Finco Prime Consulting Corporation et al v. Belmamoun et al
Plaintiff: Finco Prime Consulting Corporation, SweetPea Ventures, Inc., MJT Park Investors, Inc., Michael Toporek and Matthew Lipman
Defendant: Omar Belmamoun
Nominal Defendant: Brookstone Partners Morocco S.A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00952
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 5/12/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. The parties shall use a landline if one is available. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/8/2022) (vfr)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schnapp, Daniel)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Omar Belmamoun..(pc)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Adam Schnapp to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MJT Park Investors, Inc...(Schnapp, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SweetPea Ventures, Inc...(Schnapp, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Finco Prime Consulting Corporation..(Schnapp, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Omar Belmamoun, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Finco Prime Consulting Corporation, Matthew Lipman, MJT Park Investors, Inc., SweetPea Ventures, Inc., Michael Toporek..(Schnapp, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Omar Belmamoun, Brookstone Partners Morocco S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25677782)Document filed by Michael Toporek, Finco Prime Consulting Corporation, MJT Park Investors, Inc., SweetPea Ventures, Inc., Matthew Lipman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Morrocan Action, #2 Exhibit Chart of Suspected Illegal Activity, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Schnapp, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finco Prime Consulting Corporation et al v. Belmamoun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finco Prime Consulting Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schnapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SweetPea Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schnapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJT Park Investors, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schnapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Toporek
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schnapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lipman
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schnapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Belmamoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Brookstone Partners Morocco S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?