Hildene Capital Management, LLC v. American Bankers Association et al
Plaintiff: Hildene Capital Management, LLC
Defendant: American Bankers Association, FactSet Research Systems Inc. and S&P Global, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01929
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 54 Letter Motion to Seal in 22-cv-1860. Application GRANTED. Defendants may file an unredacted version of the above-referenced letter, as well as the CGS Subscription Agreement attached thereto, under seal, viewable only to the parties and the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 54. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/19/2022) (tg)
May 6, 2022 Filing 43 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Request for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of a Motion to Consolidate addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated May 6, 2022. Document filed by S&P Global, Inc...(Stock, Eric)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #40 Motion for Sarah Rachel Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 40. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/3/2022) (rro)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #39 Response in Support of Motion, filed by S&P Global, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Court approves of the parties' proposed schedule for Defendants' anticipated premotion letter concerning their motion for consolidation and appointment of interim class counsel. Relatedly, Defendants' time to file a premotion letter regarding their anticipated motion to dismiss shall be adjourned sine die, pending further order of the Court. Further, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for June 1, 2022, is hereby ADJOURNED to June 28, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. This conference will proceed telephonically. At the designated time, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Please note, the conference line will not be available prior to 2:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this endorsement in both the Dinosaur Financial Group and Hildene Capital Management cases listed in the caption of this document.( Initial Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/2/2022) (rro)
May 2, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Sarah Rachel Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26082268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 29, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION for Sarah Rachel Bayer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26082268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FactSet Research Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-New York, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Bayer, Sarah)
April 29, 2022 Filing 39 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated April 29, 2022 re: #24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter Seeking Pre-Motion Conference Regarding Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated April 1, 2022. . Document filed by S&P Global, Inc...(Stock, Eric)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #36 Motion for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 36. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/29/2022) (rro)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #35 Motion for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 35.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/29/2022) (rro)
April 28, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26071263. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FactSet Research Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-Certificate of Good Standing-District of Columbia, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Cannon, William)
April 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26068384. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
April 28, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #36 MOTION for William Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26071263. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
April 27, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION for Seth David Greenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26068384. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FactSet Research Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-Maryland, #3 Certificate of Good Standing-District of Columbia, #4 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Greenstein, Seth)
April 27, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ethan Edward Litwin on behalf of FactSet Research Systems Inc...(Litwin, Ethan)
April 26, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey I Shinder on behalf of FactSet Research Systems Inc...(Shinder, Jeffrey)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER (granting #40 in case 22-cv-1860) Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendants' time to respond to Plaintiffs' premotion letter regarding their contemplated motion for partial summary judgment shall be extended to May 18, 2022. Additionally, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for June 1, 2022, is hereby converted to a premotion conference, at which the Court will discuss Plaintiffs' contemplated motion, as well as Defendants' contemplated motion to consolidate and designate interim class counsel. Furthermore, in light of the scheduling conflict alluded to above, the parties may propose to the Court alternative dates on which to hold this conference. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at et entry 40. SO ORDERED.( Responses due by 5/18/2022, Pre-Motion Conference set for 6/1/2022 at 12:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/22/2022) (tg)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #30 Motion for Michelle K. Fischer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 30. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/22/2022) (tg)
April 22, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Michelle Karen Fischer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26038450. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 21, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Michelle Karen Fischer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26038450. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Bankers Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ohio Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Fischer, Michelle)
April 20, 2022 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by S&P Global, Inc...(Stock, Eric)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #27 Motion for David C. Kiernan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 27. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/6/2022) (rro)
April 6, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for David C. Kiernan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25964654. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
April 5, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: American Bankers Association answer due 5/6/2022; FactSet Research Systems Inc. answer due 5/6/2022; S&P Global, Inc. answer due 5/6/2022. (rro)
April 5, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for David C. Kiernan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25964654. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Bankers Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Kiernan, David)
