Vicinanza et al v. Horizon Window Treatments, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Vicinanza and Luis Morales
Defendant: Horizon Window Treatments, Inc. and Eric Abikzer
Case Number: 1:2022cv00657
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held telephonically. To join the conference, dial 888-278-0296 and enter access code 5195844. Initial Conference set for 4/19/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/14/2022) (tg)
March 14, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Abikzer, Horizon Window Treatments, Inc...(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Joshua D. Levin-Epstein, Esq. dated February 23, 2022., #1 Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. Eric Abikzer answer due 3/25/2022; Horizon Window Treatments, Inc. answer due 3/25/2022. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/23/2022) (tg)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Joshua D. Levin-Epstein, Esq. dated February 23, 2022. Document filed by Eric Abikzer, Horizon Window Treatments, Inc...(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eunon Jason Mizrahi on behalf of Eric Abikzer, Horizon Window Treatments, Inc...(Mizrahi, Eunon)
February 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Levin-Epstein on behalf of Eric Abikzer, Horizon Window Treatments, Inc...(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric Abikzer, Horizon Window Treatments, Inc...(lal)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Horizon Window Treatments, Inc. and Eric Abikzer, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luis Morales, Vincent Vicinanza..(Spasojevich, Lawrence)
January 26, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
January 26, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
January 26, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
January 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lawrence Spasojevich to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
January 25, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Horizon Window Treatments, Inc. and Eric Abikzer, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Luis Morales, Vincent Vicinanza..(Spasojevich, Lawrence) Modified on 1/26/2022 (vf).
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spasojevich, Lawrence)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric Abikzer, Horizon Window Treatments, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25635956)Document filed by Vincent Vicinanza, Luis Morales..(Spasojevich, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vicinanza et al v. Horizon Window Treatments, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Vicinanza
Represented By: Lawrence Spasojevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Morales
Represented By: Lawrence Spasojevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Window Treatments, Inc.
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Abikzer
Represented By: Eunon Jason Mizrahi
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?