Joseph v. NASA et al
Plaintiff: Rhawn Joseph
Defendant: NASA, Springer Nature America Inc. and Springer Nature Academic Publishing LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00466
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mollie Melissa Kornreich on behalf of NASA..(Kornreich, Mollie)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Jeremy A. Chase dated February 28, 2022. Document filed by Springer Nature Academic Publishing LLC, Springer Nature America Inc...(Chase, Jeremy)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of Summons Issued to Rhawn Joseph 677 Elm St. San Jose, CA 95126. (aan)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Springer Nature Academic Publishing LLC. (aan)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Springer Nature Academic Publishing LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rhawn Joseph. (sc)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
February 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF JOSEPH V. SPRINGER NATURE ET AL. (20 CV 4672) & ORDER DEFAULT & SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST SRINGER NATURE AMERICA INC., SPRINGER NATURE ACADEMIC PUBLISHING LLC FOR FRAUD AGAINST THE COURT FRCP 60(d)(3). Document filed by Rhawn Joseph.(sc)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Springer Nature America Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rhawn Joseph. (sc)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Springer Nature America Inc. (aan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of Summons Issued to Rhawn Joseph 677 Elm St. San Jose, CA 95126. (aan)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NASA. (aan)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #9 Summons Issued, to Rhawn Joseph 677 Elm St. San Jose, CA 95126. (aan)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NASA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rhawn Joseph. (sc)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Springer Nature Academic Publishing LLC waiver sent on 1/31/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. Document filed by Rhawn Joseph. (sc)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Springer Nature America Inc. waiver sent on 1/31/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. Document filed by Rhawn Joseph. (sc)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: Check $402.00 processed by the Finance Department on 1/25/2022, Receipt Number 465401292623. (jcf)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-4672 (JPC). Document filed by Rhawn Joseph..(rdz) Modified on 2/1/2022 (rdz).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rhawn Joseph..(rdz)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Rhawn Joseph consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Rhawn Joseph..(rdz)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET.(rdz)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NASA, Springer Nature Academic Publishing LLC, Springer Nature America Inc.. Document filed by Rhawn Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(rdz)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. NASA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhawn Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASA
Represented By: Mollie Melissa Kornreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springer Nature America Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Adam Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springer Nature Academic Publishing LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Adam Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?