Johnson et al v. Body & Pole, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue and Rodenellie Pluviose
Defendant: Body & Pole, Inc. and Kyra Johannesen
Case Number: 1:2022cv00857
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 30 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
March 30, 2022 Filing 29 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #27 Letter filed by Rebecca Pardue, Meghan Piper Johnson, Rodenellie Pluviose. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/29/2022) (jca)
March 28, 2022 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Benjamin Rudolph Delson, Esq. dated 03/28/2022 re: Mediation Schedule. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
March 11, 2022 Filing 26 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
March 10, 2022 Filing 25 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
March 8, 2022 Filing 24 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
March 8, 2022 Filing 23 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
March 7, 2022 Filing 22 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
March 7, 2022 Filing 21 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
March 5, 2022 Filing 20 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
March 5, 2022 Filing 19 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 28, 2022 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/30/2022.(ah)
February 25, 2022 Filing 18 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/7/2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/10/2019) (jpt)
February 24, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damien Harris Weinstein on behalf of Body & Pole, Inc., Kyra Johannesen..(Weinstein, Damien)
February 24, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Gregory Klein on behalf of Body & Pole, Inc., Kyra Johannesen..(Klein, Brian)
February 11, 2022 Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 11, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 9, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rodenellie Pluviose, Rebecca Pardue..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 7, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 7, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 7, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kyra Johannesen. (vf)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Body & Pole, Inc.(vf)
February 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Benjamin Rudolph Delson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Blank; Dollar Demand 2,500,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act; the Dollar Demand has been modified to 2,500,000. (vf)
February 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Benjamin Rudolph Delson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Meghan Piper Johnson, Rodenellie Pluviose, Rebecca Pardue.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
February 2, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 2, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 2, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Granovsky on behalf of Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Granovsky, Alexander)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kyra Johannesen, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Body & Pole, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rebecca Pardue, Rodenellie Pluviose..(Delson, Benjamin)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Body & Pole, Inc., Kyra Johannesen. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25665729)Document filed by Meghan Piper Johnson, Rodenellie Pluviose, Rebecca Pardue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to be Party Plaintiff: Johnson, #2 Exhibit Consent to be Party Plaintiff: Pardue, #3 Exhibit Consent to be Party Plaintiff: Pluviose).(Delson, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Body & Pole, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Piper Johnson
Represented By: Alexander Granovsky
Represented By: Benjamin Rudolph Delson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Pardue
Represented By: Alexander Granovsky
Represented By: Benjamin Rudolph Delson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodenellie Pluviose
Represented By: Alexander Granovsky
Represented By: Benjamin Rudolph Delson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Body & Pole, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Gregory Klein
Represented By: Damien Harris Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyra Johannesen
Represented By: Brian Gregory Klein
Represented By: Damien Harris Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?