Weinstein v. Abelson Herron Halpern LLP et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Weinstein
Defendant: Abelson Herron Halpern LLP and Michael Bruce Abelson
Case Number: 1:2022cv00970
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 Letter filed by Abelson Herron Halpern LLP, Michael Bruce Abelson ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/3/2022) (ks)
March 3, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Gary Kavulich & Adam M. Marshall dated March 3, 2022 re: Dismissal with Prejudice. Document filed by Michael Bruce Abelson, Abelson Herron Halpern LLP..(Marshall, Adam)
March 2, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/2/2022. (ajs)
March 1, 2022 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam M. Marshall dated March 1, 2022 re: Pre-Conference Joint Letter. Document filed by Michael Bruce Abelson, Abelson Herron Halpern LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Management Plan, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Retainer Agreement).(Marshall, Adam)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Gary M. Kavulich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/1/2022) (ate)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the initial pretrial conference in this case, originally scheduled for March 2, 2022, at 2 p.m., is hereby rescheduled for March 2, 2022, at 3 p.m. ( Initial Conference set for 3/2/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/1/2022) (ate)
March 1, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 SECOND MOTION for Gary Michael Kavulich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 28, 2022 Filing 12 SECOND MOTION for Gary Michael Kavulich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Kavulich, Gary)
February 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 FIRST MOTION for Gary Michael Kavulich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25786015. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Noatarized Attorney Affidavit required as per local rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 27, 2022 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Gary Michael Kavulich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25786015. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Harvey Weinstein..(Kavulich, Gary) Modified on 2/28/2022 (bcu).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The parties' request for an adjournment is denied. The initial pretrial conference in this case will serve, inter alia, to preview the anticipated motion. Plaintiffs counsel is further directed to appear and file a motion to appear pro hac vice promptly. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. 9. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/24/2022) (js)
February 24, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Re: Initial Conference Scheduled for 3/2/22 addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam M. Marshall dated February 24, 2022. Document filed by Michael Bruce Abelson, Abelson Herron Halpern LLP..(Marshall, Adam)
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam M. Marshall dated February 18, 2022 re: Response to February 4 Order. Document filed by Michael Bruce Abelson, Abelson Herron Halpern LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavits of Service re Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Email Exchange with Plaintiff's Counsel).(Marshall, Adam)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam M. Marshall dated February 8, 2022., #3 Notice of Removal. Granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. 6. SO ORDERED. Michael Bruce Abelson answer due 3/4/2022; Abelson Herron Halpern LLP answer due 3/4/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/10/2022) (tg)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Adam M. Marshall dated February 8, 2022. Document filed by Michael Bruce Abelson, Abelson Herron Halpern LLP..(Marshall, Adam)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound(#) key. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/2/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/4/2022) (jca)
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett A. Scher on behalf of Michael Bruce Abelson, Abelson Herron Halpern LLP..(Scher, Brett)
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 150086/22..Document filed by Michael Bruce Abelson, Abelson Herron Halpern LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Summons & Verified Complaint).(Marshall, Adam)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marshall, Adam)
February 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Adam Matthew Marshall to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
February 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Adam Matthew Marshall. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
February 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam Matthew Marshall. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Nassau; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
February 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 3, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 150086/22. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25680499).Document filed by Michael Bruce Abelson, Abelson Herron Halpern LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Summons & Verified Complaint).(Marshall, Adam) Modified on 2/4/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinstein v. Abelson Herron Halpern LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Weinstein
Represented By: Gary Kavulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abelson Herron Halpern LLP
Represented By: Adam Matthew Marshall
Represented By: Brett A. Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bruce Abelson
Represented By: Adam Matthew Marshall
Represented By: Brett A. Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?