Ligon v. American Behavioral Research Institute, LLC
Plaintiff: Denette J. Ligon
Defendant: American Behavioral Research Institute, LLC doing business as Relaxium
Case Number: 1:2022cv02231
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court has been informed that the Parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/9/2022) (kv)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Dan Shaked, Esq. dated 05/09/2022. Document filed by Denette J. Ligon..(Shaked, Dan)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal #6 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Plaintiff's letter motion references a different plaintiff than the named plaintiff in case 22 Civ. 2231. The application is DENIED without prejudice to renewal with the correct party name. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/6/2022) (mml)
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Dan Shaked, Esq. dated 05/06/2022. Document filed by Denette J. Ligon..(Shaked, Dan)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/18/2022 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call 363-4749 and enter the access code (888) 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/6/2022) (ks)
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Behavioral Research Institute, LLC..(pc)
March 21, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 21, 2022 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 21, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Behavioral Research Institute, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Denette J. Ligon..(Shaked, Dan)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shaked, Dan)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Behavioral Research Institute, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25879955)Document filed by Denette J. Ligon..(Shaked, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ligon v. American Behavioral Research Institute, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denette J. Ligon
Represented By: Dan Shaked
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Behavioral Research Institute, LLC doing business as Relaxium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?