656 Hermitage Circle, LLC v. Wallach et al
Plaintiff: 656 Hermitage Circle, LLC
Defendant: David T. Wallach and Maria T Wallach
Case Number: 1:2022cv00571
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ni Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Jay Ashman on behalf of David T. Wallach, Maria T Wallach..(Ashman, Kenneth)
March 2, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Maria T Wallach waiver sent on 2/16/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. Document filed by 656 Hermitage Circle, LLC..(Faraci, Stephen)
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David T. Wallach waiver sent on 2/16/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. Document filed by 656 Hermitage Circle, LLC..(Faraci, Stephen)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 656 Hermitage Circle, LLC..(Faraci, Stephen)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/31/2022) (tg)
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David T. Wallach..(gp)
January 24, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maria T Wallach..(gp)
January 24, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
January 24, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
January 24, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maria T. Wallach, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by 656 Hermitage Circle, LLC..(Faraci, Stephen)
January 21, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David T. Wallach, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by 656 Hermitage Circle, LLC..(Faraci, Stephen)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faraci, Stephen)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David T. Wallach, Maria T Wallach. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25619486)Document filed by 656 Hermitage Circle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Faraci, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 656 Hermitage Circle, LLC v. Wallach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 656 Hermitage Circle, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Faraci, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T. Wallach
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Ashman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria T Wallach
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Ashman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?