Montalvo v. Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Amberlyn Montalvo
Defendant: Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp. doing business as The Paul Hotel Rooftop Bar, The Paul Hotel Inc., Jose Maldonado, Shashi Sharma and Joginder Sharma
Case Number: 1:2022cv01423
Filed: February 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Paul Hotel Inc. served on 3/16/2022, answer due 4/6/2022. Service was accepted by General Agent of The Paul Hotel. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion to Compel. Defendants Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp and The Paul Hotel Inc. are ORDERED to produce to Plaintiff's counsel "the names and addresses of all shareholders, the number and class of shares held by each and the dates when they respectively became the owners of record thereof," pursuant to NY Business Corporation Law 624(b) on or before the date on which their Answer or responsive pleading is due. In the alternative, if Defendants believe they have good faith grounds upon which to oppose this production then they shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion on or before the date on which their answer or responsive pleading is due. Plaintiff shall serve her letter motion and a copy of this Order on Defendants in conjunction with the service of the Summons and Complaint and shall file an affidavit or certificate of service to that effect. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
February 23, 2022 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION to Compel Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp. d/b/a The Paul Hotel Rooftop Bar to Produce List of Top Ten Shareholders addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Penn Dodson, Esq. dated 2/23/2022. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Ex. A).(Dodson, Penn)
February 23, 2022 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp...(lal)
February 23, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shashi Sharma..(lal)
February 23, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Paul Hotel Inc...(lal)
February 23, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jose Maldonado..(lal)
February 23, 2022 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joginder Sharma..(lal)
February 22, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp. d/b/a The Paul Hotel Rooftop Bar, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn)
February 22, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shashi Sharma, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn)
February 22, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Paul Hotel Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn)
February 22, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jose Maldonado, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn)
February 22, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joginder Sharma, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/22/2022) (ks)
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joginder Sharma, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn) Modified on 2/22/2022 (pc).
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shashi Sharma, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn) Modified on 2/22/2022 (pc).
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jose Maldonado, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn) Modified on 2/22/2022 (pc).
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Paul Hotel Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn) Modified on 2/22/2022 (pc).
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp. d/b/a The Paul Hotel Rooftop Bar, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn) Modified on 2/22/2022 (pc).
February 22, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Penn Anderson Dodson to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney info is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 22, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 22, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 22, 2022 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 22, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Penn Anderson Dodson to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): File each summons separately or create a rider listing every party;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 21, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp., The Paul Hotel Inc., Jose Maldonado, Shashi Sharma, and Joginder Sharma, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo. (Attachments: #1 Summons the Paul Hotel, #2 Summons Jose Maldonado, #3 Summons Shashi Sharma, #4 Summons Joginder Sharma).(Dodson, Penn) Modified on 2/22/2022 (pc).
February 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dodson, Penn)
February 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jose Maldonado, Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp., Joginder Sharma, Shashi Sharma, The Paul Hotel Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25758688)Document filed by Amberlyn Montalvo..(Dodson, Penn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montalvo v. Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amberlyn Montalvo
Represented By: Penn Anderson Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Bar & Restaurant Corp. doing business as The Paul Hotel Rooftop Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Paul Hotel Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shashi Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joginder Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?