Yuwono v. 998LQ Sushi Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandy Yuwono
Defendant: 998LQ Sushi Inc. doing business as Okinii, Xiang Qiu and Yong Feng Liu
Case Number: 1:2022cv00389
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Xiang Qiu served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. Document filed by Sandy Yuwono..(Lee, C.K.)
February 3, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by 998LQ Sushi Inc., Yong Feng Liu, Xiang Qiu..(Wang, Zhou)
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Yong Feng Liu served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. Document filed by Sandy Yuwono..(Lee, C.K.)
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. 998LQ Sushi Inc. served on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022. Document filed by Sandy Yuwono..(Lee, C.K.)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/19/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Courts Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Courts website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Courts Emergency Rules (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/18/2022) (rro) Modified on 1/25/2022 (rro).
January 18, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yong Feng Liu..(gp)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Xiang Qiu..(gp)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 998LQ Sushi Inc...(gp)
January 18, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
January 18, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
January 18, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
January 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney C.K. Lee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sandy Yuwono. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (gp)
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Sandy Yuwono..(Lee, C.K.)
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yong Feng Liu, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sandy Yuwono..(Lee, C.K.)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Xiang Qiu, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sandy Yuwono..(Lee, C.K.)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 998LQ Sushi Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sandy Yuwono..(Lee, C.K.)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, C.K.)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 998LQ Sushi Inc., Yong Feng Liu, Xiang Qiu. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25591750)Document filed by Sandy Yuwono..(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yuwono v. 998LQ Sushi Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Yuwono
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 998LQ Sushi Inc. doing business as Okinii
Represented By: Zhou Min Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiang Qiu
Represented By: Zhou Min Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yong Feng Liu
Represented By: Zhou Min Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?