Jean-Gilles v. Paragon Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andre Jean-Gilles
Defendant: Paragon Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01363
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 20, 2022, is ADJOURNED to May 11, 2022, at 4:00 P.M. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The parties shall file a joint letter and a proposed case management plan by May 4, 2022, at noon. Initial Conference set for 5/11/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/13/2022) (mml)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from David C. Wims dated 04/11/2022. Document filed by Andre Jean-Gilles..(Wims, David)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. IPTC MATERIALS DUE: April 13, 2022 at noon. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 4/20/2022 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/3/2022) (jca)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paragon Systems, Inc...(pc)
February 18, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 18, 2022 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 18, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Christopher Wims. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Kings;. (pc)
February 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Christopher Wims. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Andre Jean-Gilles. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wims, David)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paragon Systems, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andre Jean-Gilles..(Wims, David)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25749825)Document filed by Andre Jean-Gilles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Exhibits 1-2).(Wims, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean-Gilles v. Paragon Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Jean-Gilles
Represented By: David Christopher Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?