Bauer v. Baud et al
Plaintiff: Trevor Bauer
Defendant: Chris Baud and G/O Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01822
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lb Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Great Hill Partners for G/O Media, Inc.. Document filed by G/O Media, Inc...(Oberlander, Lynn)
April 6, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. G/O Media, Inc. waiver sent on 3/3/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. Document filed by Trevor Bauer..(Brown, Blair)
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Chris Baud waiver sent on 3/3/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. Document filed by Trevor Bauer..(Brown, Blair)
April 6, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Alison J. Nathan is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Slaughter on behalf of Chris Baud, G/O Media, Inc...(Slaughter, Joseph)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lynn B. Oberlander on behalf of Chris Baud, G/O Media, Inc...(Oberlander, Lynn)
April 1, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Case Management Conference Order dated March 9, 2022 served on Chris Baud and G/O Media Inc. on March 11, 2022. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Trevor Bauer..(Brown, Blair)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Wednesday, June 08, 2022 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Initial Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/9/2022) (ate)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/4/2022) (vfr)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon Fetterolf on behalf of Trevor Bauer..(Fetterolf, Jon)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn Patrick Naunton on behalf of Trevor Bauer..(Naunton, Shawn)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Chris Baud, G/O Media, Inc.. Document filed by Trevor Bauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original July 6, 2021 Deadspin Article, #2 Exhibit B - Modified July 6, 2021 Deadspin Article).(Brown, Blair)
March 4, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Blair Gerard Brown to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
March 4, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 4, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 4, 2022 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Blair)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25812981)Document filed by Trevor Bauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original July 6, 2021 Deadspin Article, #2 Exhibit B - Modified July 6, 2021 Deadspin Article).(Brown, Blair) Modified on 3/4/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer v. Baud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Bauer
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Jon Fetterolf
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Baud
Represented By: Lynn B. Oberlander
Represented By: Joseph Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G/O Media, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn B. Oberlander
Represented By: Joseph Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?