Iannuzzi v. Lu
Counter Defendant: John Nicholas Iannuzzi
Counter Claimant: Wenzhao Lu, NANSHAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL INSTITUTE, LLC and LU DAOPEI HOSPITAL
Case Number: 1:2022cv00911
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are directed to submit a Rule 26(f) report by April 15, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/31/2022) (ama)
March 30, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of WENZHAO LU on MAY 24. 2022 at 10 AM.Document filed by John Nicholas Iannuzzi..(Fantauzzi, Shakira)
March 30, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim. Document filed by John Nicholas Iannuzzi..(Fantauzzi, Shakira)
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nanshan Memorial Medical Institute, LLC..(Gottlieb, Marc)
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lu Daopei Hospital..(Gottlieb, Marc)
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against John Nicholas Iannuzzi. Document filed by Lu Daopei Hospital, Wenzhao Lu, Nanshan Memorial Medical Institute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement with Iannuzzi).(Gottlieb, Marc)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lu Daopei Hospital served on 2/17/2022, answer due 3/10/2022. Service was accepted by DAOPEI LU, WIFE. Document filed by John Nicholas Iannuzzi..(Fantauzzi, Shakira)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Nanshan Memorial Medical Institute, LLC served on 2/17/2022, answer due 3/10/2022. Service was accepted by DAOPEI LU, WIFE. Document filed by John Nicholas Iannuzzi..(Fantauzzi, Shakira)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Wenzhao Lu served on 2/17/2022, answer due 3/10/2022. Service was accepted by DAOPEI LU, WIFE. Document filed by John Nicholas Iannuzzi..(Fantauzzi, Shakira)
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wenzhao Lu, Lu Daopei Hospital, Nanshan Memorial Medical Institute, LLC. (sj)
February 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shakira A. Fantauzzi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nanshan Memorial Medical Institute, LLC, Lu Daopei Hospital. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
February 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Shakira A. Fantauzzi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
February 3, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 3, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WENZHAO LU, NANSHAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL INSTITUTE, LLC, LU DAOPEI HOSPITAL, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Nicholas Iannuzzi..(Fantauzzi, Shakira)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fantauzzi, Shakira)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wenzhao Lu, NANSHAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL INSTITUTE, LLC, LU DAOPEI HOSPITAL. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25676343)Document filed by John Nicholas Iannuzzi..(Fantauzzi, Shakira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iannuzzi v. Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John Nicholas Iannuzzi
Represented By: Shakira A. Fantauzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Wenzhao Lu
Represented By: Marc Steven Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: NANSHAN MEMORIAL MEDICAL INSTITUTE, LLC
Represented By: Marc Steven Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: LU DAOPEI HOSPITAL
Represented By: Marc Steven Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?