Noel v. American Airlines, Airport Security et al
Plaintiff: Vermail V. Noel
Defendant: American Airlines, Airport Security and United Airlines, Airport Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv01696
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 vc Fed. Question: Violation of Constitutional Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/17/2022) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 16, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Vermail V. Noel.(sc)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 4/1/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 4/1/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/2/2022) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended IFP application) (scn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 1, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Vermail V. Noel consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Vermail V. Noel. (sac)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Airport Security, United Airlines, Airport Security. Document filed by Vermail V. Noel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sac)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Vermail V. Noel. (sac)
February 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noel v. American Airlines, Airport Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermail V. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Airport Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Airport Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?