Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc. v. 51 East 126th Street, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc.
Defendant: 51 East 126th Street, LLC, Vanessa Kate Turner, The City of New York, New York City Environmental Control Board and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2022cv00434
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by March 31, 2022, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/17/2022) (kv)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. The March 9, 2022 Order that Plaintiff seek default judgment against Defendants City of New York and New York City Environmental Control Board will be held in abeyance. (Doc. 26.) If the parties reach a settlement, Plaintiff is directed to discontinue the action against all Defendants, including Defendants City of New York and New York City Environmental Control Board. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/17/2022) (kv)
March 16, 2022 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File order to show cause for default judgment addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re: #25 Clerk's Certificate of Default, #24 Clerk's Certificate of Default. Plaintiff failed to file an Order to Show Cause and the supporting materials pursuant to Rule 4.H. and Attachment A of my Individual Rules & Practices in Civil Cases. It is hereby: ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 4.H. and Attachment A of my Individual Rules & Practices in Civil Cases, Plaintiff is directed to file an Order to Show Cause and the supporting materials on or before March 16, 2022. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the claims against the defaulting Defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/9/2022) (kv)
March 2, 2022 Filing 25 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to New York City Environmental Control Board.(km)
March 2, 2022 Filing 24 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to The City of New York.(km)
March 2, 2022 Filing 23 AFFIRMATION of Alan H. Weinreb, Esq. re: #22 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default, . Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
March 2, 2022 Filing 22 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 3/2/2022 (km).
March 2, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIRMATION of Alan H. Weinreb, Esq. re: #20 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default, . Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
March 2, 2022 Filing 20 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 3/2/2022 (km).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #15 Summons Returned Executed filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc., #16 Summons Returned Executed filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc.. To date, Defendants City of New York and the New York City Environmental Control Board have not appeared or responded to the complaint. Plaintiff, however, has taken no action to prosecute this case against those Defendants. Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to seek a default judgment against Defendants City of New York and the New York City Environmental Control Board, they are directed to do so in accordance with Rule 4(H) of my Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases by no later than March 8, 2022. If Plaintiff fails to do so or otherwise demonstrate that they intend to prosecute this litigation against Defendants City of New York and the New York City Environmental Control Board, I may dismiss this case against those Defendants for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/22/2022) (kv)
February 11, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #17 Counterclaim. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
February 8, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc.. Document filed by Vanessa Kate Turner, 51 East 126th Street, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for documents referred to in pleadings).(Garitee, Christopher)
February 8, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York City Environmental Control Board served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
February 8, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
February 8, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Vanessa Kate Turner served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
February 8, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. 51 East 126th Street, LLC served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Environmental Control Board..(sj)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(sj)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vanessa Kate Turner. (sj)
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 51 East 126th Street, LLC..(sj)
January 19, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 19, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 19, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Environmental Control Board, re: #3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vanessa Kate Turner, re: #3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 51 East 126th Street, LLC, re: #3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weinreb, Alan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against 51 East 126th Street, LLC, New York City Environmental Control Board, The City of New York, Vanessa Kate Turner.Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit G).(Weinreb, Alan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc...(Weinreb, Alan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 51 East 126th Street, LLC, New York City Environmental Control Board, The City of New York, Vanessa Kate Turner. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25598296)Document filed by Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit G).(Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc. v. 51 East 126th Street, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nubridge Commercial Lending REO SPV I Inc.
Represented By: Alan H. Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 51 East 126th Street, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Charles Garitee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Kate Turner
Represented By: Christopher Charles Garitee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Environmental Control Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?