Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC v. Macquarie Energy LLC
Plaintiff: Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC
Defendant: Macquarie Energy LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01345
Filed: February 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to #22 Counterclaim. Document filed by Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC..(Rand, Sascha)
March 28, 2022 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Macquarie Group Limited for Macquarie Energy LLC. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC..(Franklin, Beatrice)
March 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Beatrice Catherine Franklin to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
March 25, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC..(Merrill, William)
March 25, 2022 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC..(Franklin, Beatrice) Modified on 3/28/2022 (lb).
March 22, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Ashley L. McMillian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25888726. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
March 21, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Ashley L. McMillian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25888726. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ashley McMillian, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(McMillian, Ashley)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: granting #17 Motion for Alexandra Foulkes Grafton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Because this action has been assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password at nysd.uscourts.gov if counsel does not already have an ECF password and system access. Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/15/2022) (js)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: granting #16 Motion for William R.H. Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Because this action has been assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password at nysd.uscourts.gov if counsel does not already have an ECF password and system access. Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/15/2022) (js)
March 14, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Alexandra Foulkes Grafton to Appear Pro Hac Vice With Corrected Exhibit. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 14, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for William R.H. Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice With Corrected Exhibit. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 11, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Alexandra Foulkes Grafton to Appear Pro Hac Vice With Corrected Exhibit. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Foulkes Grafton, Alex)
March 11, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for William R.H. Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice With Corrected Exhibit. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Merrill, William)
March 11, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for William R.H. Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25845321. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar for this state;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) Modified on 3/11/2022 (bcu).
March 11, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #14 MOTION for Alexandra Foulkes Grafton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25845440. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar for this state;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Beatrice Franklin dated March 8, 2022., #1 Complaint. Defendant's request of a two-week extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond is set for March 25, 2022. Macquarie Energy LLC answer due 3/25/2022. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/10/2022) (ate)
March 10, 2022 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Alexandra Foulkes Grafton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25845440. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Foulkes Grafton, Alex) Modified on 3/11/2022 (bcu).
March 10, 2022 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for William R.H. Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25845321. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Merrill, William) Modified on 3/11/2022 (bcu).
March 8, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Beatrice Franklin dated March 8, 2022. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC..(Franklin, Beatrice)
March 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Beatrice Catherine Franklin on behalf of Macquarie Energy LLC..(Franklin, Beatrice)
February 18, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Macquarie Energy LLC on 02/18/2022. Service was accepted by Michelle McLendon. Document filed by Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC..(Bonacorsi, Kathryn)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sascha Nicholas Rand on behalf of Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC..(Rand, Sascha)
February 17, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Delveaux Bonacorsi on behalf of Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC..(Bonacorsi, Kathryn)
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathan Goralnik on behalf of Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC..(Goralnik, Nathan)
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Macquarie Energy LLC..(pc)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NextEra Energy, Inc. for Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC. Document filed by Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC..(Nesser, Isaac)
February 17, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Isaac Nesser to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. (lb)
February 17, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 17, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macquarie Energy LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC..(Nesser, Isaac)
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NextEra Energy, Inc. for Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC. Document filed by Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC..(Nesser, Isaac) Modified on 2/17/2022 (lb).
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nesser, Isaac)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Macquarie Energy LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25744336)Document filed by Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC..(Nesser, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC v. Macquarie Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nextera Energy Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Isaac Nesser
Represented By: Kathryn Delveaux Bonacorsi
Represented By: Nathan Goralnik
Represented By: Sascha Nicholas Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Energy LLC
Represented By: William R. H. Merrill
Represented By: Alex Foulkes Grafton
Represented By: Ashley McMillian
Represented By: Beatrice Catherine Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?