Kresge et al v. Greenberg
Plaintiff: David Kresge and Snaplok Systems LLC
Defendant: Nathan Greenberg
Case Number: 1:2022cv01268
Filed: February 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 jd Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Andrew Johnson on behalf of David Kresge, Snaplok Systems LLC..(Johnson, Timothy)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter, filed by Nathan Greenberg, ENDORSMENT: Adjourned to Thursday, April 28, 2022, at 12:00PM. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/8/2022) ( Telephone Conference set for 4/28/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (ks)
April 7, 2022 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Christopher V. Fenlon dated April 7, 2022 re: regarding availability of all counsel for pre-motion conference scheduled for Monday, April 11, 2022. Document filed by Nathan Greenberg..(Fenlon, Christopher)
April 6, 2022 Filing 17 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Benjamin J. Lehberger dated April 6, 2022 re: #14 LETTER MOTION for Conference pre-motion conference with respect to Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Christopher V. Fenlon dated April 1, 2022. . Document filed by David Kresge, Snaplok Systems LLC..(Lehberger, Benjamin)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Conference re: #14 LETTER MOTION for Conference pre-motion conference with respect to Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Christopher V. Fenlon dated April 1, 2022. A pre-motion conference in this matter is scheduled for Monday, April 11, 2022, at 3:30pm. Dial-in: 888 363-4749. Access code: 8140049. The clerk shall close Document 14 as a letter motion. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/4/2022) Telephone Conference set for 4/11/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (ks)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Christine K. Bush to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/4/2022) (ks)
April 4, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Christine K. Bush to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25947591. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 1, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference pre-motion conference with respect to Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Christopher V. Fenlon dated April 1, 2022. Document filed by Nathan Greenberg..(Fenlon, Christopher)
April 1, 2022 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - (SEE DOCUMENT#14) - LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Christopher V. Fenlon dated April 1, 2022 re: request for pre-motion conference with respect to Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss. Document filed by Nathan Greenberg..(Fenlon, Christopher) Modified on 4/4/2022 (lb).
April 1, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Christine K. Bush to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25947591. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nathan Greenberg. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christine K. Bush, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting admission).(Fenlon, Christopher)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Timothy A. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/17/2022) (ks)
March 17, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Timothy A. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25870067. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 16, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Timothy A. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25870067. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Kresge, Snaplok Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Lehberger, Benjamin)
March 9, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Nathan Greenberg served on 2/15/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. Service was made by Email. Document filed by David Kresge; Snaplok Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Lehberger, Benjamin)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Letter requesting 21-day extension of defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint filed by Nathan Greenberg. ENDORSEMENT : Application granted. SO ORDERED., (Nathan Greenberg answer due 4/1/2022.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/8/22) (yv)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Christopher Fenlon dated March 7, 2022 re: requesting 21-day extension of defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Nathan Greenberg..(Fenlon, Christopher)
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Vincent Fenlon on behalf of Nathan Greenberg..(Fenlon, Christopher)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nathan Greenberg. (vf)
February 16, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Benjamin Joseph Lehberger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
February 16, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 16, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 16, 2022 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NATHAN GREENBERG, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David Kresge, Snaplok Systems LLC..(Lehberger, Benjamin)
February 15, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lehberger, Benjamin)
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Snaplok Systems LLC..(Lehberger, Benjamin)
February 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nathan Greenberg. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25735517)Document filed by David Kresge, Snaplok Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Lehberger, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kresge et al v. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kresge
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Lehberger
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snaplok Systems LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Lehberger
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Greenberg
Represented By: Christopher Vincent Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?