April 5, 2022 Filing 26 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated 4/4/2022 re: extending the time for Defendants to submit a letter seeking a pre-motion conference. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint shall be extended to May 6, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 28. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/5/2022) (rro)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and among the undersigned counsel for the parties herein that: Defendants' time to file letters requesting a pre-motion conference for motions to dismiss or otherwise respond to the operative complaint in this action is extended to the later of: a. 45 days after Plaintiff files a consolidated and amended complaint; or b. 45 days after Plaintiff informs Defendants in writing that they do not plan to file a consolidated and amended complaint. Notwithstanding the foregoing, if Defendants' deadline to file letters requesting a premotion conference for motions to dismiss or otherwise respond to the operative complaint in the Dinosaur Financial Action, or any subsequently filed action that is related to this Action, is earlier than the deadline provided for in Paragraph 1 above, then Defendants' deadline in Paragraph 1 shall be the same date as the earlier of such deadline in the Dinosaur Financial Action or any subsequently filed related action; If Defendants are permitted to file a motion to dismiss, the parties will meet and confer and jointly propose a briefing schedule to the Court for the motion to dismiss. Defendants, however, agree to provide Plaintiff at least 45 days to respond to such motion; and. This Stipulation may be signed in counterparts, and facsimile or scanned copies shall be treated as originals for all purposes. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion atdocket entry 24. Motions terminated: #24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter Seeking Pre-Motion Conference Regarding Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated April 1, 2022. filed by S&P Global, Inc. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/4/2022) (rro)
April 1, 2022 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter Seeking Pre-Motion Conference Regarding Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Eric J. Stock dated April 1, 2022. Document filed by S&P Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order).(Stock, Eric)
April 1, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Jonathan Stock on behalf of S&P Global, Inc...(Stock, Eric)
April 1, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander H. Southwell on behalf of S&P Global, Inc...(Southwell, Alexander)
April 1, 2022 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Bankers Association..(Maugeri, Alexander)
April 1, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Virgil Maugeri on behalf of American Bankers Association..(Maugeri, Alexander)
March 22, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Class Action Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Related Case Statement served on FactSet Research Systems, Inc. on March 14, 2022. Service was accepted by Adam Mydlo, Facilities Manager. Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Bercari, Grant)
March 22, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Class Action Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Related Case Statement served on American Bankers Association on March 11, 2022. Service was accepted by Registered Agent. Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Bercari, Grant)
March 22, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Class Action Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Related Case Statement served on S&P Global, Inc. on March 14, 2022. Service was accepted by Registered Agent. Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Bercari, Grant)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on June 1, 2022, at 12:30 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 6/1/2022 at 12:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/14/2022) (rro)
March 11, 2022 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-01860-KPF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
March 11, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
March 11, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
March 10, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Grant Bercari on behalf of Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Bercari, Grant)
March 10, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Anthony Kane on behalf of Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Kane, Ryan)
March 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Judah Aranoff on behalf of Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Aranoff, Ronald)
March 10, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by R. Scott Thompson on behalf of Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Thompson, R.)
March 10, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David H Wollmuth on behalf of Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Wollmuth, David)
March 8, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FactSet Research Systems Inc...(pc)
March 8, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to S&P Global, Inc...(pc)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Bankers Association..(pc)
March 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David H Wollmuth. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
March 8, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 8, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
March 8, 2022 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 22cv1860. (pc)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to S&P Global, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Wollmuth, David)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FactSet Research Systems Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Wollmuth, David)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Bankers Association, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Wollmuth, David)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Wollmuth, David)
March 7, 2022 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-01860 (KPF). Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Wollmuth, David)
March 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wollmuth, David)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Bankers Association, FactSet Research Systems Inc., S&P Global, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25827592)Document filed by Hildene Capital Management, LLC..(Wollmuth, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hildene Capital Management, LLC v. American Bankers Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hildene Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: R. Scott Thompson
Represented By: Ronald Judah Aranoff
Represented By: Ryan Anthony Kane
Represented By: Grant Bercari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Association
Represented By: David Kiernan
Represented By: Alexander Virgil Maugeri
Represented By: Michelle K. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FactSet Research Systems Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Edward Litwin
Represented By: Jeffrey I Shinder
Represented By: Sarah Bayer
Represented By: Seth Greenstein
Represented By: William Stephen Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&P Global, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?