Chen et al v. SS&C Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christine Chen, Michael Nguyen and all other similarly situated employees of SS&C
Defendant: SS&C Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02190
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jenny S. Brejt to RE-FILE Document #26 MOTION to Approve plaintiffs's voluntary dismissal of Plaintiffs's FLSA claims .. ERROR(S): Supporting documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #13 Amended Complaint against SS&C Technologies, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Chen, Michael Nguyen. Related document: #13 Amended Complaint..(Brejt, Jenny)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Approve plaintiffs's voluntary dismissal of Plaintiffs's FLSA claims . Document filed by Christine Chen, Michael Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Jenny Brejt in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal for FLSA Claims).(Brejt, Jenny) Modified on 5/13/2022 (db).
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot #16 Letter Motion for Conference re: #16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-motion conference for purposes of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification pursuant to 29 USC 216(b) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lloyd R. Ambinder dated April 13, 2022., #18 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference re: Defendant's Anticipated Partial Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 13)] and Response to Plaintiff's Pre-Motion Letter [ECF No. 16] addressed to Judge John P. C, #20 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint which omits the FLSA third cause of action in response to Defendant SS&C's letter, dated April 18, 2022 [Dkt. No. 18] addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lloyd R. Ambinder, E; denying as moot #18 Letter Motion for Conference re: #16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-motion conference for purposes of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification pursuant to 29 USC 216(b) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lloyd R. Ambinder dated April 13, 2022., #18 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference re: Defendant's Anticipated Partial Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 13)] and Response to Plaintiff's Pre-Motion Letter [ECF No. 16] addressed to Judge John P. C, #20 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint which omits the FLSA third cause of action in response to Defendant SS&C's letter, dated April 18, 2022 [Dkt. No. 18] addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lloyd R. Ambinder, E ; granting #20 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court thus grants the motion to amend conditioned on the approval of the voluntary dismissal of the FLSA claims pursuant to the doctrine of Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint, a stipulation of dismissal of the FLSA claims, and a motion to approve said dismissal by May 6, 2022. Thus, the motions pending at Docket Numbers 16 and 18 are denied as moot, and the motion pending at Docket Number 20 is provisionally granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/27/2022) (jca)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 THIRD LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lloyd R. Ambinder dated 4/27/22 re: In Response to Defendants Letter Response Dated April 25, 2022 [ECF No. 22]. Document filed by Christine Chen, Michael Nguyen..(Ambinder, Lloyd)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2022. Motions due by 5/6/2022. (jca)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #22 Response to Motion, filed by SS&C Technologies, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall respond by April 29, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 4/29/2022.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/26/2022) (mml)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Liza M. Velazquez dated April 25, 2022 re: #20 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint which omits the FLSA third cause of action in response to Defendant SS&C's letter, dated April 18, 2022 [Dkt. No. 18] addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lloyd R. Ambinder, E . Document filed by SS&C Technologies, Inc...(Velazquez, Liza)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER with respect to #20 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. By April 27, 2022, Defendants shall indicate whether they intend to oppose the request to amend the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/22/2022) (vfr)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint which omits the FLSA third cause of action in response to Defendant SS&C's letter, dated April 18, 2022 [Dkt. No. 18] addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lloyd R. Ambinder, Esq. dated April 21, 2022. Document filed by Christine Chen, Michael Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint Track Changed, #2 Exhibit B - Second Amended Complaint Clean).(Ambinder, Lloyd)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER with respect to #18 Letter Motion for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference re: Defendant's Anticipated Partial Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 13)] and Response to Plaintiff's Pre-Motion Letter [ECF No. 16] addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Liza M. Velazquez dated April 18, 2022. Plaintiff shall respond to the letter by April 21, 2022. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/19/2022) (vfr)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/21/2022 (vfr)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference re: Defendant's Anticipated Partial Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 13)] and Response to Plaintiff's Pre-Motion Letter [ECF No. 16] addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Liza M. Velazquez dated April 18, 2022. Document filed by SS&C Technologies, Inc...(Velazquez, Liza)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. ENDORSEMENT: Attorney Kimberly A. Francis' motion to withdraw as counsel for Defendant SS&C Technologies, Inc. (ECF No. 15) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Ms. Francis as counsel for SS&C Technologies, Inc. SO ORDERED:, (Attorney Kimberly Amanda Francis terminated.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 4/14/22) (yv)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-motion conference for purposes of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification pursuant to 29 USC 216(b) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lloyd R. Ambinder dated April 13, 2022. Document filed by Christine Chen, Michael Nguyen..(Brejt, Jenny)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by SS&C Technologies, Inc...(Francis, Kimberly)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/12/2022) (jca)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #12 Amended Complaint against SS&C Technologies, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Chen, Michael Nguyen. Related document: #12 Amended Complaint..(Brejt, Jenny)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lloyd Robert Ambinder to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Plaintiff radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Chen..(Ambinder, Lloyd) Modified on 4/6/2022 (pc).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by SS&C Technologies, Inc...(Velazquez, Liza)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jenny S. Brejt on behalf of Christine Chen, Michael Nguyen..(Brejt, Jenny)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lloyd Robert Ambinder on behalf of Christine Chen, Michael Nguyen..(Ambinder, Lloyd)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal (with attached Exhibits, Declaration of Alicia R. Neville and Civil Cover Sheet) and Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Christine Chen and Michael Nguyen on March 16, 2022. Service was accepted by Lloyd R. Ambinder, Esq.. Service was made by E-mail. Document filed by SS&C Technologies, Inc...(Velazquez, Liza)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Liza May Velazquez. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: all other similarly situated employees of SS&C. The party was added to the case in error. (vf)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Liza May Velazquez. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christine Chen, Michael Nguyen. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Amanda Francis on behalf of SS&C Technologies, Inc...(Francis, Kimberly)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria H. Keane on behalf of SS&C Technologies, Inc...(Keane, Maria)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Cohen on behalf of SS&C Technologies, Inc...(Cohen, Jay)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent SS&C Technologies Holdings, Inc. for SS&C Technologies, Inc.. Document filed by SS&C Technologies, Inc...(Velazquez, Liza)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Velazquez, Liza)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Alicia R. Neville in Support re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by SS&C Technologies, Inc...(Velazquez, Liza)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151114/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25873478).Document filed by SS&C Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal).(Velazquez, Liza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen et al v. SS&C Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Chen
Represented By: Jenny S. Brejt
Represented By: Lloyd Robert Ambinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nguyen
Represented By: Jenny S. Brejt
Represented By: Lloyd Robert Ambinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: all other similarly situated employees of SS&C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SS&C Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Cohen
Represented By: Kimberly Amanda Francis
Represented By: Maria H. Keane
Represented By: Liza May Velazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?