Hakaj et al v. The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Orhan Hakaj, Yaroslav Lupachov, Sahrudin Radoncic, Jose Hernandez, Milton Ferrera, Rafael Almonte, Felix Valoy Ramirez, William Cruz, Stoyan Stoyanov, Edgar Hernandez, Iris Chau, Segundo Quito, Oltjon Spahi, Juan Diaz, Mr. Samuel Almonte, Luis Gonzalez and Felix Antonio Ramirez Lantigua
Defendant: The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc. Jointly and Severally doing business as Old Homestead Steakhouse, Marc Sherry and Gregory Sherry
Case Number: 1:2022cv00353
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Filing 28 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Ilan Weiser dated March 11, 2022. Document filed by Gregory Sherry, Marc Sherry, The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc...(Weiser, Ilan)
March 11, 2022 FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 6/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(ah)
March 8, 2022 Filing 27 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Felix Antonio Ramirez Lantigua..(Pelton, Brent)
March 4, 2022 Filing 26 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Luis Gonzalez..(Pelton, Brent)
February 26, 2022 Filing 25 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Samuel Almonte..(Pelton, Brent)
February 10, 2022 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/14/2022.(ah)
February 2, 2022 Filing 24 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Juan Diaz..(Pelton, Brent)
January 31, 2022 Filing 23 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Oltjon Spahi..(Pelton, Brent)
January 27, 2022 Filing 22 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Segundo Quito..(Pelton, Brent)
January 27, 2022 Filing 21 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Iris Chau..(Pelton, Brent)
January 25, 2022 Filing 20 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Edgar Hernandez..(Pelton, Brent)
January 24, 2022 Filing 19 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Stoyan Stoyanov..(Pelton, Brent)
January 24, 2022 Filing 18 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by William Cruz..(Pelton, Brent)
January 24, 2022 Filing 17 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Felix Valoy Ramirez..(Pelton, Brent)
January 24, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Rafael Almonte..(Pelton, Brent)
January 24, 2022 Filing 15 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Milton Ferrera..(Pelton, Brent)
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jose Hernandez..(Pelton, Brent)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/31/2022. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/10/2019) (jpt)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Orhan Hakaj, Yaroslav Lupachov, Sahrudin Radoncic..(Pelton, Brent)
January 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Daniel Polivy on behalf of Gregory Sherry, Marc Sherry, The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc...(Polivy, Brian)
January 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilan Weiser on behalf of Gregory Sherry, Marc Sherry, The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc...(Weiser, Ilan)
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda M. Fugazy on behalf of Gregory Sherry, Marc Sherry, The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc...(Fugazy, Amanda)
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gregory Sherry. (vf)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marc Sherry. (vf)
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc. (vf)
January 14, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 14, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 14, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gregory Sherry, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Orhan Hakaj, Yaroslav Lupachov, Sahrudin Radoncic..(Pelton, Brent)
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marc Sherry, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Orhan Hakaj, Yaroslav Lupachov, Sahrudin Radoncic..(Pelton, Brent)
January 13, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc. d/b/a Old Homestead Steakhouse, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Orhan Hakaj, Yaroslav Lupachov, Sahrudin Radoncic..(Pelton, Brent)
January 13, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pelton, Brent)
January 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory Sherry, Marc Sherry, The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25585791)Document filed by Orhan Hakaj, Sahrudin Radoncic, Yaroslav Lupachov..(Pelton, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hakaj et al v. The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orhan Hakaj
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Lupachov
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahrudin Radoncic
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Hernandez
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Ferrera
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Almonte
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Valoy Ramirez
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cruz
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stoyan Stoyanov
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Hernandez
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Chau
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Segundo Quito
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oltjon Spahi
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Diaz
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Samuel Almonte
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Gonzalez
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Antonio Ramirez Lantigua
Represented By: Brent Edward Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Original Homestead Restaurant Inc. Jointly and Severally doing business as Old Homestead Steakhouse
Represented By: Amanda M. Fugazy
Represented By: Brian Daniel Polivy
Represented By: Ilan Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Sherry
Represented By: Amanda M. Fugazy
Represented By: Brian Daniel Polivy
Represented By: Ilan Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Sherry
Represented By: Amanda M. Fugazy
Represented By: Brian Daniel Polivy
Represented By: Ilan Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?