Rodriguez v. Edison's Restaurant et al
Plaintiff: Leocadia Rodriguez
Defendant: Edison's Restaurant, Luis Roberto Medina and Zunilda Nunez
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Malalo Medina and Zunilda Nuez
Case Number: 1:2022cv01909
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edison's Restaurant, Luis Roberto Medina, Malalo Medina..(Guzman, Lauriano)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED AND AGREED, by and between the respective parties herein that: 1. The Defendants shall file an Answer on April 29, 2022; 2. Counsel for defendants Edison's Restaurant, Luis Roberto Medina, and Malalo Medina will accept service of the Complaint via ECF, and waive all objections and defenses to personal jurisdiction or improper service of process; IT IS FURTHER AGREED, that facsimile signatures shall be deemed originals for filling. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. Edison's Restaurant answer due 4/29/2022; Luis Roberto Medina answer due 4/29/2022; Malalo Medina answer due 4/29/2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/28/2022) (ate)
April 27, 2022 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Lauriano Guzman Jr. dated 04/27/2022. Document filed by Edison's Restaurant, Luis Roberto Medina, Malalo Medina..(Guzman, Lauriano)
April 20, 2022 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 5/20/2022.(ah)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 4/29/2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/10/2019) (jpt)
April 18, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Edison's Restaurant waiver sent on 4/18/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. Document filed by Edison's Restaurant..(Guzman, Lauriano)
April 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauriano Guzman, Jr on behalf of Edison's Restaurant, Luis Roberto Medina, Malalo Medina..(Guzman, Lauriano)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to seek a default judgment, she is directed to do so in accordance with Rule 4(H) of my Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases by no later than May 6, 2022. If Plaintiff fails to do so or otherwise demonstrates that she does not intend to prosecute, I will dismiss this case for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 5/6/2022.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/15/2022) (ama)
April 5, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Malalo Medina served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. Service was accepted by Malalo Medina, Defendant. Document filed by Leocadia Rodriguez..(Cabrera, Eliseo)
April 5, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Luis Roberto Medina served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. Service was accepted by Zunilda Nunez, Co-worker. Document filed by Leocadia Rodriguez..(Cabrera, Eliseo)
March 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Deanna Grunfeld on behalf of Leocadia Rodriguez..(Grunfeld, Nicole)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malalo Medina. (vf)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luis Roberto Medina. (vf)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edison's Restaurant. (vf)
March 8, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
March 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
March 8, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Malalo Medina, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Leocadia Rodriguez..(Cabrera, Eliseo)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Luis Roberto Medina, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Leocadia Rodriguez..(Cabrera, Eliseo)
March 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edison's Restaurant, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Leocadia Rodriguez..(Cabrera, Eliseo)
March 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cabrera, Eliseo)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edison's Restaurant, Luis Roberto Medina, Malalo Medina. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25822009)Document filed by Leocadia Rodriguez..(Cabrera, Eliseo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Edison's Restaurant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Malalo Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Zunilda Nuez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leocadia Rodriguez
Represented By: Eliseo Cabrera
Represented By: Nicole Deanna Grunfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison's Restaurant
Represented By: Lauriano Guzman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Roberto Medina
Represented By: Lauriano Guzman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zunilda Nunez
Represented By: Lauriano Guzman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?