J.C. v. Zimmerman et al
Plaintiff: J. C.
Defendant: Bob Dylan, Robert Zimmerman and Robert Allen Zimmerman
Case Number: 1:2022cv00323
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 20 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Peter J Gleason dated March 10, 2022. Document filed by J. C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration).(Gleason, Peter)
March 10, 2022 Filing 19 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Daniel W. Isaacs and Orin Synder dated March 10, 2022 re: Status of the Action and Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Robert Allen Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Snyder, Orin)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #17 granting #15 Letter Motion for Conference re: #15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Peter Gleason dated 03/06/2022. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's above letter responding to Plaintiff's March 6, 2022 pre-motion letter (Dkt. #15) and requesting a pre-motion conference to address Defendant's contemplated motion for sanctions. The parties are hereby ORDERED to be prepared to address these issues at the initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 18, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff may file a letter addressing Defendant's contemplated motion for sanctions on or before March 10, 2022. Additionally, the parties are reminded of their obligation to submit the materials described in the notice of initial pretrial conference on or before March 10, 2022. (Dkt. #8). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 15. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/8/2022) (rro)
March 7, 2022 Filing 17 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Orin Snyder dated March 7, 2022 re: #15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Peter Gleason dated 03/06/2022. . Document filed by Robert Allen Zimmerman..(Snyder, Orin)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER with respect to #15 Letter Motion for Conference re: #15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Peter Gleason dated 03/06/2022. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's above letter. Defendant shall file a responsive letter, consistent with Rule 4 of this Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, on or before March 9, 2022. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/7/2022) (rro)
March 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/9/2022 (rro)
March 6, 2022 Filing 15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Peter Gleason dated 03/06/2022. Document filed by J. C.. Return Date set for 3/18/2022 at 10:00 AM..(Gleason, Peter)
February 22, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Joseph Gleason on behalf of J. C...(Gleason, Peter)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference in this matter is hereby ADJOURNED to March 18, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 12. Initial Conference set for 3/18/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/9/2022) (rro)
February 8, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Orin Snyder dated February 8, 2022. Document filed by Robert Allen Zimmerman..(Snyder, Orin)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 MOTION for GRETA B. WILLIAMS to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/2/2022) (jca)
February 1, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for GRETA B. WILLIAMS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25659674. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for GRETA B. WILLIAMS to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25659674. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Allen Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Greta B. Williams, #2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing - State of California and District of Columbia, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Williams, Greta)
January 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel William Isaacs on behalf of J. C...(Isaacs, Daniel)
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888)363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/21/2022) (tg)
January 13, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal served on Plaintiff on January 12, 2022. Service was made by overnight mail. Document filed by Robert Allen Zimmerman..(Bunting, Jeremy)
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Andrew Bunting on behalf of Robert Allen Zimmerman..(Bunting, Jeremy)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Orin Snyder on behalf of Robert Allen Zimmerman..(Snyder, Orin)
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Craig Ascher on behalf of Robert Allen Zimmerman..(Ascher, Brian)
January 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrea Schillaci. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: J. C., Robert Zimmerman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted. (vf)
January 13, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Andrea Schillaci. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Bob Dylan. The party was added to the case in error. (vf)
January 13, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 13, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 13, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schillaci, Andrea)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schillaci, Andrea) Modified on 1/13/2022 (vf).
January 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 951450/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25579625).Document filed by Robert Allen Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Administrative Order 1, #3 Exhibit C: Case Management Order s, #4 Exhibit D: Confidentiality Order, #5 Exhibit E: Re Challenge to CO, #6 Exhibit F: Amended CO, #7 Exhibit G: Ex D to CMO, #8 Exhibit H: Ex E to CMO, #9 Exhibit I: Affidavit of Service, #10 Exhibit J: Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit K: Answer, #12 Exhibit L: Notice of Deposition, #13 Exhibit M: Corrected Answer).(Schillaci, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.C. v. Zimmerman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Dylan
Represented By: Andrea Schillaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Zimmerman
Represented By: Andrea Schillaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Allen Zimmerman
Represented By: Orin Snyder
Represented By: Brian Craig Ascher
Represented By: Greta Bradlee Williams
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Bunting
Represented By: Andrea Schillaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?