Unity Electric Co. Inc. v. Microdesk, Inc.
Plaintiff: Unity Electric Co. Inc.
Defendant: Microdesk, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01066
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendant's unopposed request is granted. The Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") scheduled for April 5, 2022 is adjourned to May 17, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. The parties shall submit their pre-IPTC joint letter and the proposed case management plan and scheduling order by May 10, 2022. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/29/2022) (jca)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Peter T. Shapiro dated March 28, 2022. Document filed by Microdesk, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter)
March 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Microdesk, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter)
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Microdesk, Inc. waiver sent on 3/2/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. Document filed by Unity Electric Co. Inc...(Lakind, Matthew)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/1/2022) (jca)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Microdesk, Inc...(sj)
February 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew David Lakind on behalf of Unity Electric Co. Inc...(Lakind, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
February 9, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lee M. Tesser. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
February 9, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 9, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tesser, Lee)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Microdesk, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Unity Electric Co. Inc...(Tesser, Lee)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Microdesk, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25701401)Document filed by Unity Electric Co. Inc...(Tesser, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unity Electric Co. Inc. v. Microdesk, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unity Electric Co. Inc.
Represented By: Lee M. Tesser
Represented By: Matthew David Lakind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microdesk, Inc.
Represented By: Peter T. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?