 2/17/2022 (va).
February 16, 2022 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (va)
February 15, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of Elizabeth J. Kim as counsel for the Federal Aviation Administration, dated February 15, 2022, and an extension letter, dated February 15, 2022, served on Robert E. Smolen on February 15, 2022. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by The Federal Aviation Administration..(Kim, Elizabeth)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for the Federal Aviation Administration to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Elizabeth J. Kim dated February 15, 2022. Document filed by The Federal Aviation Administration..(Kim, Elizabeth)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth J. Kim on behalf of The Federal Aviation Administration..(Kim, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Robert E. Smolen 338 Curtis Ave. Carle Place, NY 11514, at, on 1/10/2022 Re: #5 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (aan)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court issued a summons as to Defendant Federal Aviation Administration on January 7, 2022. Dkt. No. 4. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summons. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendant or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendant under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. Plaintiff has consented to receive electronic service of notices and documents in this action. (ECF 1, at 9.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/10/2022) (vfr) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Federal Aviation Administration. (aan)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Aviation Administration, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert E. Smolen. (sc)
January 7, 2022 Mailed a copy of #4 Summons Issued to Robert E. Smolen 338 Curtis Ave. Carle Place, NY 11514. (aan)
January 7, 2022 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #3 Request for Issuance of Summons to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Federal Aviation Administration. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401291612)Document filed by Robert E. Smolen..(rdz)
January 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
January 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smolen v. The Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Aviation Administration
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?