Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc. et al v. Conru et al
Plaintiff: Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc. and Chatham Capital Management IV, LLC
Defendant: Andrew B. Conru, FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Interactive Network, Inc., John and Jane Does and John and Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2022cv01381
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #22 Letter Motion for Conference re: #22 LETTER MOTION for Conference Rule 26(f) addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven M. Kayman dated June 21, 2022. Plaintiffs' letter motion requesting that I schedule a Rule 26(f) conference, (Doc. 22), is denied. Discovery is stayed pending the resolution of any motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/27/2022) (kv)
June 24, 2022 Filing 24 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from William J. Trunk dated June 24, 2022 re: #22 LETTER MOTION for Conference Rule 26(f) addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven M. Kayman dated June 21, 2022. . Document filed by Andrew B. Conru, FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Interactive Network, Inc...(Trunk, William)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER with respect to #22 Letter Motion for Conference re: #22 LETTER MOTION for Conference Rule 26(f) addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven M. Kayman dated June 21, 2022.Defendants are directed to file any response to Plaintiffs' request on or before June 29, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/22/2022) (tg)
June 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/29/2022 (tg)
June 21, 2022 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Conference Rule 26(f) addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven M. Kayman dated June 21, 2022. Document filed by Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc., Chatham Capital Management IV, LLC..(Kayman, Steven)
June 3, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc., Chatham Capital Management IV, LLC..(Ceslowitz, Stacy)
May 27, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Andrew B. Conru, FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Interactive Network, Inc...(Robbins, Lawrence)
May 24, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William James Trunk on behalf of Andrew B. Conru, FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Interactive Network, Inc...(Trunk, William)
May 13, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . Document filed by Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc., Chatham Capital Management IV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint).(Ceslowitz, Stacy)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven M. Kayman dated May 9, 2022., #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/10/2022) (tg) Modified on 5/13/2022 (tg).
May 9, 2022 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven M. Kayman dated May 9, 2022. Document filed by Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc., Chatham Capital Management IV, LLC..(Kayman, Steven)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven M. Kayman dated April 20, 2022. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/21/2022) Responses due by 5/13/2022 (ks)
April 20, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven M. Kayman dated April 20, 2022. Document filed by Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc., Chatham Capital Management IV, LLC..(Kayman, Steven)
April 7, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Michael Kayman on behalf of Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc., Chatham Capital Management IV, LLC..(Kayman, Steven)
April 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lawrence Saul Robbins on behalf of Andrew B. Conru, FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Interactive Network, Inc.. New Address: Kramer Levin Robbins Russell, 2000 K Street NW, 4th Floor, Washington, District of Columbia, United States 20006, (202) 775-4500..(Robbins, Lawrence)
March 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stacy Loren Ceslowitz on behalf of Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc., Chatham Capital Management IV, LLC..(Ceslowitz, Stacy)
March 11, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. . Document filed by Andrew B. Conru, FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Interactive Network, Inc...(Robbins, Lawrence)
March 11, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Andrew B. Conru, FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Interactive Network, Inc.. Responses due by 4/22/2022.(Robbins, Lawrence)
March 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stacy Loren Ceslowitz on behalf of Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc...(Ceslowitz, Stacy)
March 11, 2022 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORDS AND PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 81. Document filed by Chatham Capital Management IV, LLC..(Ceslowitz, Stacy)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/23/2022) (kv)
February 23, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrew B. Conru answer due 3/11/2022; FriendFinder Networks, Inc. answer due 3/11/2022; Interactive Network, Inc. answer due 3/11/2022. Motions due by 3/11/2022. Responses due by 4/22/2022 Replies due by 5/13/2022. (kv)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and for Entry of Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Lawrence S. Robbins dated 02/22/2022. Document filed by Andrew B. Conru, FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Interactive Network, Inc...(Robbins, Lawrence)
February 22, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lawrence Saul Robbins. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 11,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000. (vf)
February 22, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 22, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 22, 2022 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent FriendFinder Networks Inc. for Interactive Network, Inc.. Document filed by FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Interactive Network, Inc...(Robbins, Lawrence)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Interactive Network, Inc...(Robbins, Lawrence) Modified on 2/18/2022 (lb).
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Robbins, Lawrence)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 650267/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25753210).Document filed by FriendFinder Networks, Inc., Andrew B. Conru, Interactive Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2-A - Ex. A to State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2-B - Ex. B to State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex. 2-C - Ex. C to State Court Complaint).(Robbins, Lawrence)
February 18, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Lawrence Saul Robbins to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc. et al v. Conru et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chatham Capital Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy Loren Ceslowitz
Represented By: Steven Michael Kayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chatham Capital Management IV, LLC
Represented By: Stacy Loren Ceslowitz
Represented By: Steven Michael Kayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew B. Conru
Represented By: Lawrence Saul Robbins
Represented By: William James Trunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FriendFinder Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Saul Robbins
Represented By: William James Trunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interactive Network, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Saul Robbins
Represented By: William James Trunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?