Roundtree v. Orange County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Rashaun M. Roundtree
Defendant: Orange County Jail and Orange County
Case Number: 1:2022cv01697
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 6. Mailed to: Rashaun M. Roundtree DIN:19A3294 P.O. Box 2001 Dannemora, NY 12929. (kh)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 22-CV-1697 (LTS). An Amended Civil Rights Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/4/2022) (sac)
March 21, 2022 Mailed a copy of #5 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Warden/Superintendent of Clinton Correctional Facility, 1156 Rt. 374, P.O. Box 2000, Dannemora, NY 12929-2000. (dsh)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2022) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Rashaun M. Roundtree.(sc)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 3/31/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 3/31/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/1/22) (Attachments: #1 Supplement ifp application) (bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 1, 2022 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Rashaun M. Roundtree, DIN: 19A3294 at Clinton Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001, Dannemora, NY 12929. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement ifp application) (dsh)
March 1, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Rashaun M. Roundtree. (sac)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Orange County, Orange County Jail. Document filed by Rashaun M. Roundtree. (sac)
February 28, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roundtree v. Orange County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashaun M. Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?