Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Puraglobe, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Defendant: Puraglobe, Inc., Puraglobe USA, LLC and Puragloge, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01570
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 24 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 6/9/2022 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vfr)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) plaintiff hereby serves notice that the above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice as to both defendants. Each party is responsible for its own attorneys' fees and costs. So ordered. Puraglobe USA, LLC and Puragloge, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/9/2022) (vfr)
June 8, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Puraglobe USA, LLC, Puraglobe, Inc., Puragloge, Inc.. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Garbarini, Richard)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that by June 15, 2022, the plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2022. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/08/2022) (ama)
May 31, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Puraglobe USA, LLC served on 3/15/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. Service was accepted by MonaLisa Hart, Agent. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
March 14, 2022 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Puraglobe USA, LLC..(lal)
March 13, 2022 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Puraglobe USA, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
March 13, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Puraglobe, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard)
March 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #16 Request for Issuance of Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
March 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE re: Document No. #13 Complaint, #10 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Court's leave has not been granted. A Complaint has been filed in this case (Doc #1), not all the party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (vf)
March 2, 2022 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Puraglobe USA, LLC, re: #13 Complaint. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 3/3/2022 (vf).
March 2, 2022 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Puraglobe, Inc., re: #13 Complaint. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 3/3/2022 (vf).
March 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 6/2/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. The parties shall use a landline if one is available. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/2/2022) (vfr)
March 2, 2022 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Puraglobe, Inc.. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 3/3/2022 (vf).
March 1, 2022 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Puraglobe USA, LLC, re: #10 Complaint. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 3/1/2022 (vf).
March 1, 2022 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Puraglobe, Inc., re: #10 Complaint. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 3/1/2022 (vf).
March 1, 2022 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against Puraglobe USA, LLC, Puragloge, Inc.. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 3/1/2022 (vf).
March 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE re: Document No. #10 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; all of the parties listed on the pleading(Puraglobe,Inc.) were not entered on CM ECF; wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
March 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; summons contains a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal)
March 1, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garbarini, Richard)
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Puraglobe, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 3/1/2022 (lal).
February 28, 2022 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -COMPLAINT against Puraglobe USA, LLC, Puragloge, Inc. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 3/1/2022 (vf).
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
February 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
February 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Puraglobe, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (vf)
February 28, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
February 28, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name error. Defendant party name spelling in Summons and Summons caption does not correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
February 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
February 28, 2022 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Puraglobe USA, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 2/28/2022 (vf).
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Puraglobe, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc...(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 2/28/2022 (vf).
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 2/28/2022 (vf).
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Garbarini, Richard)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Puraglobe USA, LLC, Puragloge, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25779972)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice).(Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Puraglobe, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puraglobe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puraglobe USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puragloge, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?