Bonilla et al v. Lucero Produce II Corp. et al
Plaintiff: ALICIA BONILLA, HECTOR LEONARDO MARTINEZ, DOMINGO MORALES CABRERA, FERMIN FABIAN TREVIO and Fermin Fabian Trevino
Defendant: Lucero Produce II Corp. and Saul Lucero
Case Number: 1:2022cv00153
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #5 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Saul Lucero, Lucero Produce II Corp...(Jodre, Jordan)
March 4, 2022 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Saul Lucero, Lucero Produce II Corp...(Jodre, Jordan)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel as follows: 1. The time for Defendants to Answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, in the above-referenced action will be no later than March 4, 2022; and 2. Counsel for Defendants acknowledge proper serve of the Summons and Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by March 4, 2022. As Judge Engelmayer has referred this action to the undersigned under a general pretrial referral (ECF No. 8), the parties are reminded to address all scheduling matters to this Court. SO ORDERED. Saul Lucero answer due 3/4/2022; Lucero Produce II Corp. answer due 3/4/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/16/2022) (vfr)
February 15, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Saul Lucero, Lucero Produce II Corp...(Jodre, Jordan)
February 15, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Adam Jodre on behalf of Saul Lucero, Lucero Produce II Corp...(Jodre, Jordan)
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Saul Lucero served on 1/25/2022, answer due 2/15/2022. Service was accepted by Hector, Manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Fermin Fabian Trevino; Hector Leonardo Martinez; Alicia Bonilla; Domingo Morales Cabrera..(Segura, Anamaria)
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lucero Produce II Corp. served on 1/25/2022, answer due 2/15/2022. Service was accepted by Hector, Manager. Document filed by Fermin Fabian Trevino; Hector Leonardo Martinez; Alicia Bonilla; Domingo Morales Cabrera..(Segura, Anamaria)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: This action is scheduled for an Initial Case Management Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Tuesday, April 12, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Counsel and parties are required to follow the Court's COVID-safety protocols and should review the Court's website in advance of the conference for the most up to date information. Plaintiffs directed to serve this order, and a copy of the complaint on the Defendants. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/10/22) (yv)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/10/2022) (rro)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Saul Lucero..(pc)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lucero Produce II Corp...(pc)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Saul Lucero, Lucero Produce II Corp.. Document filed by Fermin Fabian Trevio, Hector Leonardo Martinez, Alicia Bonilla, Domingo Morales Cabrera..(Segura, Anamaria)
January 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Anamaria Segura to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
January 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anamaria Segura. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ALICIA BONILLA, HECTOR LEONARDO MARTINEZ, DOMINGO MORALES CABRERA, FERMIN FABIAN TREVIO. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
January 10, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 10, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anamaria Segura. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
January 10, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 10, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SAUL LUCERO, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ALICIA BONILLA, HECTOR LEONARDO MARTINEZ, DOMINGO MORALES CABRERA, FERMIN FABIAN TREVIO..(Segura, Anamaria)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUCERO PRODUCE II CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ALICIA BONILLA, HECTOR LEONARDO MARTINEZ, DOMINGO MORALES CABRERA, FERMIN FABIAN TREVIO..(Segura, Anamaria)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Segura, Anamaria)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Saul Lucero, Lucero Produce II Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25554512)Document filed by ALICIA BONILLA..(Segura, Anamaria) Modified on 1/10/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonilla et al v. Lucero Produce II Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA BONILLA
Represented By: Anamaria Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR LEONARDO MARTINEZ
Represented By: Anamaria Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINGO MORALES CABRERA
Represented By: Anamaria Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERMIN FABIAN TREVIO
Represented By: Anamaria Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fermin Fabian Trevino
Represented By: Anamaria Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucero Produce II Corp.
Represented By: Jordan Adam Jodre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Lucero
Represented By: Jordan Adam Jodre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?