Murphy v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Olivia Murphy
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals and Cooper Companies
Case Number: 1:2022cv00705
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/8/2022) (sjo)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nkereuwem Inyang Umoh on behalf of Olivia Murphy..(Umoh, Nkereuwem)
February 9, 2022 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia. (sjo)
February 9, 2022 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:22-cv-00550, filed on 02/09/2022. (sjo)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, Bronx County, on January 27, 2022. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than February 11, 2022. Counsel for the defendant shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for the plaintiff by February 4, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/28/2022) (js)
January 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
January 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
January 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David A Landman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code d (Defendant); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
January 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David A Landman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Teva Pharmaceuticals, Cooper Companies. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc. for The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Document filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc...(Landman, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Document filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc...(Landman, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc...(Landman, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc...(Landman, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Landman, David)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 814627/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25644717).Document filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Shanahan Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Wallace Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Docket List).(Landman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Murphy
Represented By: Nkereuwem Inyang Umoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: David A Landman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: David A Landman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: David A Landman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Companies
Represented By: David A Landman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?