Seibel v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Seibel
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, American International Group, Inc. d/b/a AIG and American International Group, Inc. doing business as AIG
Case Number: 1:2022cv01483
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ct Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 4/12/2022 by telephone. Plaintiff's and Defendant's counsel present. Defendants are granted leave to file a motion to dismiss with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due May 3, 2022; opposition due May 24, 2022; and reply due May 31, 2022. Discovery is stayed pending resolution of the motion. (jar)
April 6, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carey Alexander on behalf of Nicholas Seibel..(Alexander, Carey)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Nicholas A. Colella to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Jamisen A. Etzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Michael J. Laird to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Rachel K. Tack to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Brian C. Gudmundson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
March 23, 2022 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian C. Gudmundson dated March 23, 2022 re: Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Nicholas Seibel..(Gudmundson, Brian)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Letter filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, American International Group, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The request for a pre-motion conference is granted. The conference will be held on April 12 at 10:30 AM. The parties are instructed to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. Plaintiff is instructed to respond to this letter by no later than March 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/18/2022) (vfr)
March 18, 2022 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael B. Carlinsky dated March 18, 2022 re: Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by American International Group, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Carlinsky, Michael)
March 16, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Adam Rakower on behalf of American International Group, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Rakower, Ryan)
March 16, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maaren Alia Shah on behalf of American International Group, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Shah, Maaren)
March 16, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Barry Carlinsky on behalf of American International Group, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA..(Carlinsky, Michael)
March 10, 2022 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022. Service was accepted by Clerk, CSC. Document filed by Nicholas Seibel..(Guglielmo, Joseph)
March 10, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. American International Group, Inc. served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022. Service was accepted by Clerk, CSC. Document filed by Nicholas Seibel..(Guglielmo, Joseph)
March 3, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Nicholas A. Colella to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25804470. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 2, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Nicholas A. Colella to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25804470. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicholas Seibel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Colella, Nicholas)
March 2, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Jamisen A. Etzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25799427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 1, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Jamisen A. Etzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25799427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicholas Seibel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Etzel, Jamisen)
March 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary F. Lynch on behalf of Nicholas Seibel..(Lynch, Gary)
February 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Rachel K. Tack to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25784635. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Brian C. Gudmundson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25783422. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Michael J. Laird to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25784715. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Michael J. Laird to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25784715. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicholas Seibel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Laird, Michael)
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Rachel K. Tack to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25784635. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicholas Seibel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Tack, Rachel)
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Brian C. Gudmundson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25783422. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicholas Seibel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Gudmundson, Brian)
February 24, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American International Group, Inc.. (vf)
February 24, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (vf)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Guglielmo, Joseph)
February 24, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joseph Peter Guglielmo to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Invalid Nature of Suit/Jurisdiction Combination [890/4]. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
February 24, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 24, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 24, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American International Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nicholas Seibel..(Guglielmo, Joseph)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nicholas Seibel..(Guglielmo, Joseph)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Guglielmo, Joseph) Modified on 2/24/2022 (vf).
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American International Group, Inc., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-25769211)Document filed by Nicholas Seibel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2).(Guglielmo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seibel v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Seibel
Represented By: Joseph Peter Guglielmo
Represented By: Brian C. Gudmundson
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Jamisen Etzel
Represented By: Michael J Laird
Represented By: Nicholas Colella
Represented By: Rachel Kristine Tack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Maaren Alia Shah
Represented By: Michael Barry Carlinsky
Represented By: Ryan Adam Rakower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group, Inc. d/b/a AIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group, Inc. doing business as AIG
Represented By: Maaren Alia Shah
Represented By: Michael Barry Carlinsky
Represented By: Ryan Adam Rakower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?