Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security and Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv00873
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security..(Sun, Anthony)
March 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Jan-Huan Sun on behalf of Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security..(Sun, Anthony)
February 16, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Department of Homeland Security served on 2/7/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Burra, Ananda)
February 16, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 2/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Service was accepted by Derick Mayers, Authorized Civil Clerk. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Burra, Ananda)
February 16, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security served on 2/7/2022, answer due 3/9/2022. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Burra, Ananda)
February 16, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security served on 2/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. Service was accepted by Derick Mayers, Authorized Civil Clerk. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Burra, Ananda)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security..(lal)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security..(pc)
February 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Katherine R. Rosenfeld to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on the summons must exactly match how it appears on the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 2, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 2, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 2, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ananda Venkata Burra on behalf of Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Burra, Ananda)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Rosenfeld, Katherine) Modified on 2/2/2022 (pc).
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP..(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25668405)Document filed by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Rosenfeld, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
Represented By: Ananda Venkata Burra
Represented By: Katherine R. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Anthony Jan-Huan Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Anthony Jan-Huan Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?